Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/06/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
04/06/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 21-09858
|
04/06/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (Appellants/Cross-Respondents) (SC) | | 21-09860
|
04/06/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived for Cross-Appeal. State/County/Municipality. (SC) | | |
04/06/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for cross-appellant.) (SC) | | 21-09861
|
04/13/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Law Office of Andrew H. Pastwick. Check no. 1199. (Appellant/Cross-Respondent) (SC) | | |
04/13/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC) | | 21-10706
|
04/14/2021 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Stephen E. Haberfeld. (SC) | | 21-10834
|
04/15/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Civil Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 21-10930
|
04/20/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Civil Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 21-11424
|
04/22/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC) | | 21-11626
|
04/22/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC) | | 21-11633
|
04/23/2021 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellants/cross-respondents (appellants) and respondents/cross-appellants (respondents) transcript request form due: 14 days. Appellants' opening brief and appendix due: 90 days. (SC) | | 21-11762
|
05/03/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Appellants/Cross-Respondents' Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 02/02/21. To Court Reporter: Nancy Maldonado. (SC) | | 21-12648
|
07/20/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-20813
|
07/20/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 1 (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 7/20/21)(SC) | | |
07/20/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 2 (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 7/20/21)(SC) | | |
07/20/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 3 (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 7/20/21)(SC) | | |
07/20/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Appendix. Corrected appendix due: 5 days. (SC) | | 21-20849
|
07/20/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Amended Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-20870
|
07/20/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 1. (SC) | | 21-20871
|
07/20/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 2. (SC) | | 21-20872
|
07/20/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 3. (SC) | | 21-20874
|
07/20/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 4. (SC) | | 21-20875
|
07/20/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 5. (SC) | | 21-20878
|
07/20/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 6 (REJECTED PER PHONE CALL TO COUNSEL) (SC) | | |
07/20/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 7 (REJECTED PER PHONE CALL TO COUNSEL) (SC) | | |
07/20/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 8 (REJECTED PER PHONE CALL TO COUNSEL) (SC) | | |
07/20/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 9 (REJECTED PER PHONE CALL TO COUNSEL) (SC) | | |
07/20/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Second Amended Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-20913
|
07/20/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 6. (SC) | | 21-20914
|
07/20/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 7. (SC) | | 21-20915
|
07/20/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 8. (SC) | | 21-20916
|
07/20/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 9. (SC) | | 21-20918
|
08/04/2021 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Respondents/Cross-Appellants' Combined Answering Brief on Appeal and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal. (SC) | | 21-22684
|
09/10/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Approving Stipulation. Respondents/cross-appellants shall have until September 20, 2021, to file and serve the combined answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal. (SC) | | 21-26278
|
09/16/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondents/Cross-Appellants' Combined Answering Brief on Appeal and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal. (SC) | | 21-26921
|
10/13/2021 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Appellant/Croos-Respondents' Combined Response Brief to Respondents/ Cross-Appellants' Brief and Reply Brief in Support of their Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-29468
|
10/20/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Approving Stipulation. The parties' stipulation for an extension of time to file the combined reply brief on appeal and answering brief on cross-appeal and reply brief on cross-appeal is approved. Appellants/cross-respondents shall have until November 15, 2021, to file and serve the combined reply brief on appeal and answering brief on cross-appeal. Respondents/cross-appellants shall thereafter have until December 16, 2021, to file and serve a reply brief on cross-appeal, if deemed necessary. (SC) | | 21-30124
|
11/05/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Reply Brief in Support of Their Opening Brief and Response to Respondents' Cross-Appeal Brief. (SC) | | 21-31886
|
11/16/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Reply Brief Cross-Appeal. (SC) | | 21-32974
|
11/16/2021 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
03/18/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Sothern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. (SC) | | 22-08602
|
04/27/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." SNP22 - JH/LS/DH. (SC) | | 22-13316
|
05/23/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-16193
|
05/23/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
06/10/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 24, 2022. (SC) | | 22-16193
|