Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/03/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (Appellant Cochran Mgmt. Servs.) (SC) | | |
05/03/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 21-12622
|
05/03/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (Cannon Cochran Mgmt. Servs.) (SC) | | 21-12625
|
05/05/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Motion for Stay of District Court's Order. (SC) | | 21-12869
|
05/05/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Exhibits to Motion for Stay. (SC) | | 21-12878
|
05/05/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from Lewis Brisbois. Confirmation No. 21050542348436. (Appellant Cannon Cochran) (SC). | | |
05/06/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellants - due: 21 days. (SC) | | 21-13028
|
05/07/2021 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Janet Trost. (SC) | | 21-13177
|
05/11/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Opposition to Appellant's Motion for Stay of District Court's Order. (SC) | | 21-13543
|
05/19/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Reply in Support of Motion for Stay of District Court's Order. (SC) | | 21-14303
|
05/24/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for July 21, 2021, at 2:00 PM. (SC) | | 21-14833
|
05/26/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Stay. Having considered the arguments of the parties as well as the relevant factors, this court is not convinced that a stay under NRAP 8 is warranted. The motion is denied. (SC) | | 21-15066
|
05/27/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 21-15251
|
07/21/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC) | | 21-21118
|
07/22/2021 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 21-21219
|
08/05/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 03/10/21. To Court Reporter: Department XXI. (SC) | | 21-22799
|
09/10/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Robin Page stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 03/10/21. (SC) | | 21-26298
|
10/19/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: November 3, 2021. (SC) | | 21-30008
|
11/03/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Opening Brief (SC). | | 21-31625
|
11/03/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix Volume I. (SC) | | 21-31626
|
12/03/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent Robert Holland's answering brief due: December 17, 2021. (SC) | | 21-34530
|
12/17/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-35932
|
01/18/2022 | Brief | Filed RepAppellants' Reply Brief. (SC) | | 22-01657
|
01/18/2022 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
02/04/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | 22-03892
|
02/04/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |
04/20/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (SC) | | |
05/03/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Publish. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 5/3/22) (SC) | | |
05/03/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. (SC) | | 22-14021
|
05/05/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice of Appearance for Michael Friend. (SC) | | 22-14437
|
05/06/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Petition for Review due: May 23, 2022. (SC) | | 22-14475
|
05/23/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellants' Petition for Review. (SC) | | 22-16375
|
06/14/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Answer to Petition for Review. Answer due: 14 days. (SC) | | 22-18854
|
06/22/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondent's Answer to Petition for Review. (SC) | | 22-19649
|
07/21/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. (SC) | | |
08/04/2022 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Granting Petition for Review. Our review will be based on the record and briefs previously filed. EN BANC | | 22-24485
|
10/06/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This matter is scheduled for oral argument on November 8, 2022, at 11:30 a.m. in Las Vegas. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. (SC) | | 22-31515
|
10/24/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC) | | 22-33338
|
11/04/2022 | Motion | Filed Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) to Postpone Oral Argument. (SC). | | 22-34743
|
11/04/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Vacating Oral Argument. Appellants have filed a motion to continue the oral argument in this matter. Appellants represent that respondent does not oppose the motion. Cause appearing, the motion is granted. The oral argument currently scheduled for November 8, 2022, at 11:30 a.m. is hereby vacated. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar. (SC) | | 22-34820
|
12/02/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter is scheduled for oral argument on January 4, 2023, at 1:30 p.m. in Carson City. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. (SC) | | 22-38003
|
12/21/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC) | | 22-40046
|
01/03/2023 | Other | Justice Linda Bell disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Law Firms | | |
01/04/2023 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc court. LS/EC/KP/DH/PL/RP/LB. (SC) | | |
04/20/2023 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Herndon, J. Majority: Stiglich/Cadish/Pickering/Herndon/Lee/Parraguirre. fn1 [The Honorable Linda Marie Bell, Justice, voluntarily recused herself from participation in the decision of this matter.] 139 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 10. (SC). | | 23-12280
|
05/15/2023 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 23-15200
|
05/15/2023 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.(SC) | | |
05/23/2023 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court County Clerk on May 17, 2023. | | 23-15200
|