Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/12/2021 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC) | | |
05/12/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (C313216) (SC) | | 21-13677
|
05/12/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (A824261) (SC) | | 21-13678
|
05/18/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (Second NOA) (C313216) (SC) | | 21-14294
|
05/18/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (Second NOA) (A824261) (SC) | | 21-14295
|
05/19/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Transmission of Record and Regarding Briefing. Record on Appeal due: 30 days.
Within 120 days, appellant may file either (1) a brief that complies with the requirements in NRAP 28(a) and NRAP 32; or (2) the "Informal Brief Form for Pro Se Parties" provided by the supreme court clerk. NRAP 31(a)(1). If no brief is submitted, the appeal may be decided on the record on appeal. (SC) | | 21-14438
|
05/27/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal - A824261 - Volume 1 Part 1. (SC) | | 21-15298
|
05/27/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal - A824261 - Volume 2 Part 1. (SC) | | 21-15299
|
05/27/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal - A824261 - Volume 3. (SC) | | 21-15300
|
05/27/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal - Volumes 1-6 (Via FTP). (SC) | | 21-15301
|
06/02/2021 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Motion for Court Order Directing Additional Copy Credits. (SC) | | 21-15714
|
06/07/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal pages 60 to 101, 462 to 480 and 480 to 505 (SEALED) DC # A-20-824261-W. (SC) | | |
06/07/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Pre-Sentence Investigation Report pages 264 to 276 (SEALED) DC# C-16-313216-2 related case A-20-824261-W. (SC) | | |
06/07/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Supp. Pre-Sentence Investigation Report pages 361 to 375 (SEALED). DC # C-16-313216-2 related case A-20-824261-W. (SC) | | |
06/07/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal pages 403 to 410 (SEALED) DC # C-16-313216-2 related case A-20-824261-W. (SC) | | |
06/10/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a pro se motion asking this court to direct the Nevada Department of Corrections to provide appellant with an additional $200 of copy credits so that he may prosecute this appeal. The motion is denied. fn1 [The motion does not contain a certificate of service as required by NRAP 25(d). The service requirement is waived in this instance. NRAP 2.] (SC). | | 21-16723
|
09/03/2021 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Renewed Motion for Additional Copy Credits for Order to Show Cause and for Further Court Orders. (SC) | | 21-25707
|
09/14/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant has filed a pro se motion. The motion is granted to the following extent. Appellant's opening brief due: 60 days. This court waives the requirement that appellant serve copies on respondent and provide proof of service of the opening brief and the instant motion. All other requested relief is denied. (SC) | | 21-26569
|
10/22/2021 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Renewed Motion for Order to Show Cause for Further Court Orders and/or Alternatively for Appointment of Counsel. (SC) | | 21-30460
|
10/28/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a renewed motion asking that this court direct a prison official to make copies of and return certain legal documents. Alternatively, appellant asks for the appointment of counsel. Appellant's request that this court order a prison official to take a particular action is not properly made in the context of a motion. Accordingly, the request is denied. Appellant's alternative request for the appointment of counsel is denied at this time. As stated in this court's September 14, 2021, order, the requirement for appellant to serve a copy of the opening brief on respondent is waived in this matter. (SC) | | 21-31126
|
11/15/2021 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Appellant's Motion for Extension of Brief Due Date; Alternate Motion for Appointment of Counsel and Notice of In-ability to Brief Opening Brief Due to Seizure of Legal Documents. (SC) | | 21-32755
|
11/18/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. This matter shall be submitted and decided on the record on appeal without briefing. (SC) | | 21-33254
|
11/18/2021 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision/To Screening. (SC) | | |
12/06/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | 21-34654
|
12/06/2021 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |
05/05/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." fn1 [We have considered all documents filed or received in this matter. We conclude White is only entitled to the relief described herein.] Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (SC) | | |
06/22/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Amended Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order. " Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (SC) | | |
06/29/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. (SC) | | |
06/29/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Proper Person Petition for Review. (Appellant/Petitioner's Petition for Review of Court of Appeals Order of Affirmance in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding and Order Denying Reconsideration and pursuant to NRAP Rule 40B.) (SC) | | 22-20571
|
06/29/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 7 days. (SC) | | 22-20574
|
07/12/2022 | Post-Judgment Order/Dispositional | Order Denying Petition for Review. "Review denied." EN BANC (SC) | | 22-21813
|
07/12/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-21814
|
07/12/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
08/01/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 13, 2022. (SC) | | 22-21814
|