Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/17/2021 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC) | | |
05/17/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (C319021) (SC) | | 21-14118
|
05/17/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (A827381) (SC) | | 21-14122
|
06/02/2021 | Order/Incoming | Filed District court order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on May 27, 2021. Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order. (SC) | | 21-15683
|
06/03/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (Second NOA) (C319021) (SC) | | 21-15925
|
06/03/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (Third NOA) (C319021) (SC) | | 21-15929
|
06/04/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Transmission of Record and Regarding Briefing. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Appellant's Opening or Informal Brief due: 120 days. (SC) | | 21-15990
|
06/04/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (Second NOA) (A827381) (SC) | | 21-16109
|
06/04/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (Third NOA) (A827381) (SC) | | 21-16112
|
06/09/2021 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Motion to Have the Eight Judicial District Court Enter Order for Denying Post Conviction Writ. (SC) | | 21-16590
|
06/09/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. Motion to Have the Eight Judicial District Enter Order for Denying Post Conviction Writ. (SC) | | 21-16593
|
06/18/2021 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Motion to Withdraw Document Entitled Motion to Have the Motion to Have the Eight Judicial District Court Enter Order Denying Post Conviction Writ. (SC) | | 21-17610
|
06/18/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Proof of Service - Motion to Have the Eight Judicial District Enter Order for Denying Post Conviction Writ. (SC) | | 21-17612
|
06/21/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (Fourth NOA) (C319021) (SC) | | 21-17699
|
06/21/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (Fourth NOA) (A827381) (SC) | | 21-17700
|
06/22/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. On June 9, 2021, appellant filed a motion to direct the district court to enter a written order denying his postconviction petition for a writ of habeas corpus. On June 18, 2021, appellant filed a motion to withdraw the motion filed on June 9, 2021. Accordingly, no action will be taken on the motion filed on June 9, 2021. (SC) | | 21-18006
|
06/23/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal - A827381 - Vol. 1 - Part 1. (SC) | | 21-18133
|
06/23/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal - A827381 - Vol. 2 - Part 1. (SC) | | 21-18135
|
06/24/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Volumes 1-10 DC# C-16-319021-1 related writ case A-21-827381-W (Via FTP). (SC) | | 21-18171
|
06/28/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal pages 1 to 37, 650 and 2019 to 2024 (SEALED). (SC) | | |
06/28/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Pre-Sentence Investigation Report pages 657-667 (SEALED). (SC) | | |
06/28/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Supp Pre-Sentence Investigation Report (SEALED). (SC) | | |
07/26/2021 | Brief | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief. (SC) | | 21-21586
|
09/13/2021 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. (SC) | | |
09/29/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | 21-28046
|
09/29/2021 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |
09/29/2021 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Supreme Court. (COA). | | |
10/15/2021 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion for Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 21-29612
|
11/05/2021 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (COA) | | 21-31797
|
11/05/2021 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (SC) | | |
11/15/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant's pro se motion for reconsideration of the September 29, 2021, notice issued by the clerk of this court transferring this matter to the Court of Appeals for disposition is denied. Any other relief requested in the motion is also denied. (SC) | | 21-32649
|
11/15/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Notice of Address Change. (SC) | | 21-32757
|
11/30/2021 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Supreme Court. (COA). | | |
11/30/2021 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |
11/30/2021 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. (COA). | | |
11/30/2021 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC). | | 21-34153
|
11/30/2021 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC). | | |
12/09/2021 | Other | Returned Unfiled Document received from appellant Arnold Anderson. (SC) | | 21-35136
|
12/15/2021 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on December 1, 2021. (SC) | | 21-34153
|