Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Administrative Case: ADKT 0580
Short Caption:IN THE MATTER OF THE CREATION OF A COMMISSION ON NEVADA RULES OF APPELLATE PROCEDURECourt:Supreme Court
Classification:Administrative - ADKT - ADKTCase Status:Scheduled for Hearing
Filed Date:05/19/2021Public Hearing:03/07/2024 at 2:00 PM (Carson City)
Closed Date:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/19/2021Administrative CaseFiled Petition.21-14446
05/20/2021Administrative CaseFiled Order Scheduling Public Hearing and Requesting Public Comment.21-14595
06/01/2021Administrative CaseFiled Response to Order Scheduling Public Hearing and Requesting Public Comment.21-15558
06/01/2021Administrative CaseFiled Response to Order Scheduling Public Hearing and Requesting Public Comment.21-15567
06/22/2021Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Kim Blandino.21-17936
06/22/2021Administrative CaseFiled Comments from JoNell Thomas.21-17948
06/29/2021Administrative CasePublic Hearing Held. Public Hearing held on the Administrative Docket. (SC)
08/13/2021Administrative CaseFiled Order Creating Commission on Nevada Rules of Appellate Procedure.21-23661
09/01/2021Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Members to the Commission on Nevada Rules of Appellate Procedure.21-25509
10/07/2022Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Commission Member (Bonnie A. Bulla, Judge). (SC)22-31732
10/25/2022Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Commission Member (Julie Ollom).22-33486
03/01/2023Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Commission Member (Sharon Dickinson).23-06154
03/29/2023Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Commission Member (Erica C. Medley and Jessica E. Whelan)23-09564
01/29/2024Administrative CaseFiled Petition.Y24-03414
01/30/2024Administrative CaseFiled Order Scheduling Public Hearing.24-03476