Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/01/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
06/01/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 21-15459
|
06/01/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. (SC) | | 21-15461
|
06/01/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 21-15463
|
06/03/2021 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from Bret O. Whipple. (SC) | | |
06/03/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (Appellant Whipple Cattle Co.) (SC) | | |
06/03/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. (Appellant Whipple Cattle Co.) (SC) | | 21-15939
|
06/03/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. (Appellant Whipple Cattle Co.) (SC) | | 21-15942
|
06/03/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (Appellant Whipple Cattle Co.) (SC) | | 21-15946
|
06/10/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Appellants' Case Appeal Statement. (SC) | | 21-16745
|
06/11/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. (SC) | | 21-16826
|
06/11/2021 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from Corbett Benjamin Scroggins. (SC) | | |
06/11/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statements mailed to counsel for appellants - due: 21 days. (SC) | | 21-16862
|
06/18/2021 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell. (SC) | | 21-17623
|
06/21/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellants' Certificate of Service for the Case Appeal Statement. (SC) | | 21-17860
|
07/02/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 21-19163
|
07/06/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement (Appellant Whipple Cattle Co.). Due date: 10 days. (SC) | | 21-19182
|
07/06/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellants' (Whipple Cattle Company) Civil Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 21-19193
|
08/06/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. The settlement judge and counsel request that this appeal remain in the settlement program until October 31, 2021. Case Nos. 81972/82964/82994. (SC) | | 21-22964
|
08/06/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. The settlement judge and counsel request that this appeal remain in the settlement program until October 31, 2021. Case Nos. 81972/82964/82994. (SC) | | 21-22965
|
08/06/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. The settlement judge and counsel request that this appeal remain in the settlement program until October 31, 2021. Case Nos. 81972/82964/82994. (SC) | | 21-22968
|
08/12/2021 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Extension of Time for Status Report. The time for filing a Final Settlement Conference Status Report is extended to November 1, 2021. (SC) | | 21-23507
|
11/03/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: November 29, 2021, at 10:00 AM. The settlement judge requests that this appeal remain in the settlement program an additional 60 days in order to complete the settlement process. Case Nos. 81972/82964/82994. (SC) | | 21-31624
|
11/10/2021 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Extension of Time for Status Report. The time for filing a Final Settlement Conference Status Report is extended to January 3, 2022. Nos. 81972/82964/82994. (SC) | | 21-32382
|
12/09/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Case Nos. 81972/82964/82994. (SC). | | 21-35114
|
12/14/2021 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 21-35635
|
12/28/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Appellant's Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/1/19 and 1/14/21. To Court Reporter: Stacy Ray. (SC) | | 21-36875
|
12/28/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/1/19; 1/27/21 and 4/14/21. To Court Reporter: Sandra Anderson. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 12/28/21) (SC) | | |
12/28/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Transcript Request. (SC) | | 21-36889
|
12/29/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Appellant Whipple Cattle Co.'s Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/1/19; 1/27/21 and 4/14/21. To Court Reporter: Sandra Anderson. (SC) | | 21-37036
|
01/05/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Correcting Previous Order and Directing District Court Clerk to File the Record on Appeal. On December 14, 2021, this court entered an order that, among other things, reinstated the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Because this is a venue appeal, the directive to file briefs was entered in error and the briefing schedule set forth in that order is vacated. No further documents are due from the parties at this time. District court's record due: 30 days. (SC) | | 22-00448
|
01/17/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Motion to Reinstate Briefing. (SC) | | 22-01582
|
01/26/2022 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal. (A827055) Vol. 1. (SC) | | 22-02651
|
01/27/2022 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Volumes 1-37 (Via FTP). (SC) | | 22-02704
|
01/31/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Appeal for Lack of Jurisdiction. (SC) | | 22-03116
|
02/14/2022 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Stacey Ray stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/1/19, 1/14/21, 1/27/21, and 4/14/21. (SC) | | 22-04914
|
02/21/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Appeal for Lack of Jurisdiction. (SC) | | 22-05583
|
02/22/2022 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Brynn White stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/27/21. (SC) | | 22-05709
|
03/08/2022 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Stacey Ray stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/1/19 and 1/14/21. (SC) | | 22-07431
|
04/08/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "The appeal in Docket No. 82964 is dismissed." The appeal in Docket No. 82994 challenging the order granting reconsideration and denying change of venue shall proceed pursuant to NRAP 3A(b)(6)(B). The motion to reinstate briefing is denied. See NRAP 3A(b)(6)(B) (providing that an appeal of an order denying a motion to change venue is not subject to briefing by the parties). Nos 82964/82994. NNP22 - AS/EC/KP. (SC) | | 22-11042
|
05/03/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-13987
|
05/03/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
05/20/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 4, 2022. (SC) | | 22-13987
|