Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
07/15/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
07/15/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 21-20398
|
07/15/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 21-20401
|
07/15/2021 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from Prescott T. Jones. (SC) | | |
07/15/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC) | | 21-20428
|
07/16/2021 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant: 14 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief. (SC). | | 21-20595
|
07/21/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief (REJECTED PER TELEPHONE CONVERSATION WITH PRESCOTT T. JONES). (SC) | | |
07/21/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix (REJECTED PER TELEPHONE CONVERSATION WITH PRESCOTT T. JONES) (SC) | | |
07/21/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix (REJECTED PER TELEPHONE CONVERSATION WITH PRESCOTT T. JONES). (SC) | | |
07/28/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Cross-Appeal. (Appellant/Cross-Respondent, Patin)(SC) | | |
07/28/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Patin) (SC) | | 21-21820
|
07/28/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (Cross-Appeal) (SC) | | 21-21827
|
07/28/2021 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from Christian M. Morris. (SC) | | |
08/02/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC) | | 21-22436
|
08/02/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time to File Certificate of No Transcript Request (First Request). (SC) | | 21-22437
|
08/04/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 21-22616
|
08/16/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant/cross-respondent's motion for an extension of time to comply with NRAP 9 is granted. The certificate of no transcript request was filed on August 2, 2021. (SC) | | 21-23888
|
08/18/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 21-24102
|
09/24/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Micah S. Echols and David P. Snyder of Claggett & Sykes Law Firm as counsel for Respondent/Cross-Appellant). (SC) | | 21-27685
|
11/12/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-32500
|
11/12/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. (Opening Brief & Appendix due: 12/15/21.) (SC) | | 21-32502
|
12/15/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 12/16/21) (SC) | | |
12/15/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 1. (SC) | | 21-35786
|
12/15/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 2. (SC) | | 21-35787
|
12/15/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 3. (SC) | | 21-35788
|
12/15/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 4. (SC) | | 21-35789
|
12/15/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 5. (SC) | | 21-35790
|
12/15/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 6. (SC) | | 21-35792
|
12/15/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 7. (SC) | | 21-35793
|
12/15/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 8. (SC) | | 21-35794
|
12/15/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 9. (SC) | | 21-35795
|
12/16/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days. (SC) | | 21-35817
|
12/16/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-35840
|
01/18/2022 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Respondents/Cross-Appellant's Combined Answering Brief on Appeal and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal (First Request). (SC) | | 22-01775
|
01/19/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. (Combined Answering Brief on Appeal and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal due February 17, 2022) (SC) | | 22-01819
|
02/16/2022 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Respondents/Cross-Appellant's Combined Answering Brief on Appeal and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal (Second Request). (SC) | | 22-05168
|
02/25/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent and respondent/cross-appellant shall have until March 21, 2022, to file and serve the combined answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal. (SC) | | 22-06178
|
03/21/2022 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Respondents/Cross-Appellant's Combined Answering Brief on Appeal and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal (Third Request). (SC) | | 22-08779
|
03/29/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The motion requesting a third extension of time to file the combined answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal is granted. Respondent/cross-appellant and respondent shall have until April 20, 2022, to file and serve the combined brief. (SC) | | 22-09737
|
04/19/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondents'/Cross-Appellants' Answering Brief on Appeal and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal. (SC) | | 22-12433
|
04/19/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix of Respondents/Cross-Appellants, Volume 1. (SC) | | 22-12434
|
05/19/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief. (SC) | | 22-15896
|
05/19/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. (Reply Brief on Appeal and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal due: June 20, 2022) (SC) | | 22-15900
|
06/17/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time to File Combined Reply Brief on Appeal and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal (SECOND REQUEST). (SC) | | 22-19245
|
06/28/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant/cross-respondent's reply brief on appeal and answering brief on cross-appeal due: July 20, 2022. (SC) | | 22-20335
|
07/20/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Reply Brief and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal. (SC) | | 22-22869
|
07/20/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service (Reply Brief and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal). Due date: 7 days. | | 22-22874
|
07/21/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Certificate of Service for Appellant's Combined Reply Brief on Appeal and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal. (SC) | | 22-22943
|
07/26/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Reply Brief due: August 17, 2022. (SC) | | 22-23473
|
08/08/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondents'/Cross-Appellants' Reply Brief on Cross-Appeal. (SC) | | 22-24696
|
08/08/2022 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
11/30/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Scheduling Oral Argument. The matter is scheduled for oral argument on December 14, 2022, at 3:00 p.m. The parties may appear in person in either the Court's Las Vegas or its Carson City courtroom, since argument will proceed by video conference between the two courtrooms and shall notify the court at least 3 working days before the argument date in which courtroom they will appear. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. (SC) | | 22-37697
|
12/01/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's (Ingrid Patin and Patin Law Group) Notice of Appearance Charlie Finlayson. (SC) | | 22-37825
|
12/01/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance at Scheduled Oral Argument on behalf of Ingrid Patin and Patin Law Group. (SC) | | 22-37826
|
12/09/2022 | Brief | Filed Notice of Supplemental Authorities and Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief. (SC) | | 22-38761
|
12/13/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to File Supplemental Brief. On December 9, 2022, respondents/cross-appellants filed a motion for leave to file a supplemental brief. Cause appearing, the motion is granted. The supplemental brief was filed on December 9, 2022. (SC) | | 22-39017
|
12/14/2022 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before NNP. EC/KP/MG (SC) | | |
03/09/2023 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Reversal. "Order the district court's award of attorney fees REVERSED." fn3 [The Honorable Mark Gibbons, Senior Justice, participated in the decision of this matter under a general order of assignment] CADISH, J., dissenting. KP/MG/EC. (SC) | | 23-07174
|
03/17/2023 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent and Respondent/Cross-Appellant shall have until April 10, 2023, to file and serve the petition for rehearing. (SC) | | 23-08273
|
04/07/2023 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondents'/Cross-Appellants' Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 23-10695
|
04/07/2023 | Filing Fee | Filing fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from David P. Snyder. (SC) | | |
04/24/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Answer due: 14 days. (SC) | | 23-12686
|
05/02/2023 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondent's (Patin Law Group) Answer to Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 23-13746
|
05/02/2023 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant/cross-respondent's answer to petition for rehearing due: May 22, 2023. (SC) | | 23-13827
|
05/22/2023 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Answer to Petition for Rehearing (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 05/22/23) (SC) | | |
05/22/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection for Answer to Petition for Rehearing - No Notice of Appearance. Due in 5 days. (SC) | | 23-16096
|
05/22/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Notice of Appearance for Prescott T. Jones and Dylan E. Houston. (SC) | | 23-16124
|
05/23/2023 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Answer to Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 23-16195
|
05/30/2023 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). CADISH, J., dissenting KP/MG/EC. (SC) | | 23-16804
|
06/02/2023 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondent/Cross Appellant and Respondent's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC) | | 23-17469
|
06/20/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Answer due: 14 days. (SC) | | 23-19443
|
06/30/2023 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant/cross-respondent's answer to petition for en banc reconsideration due: July 19, 2023. (SC) | | 23-20886
|
07/18/2023 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration in Response to 6/20/23 Court Order. (SC) | | 23-22947
|
08/28/2023 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Granting En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition for en banc reconsideration and answer to the petition in this matter, we have determined that reconsideration is warranted. Accordingly, the petition for en banc reconsideration is granted and this matter shall stand submitted on the briefs and record previously filed. Pickering, J., dissenting. (SC) | | 23-28026
|
08/31/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Change of Address (Resnick & Louis P.C) (SC). | | 23-28605
|
01/22/2024 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Pickering, J., with whom Lee, J. agrees, concurring in part and dissenting in part.- EN BANC. (SC) | | 24-02457
|
02/16/2024 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur.(SC) | | 24-05830
|
02/16/2024 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.(SC) | | |
02/26/2024 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on 02/21/24. (SC) | | 24-05830
|