Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
07/20/2021 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC) | | |
07/20/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement and Notice of Briefing Schedule mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC) | | 21-20887
|
07/20/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Transcript Request. (SC) | | 21-20889
|
07/23/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 1/25/21, 3/8/21, 3/17/21, 4/9/21, and 6/21/21. To Court Reporter: Sunshine Litigation Services. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 7/23/21) (SC) | | |
07/23/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Transcript Request. (SC) | | 21-21312
|
07/23/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 1/25/21, 3/8/21, 3/17/21, 4/9/21, and 6/21/21. To Court Reporter: Sunshine Litigation Services. (SC) | | 21-21323
|
08/19/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant's Criminal Docketing Statement. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 8/19/21. (SC) | | |
08/19/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. (SC) | | 21-24230
|
08/19/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 21-24282
|
08/24/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Christina Amundson stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 4/19/21 and 4/28/21. (SC) | | 21-24687
|
08/24/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Peggy Hoogs stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 3/8/21 and 4/14/21. (SC) | | 21-24688
|
08/27/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve the docketing statement. (SC) | | 21-24951
|
08/27/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant's Criminal Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 21-25013
|
09/03/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter Peggy Hoogs stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 3/8/2021 and 4/14/2021. (SC) | | 21-25781
|
09/03/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter Christina Amundson stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 4/19/2021, and 4/28/2021. (SC) | | 21-25782
|
09/03/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter Lori Urmston stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 3/17/2021, 4/16/2021, 4/20/2021, and 4/29/2021. (SC) | | 21-25783
|
09/03/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter Corrie Wolden stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/25/2021, and 04/16/2021. (SC) | | 21-25785
|
09/03/2021 | Motion | Filed Court Reporter Litigation Services' Motion to Extend Time to File Transcripts. (SC) | | 21-25786
|
09/08/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Sunshine Litigation Services shall have until September 21, 2021, to file the requested transcripts in the district court and deliver copies to the requesting party. See NRAP 9(c)(1)(A). Within the same time period, Sunshine Litigation Services shall file a notice with this court that the completed transcripts have been filed and delivered. (SC) | | 21-26004
|
09/08/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Peggy B. Hoogs stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 4/26/21. (SC) | | 21-26067
|
09/08/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Constance S. Eisenberg stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 4/9/21. (SC) | | 21-26071
|
09/08/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Linda B. Shaw stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 6/21/21. (SC) | | 21-26072
|
09/28/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Erin T. Ferretto stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 4/21/21. (SC) | | 21-27922
|
09/28/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Corrie L. Wolden stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 4/23/21. (SC) | | 21-27925
|
09/28/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Peggy B. Hoogs stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 4/26/21. (SC) | | 21-27927
|
11/12/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 21-32485
|
11/12/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved for Opening Brief and Appendix. Due date December 17, 2021. (SC) | | 21-32494
|
12/17/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-35933
|
12/17/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Joint Appendix. Vol. 1. (SC) | | 21-35934
|
12/17/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Joint Appendix. Vol. 2. (SC) | | 21-35935
|
12/17/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Joint Appendix. Vol. 3. (SC) | | 21-35936
|
12/17/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Joint Appendix. Vol. 4. (SC) | | 21-35937
|
12/17/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Joint Appendix. Vol. 5. (SC) | | 21-35938
|
12/17/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Joint Appendix. Vol. 6. (SC) | | 21-35940
|
12/17/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Joint Appendix. Vol. 7 (SC) | | 21-35941
|
12/17/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Joint Appendix. Vol. 8 (SC) | | 21-35942
|
12/17/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Joint Appendix. Vol. 9 (SC) | | 21-35944
|
12/17/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Joint Appendix. Vol. 10 (SC) | | 21-35945
|
12/17/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Joint Appendix. Vol. 11 (SC) | | 21-35946
|
12/17/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Joint Appendix. Vol. 12 (SC) | | 21-35947
|
12/17/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Joint Appendix. Vol. 13 (SC) | | 21-35948
|
12/17/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Joint Appendix. Vol. 14 (SC) | | 21-35949
|
01/18/2022 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief. (SC) | | 22-01696
|
01/19/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved for Answering Brief. Due date February 17, 2022. (SC) | | 22-01844
|
02/17/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 22-05389
|
02/17/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 22-05390
|
02/17/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Transmit Exhibits. (SC) | | 22-05391
|
02/17/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Transmit Exhibits. (SC) | | 22-05392
|
02/17/2022 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 1. (SC) | | 22-05393
|
02/17/2022 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 1. (SC) | | 22-05394
|
02/17/2022 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 2. (SC) | | 22-05395
|
02/17/2022 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief. Vols. 3-12. (SC) | | 22-05403
|
02/25/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to Transmit Exhibits. The clerk of the district court shall have 14 days from the date of this order to transmit Exhibits 1 and 2 (audio-visual recordings) and Exhibits 104 and 105 (body-camera footage), admitted into evidence during the jury trial. (SC) | | 22-06186
|
04/05/2022 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. No reply brief filed. (SC) | | |
04/25/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | 22-12914
|
04/25/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |
06/22/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (SC) | | |
07/18/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. (SC) | | |
07/18/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. Returned Original Exhibits 1, 2, 104 and 105, to the 2nd JDC. (SC) | | 22-22443
|
07/18/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
08/01/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 20, 2022. (SC) | | 22-22443
|