Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
07/22/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court. (SC) | | |
07/22/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC) | | 21-21251
|
07/22/2021 | Other | Justice Kristina Pickering disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Law Firms. (SC) | | |
07/22/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC) | | 21-21254
|
07/26/2021 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellants: 14 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief. (SC) | | 21-21471
|
08/02/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Morris Law Group. Check no. 10573. (SC) | | |
08/02/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Motion to Consolidate Case Nos. 83258 and 83260. (SC) | | 21-22357
|
08/03/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 5/27/21. To Court Reporter: Unknown. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 8/3/21)(SC) | | |
08/03/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Transcript Request. (SC) | | 21-22579
|
08/04/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 5/27/21. To Court Reporter: Victoria Boyd. (SC) | | 21-22694
|
08/13/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellants' Civil Docketing Statement. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 8/16/21)(SC) | | |
08/16/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. (SC) | | 21-23710
|
08/16/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Deadline to File Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 21-23826
|
08/16/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 21-23827
|
08/17/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellants' motion for an extension of time to file the docketing statement is granted. The docketing statement was filed on August 16, 2021. (SC) | | 21-23997
|
08/20/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to Show Cause. Appellant's Response due: 30 days. Respondents may file any reply within 14 days of service of appellants' response. Briefing is suspended. | | 21-24307
|
09/19/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Amended Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 21-27083
|
09/19/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Response to Order to Show Cause. (SC) | | 21-27084
|
10/04/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Reply to Response to Order to Show Cause. (SC) | | 21-28404
|
12/13/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Consolidating and Partially Dismissing Appeals. Appellants have filed motions to consolidate these appeals. We grant the motions to consolidate. In addition, the parties have responded to this court's order to show cause in Docket No. 83258 as to why that appeal should not be partially dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. We conclude that this court lacks jurisdiction, and partially dismiss the appeals in these cases as they relate to that order. The briefing schedule in Docket No. 83258 is reinstated. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: 45 days. The motion for extension of time filed on November 19, 2021, in Docket No. 83260 is denied as moot. Nos 83258/83260 (SC) | | 21-35431
|
01/27/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1-5. Nos, 83258/83260 (SC) | | 22-02820
|
01/27/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Opening Brief. Nos. 83258/83260 (SC) | | 22-02821
|
02/23/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief. Nos. 83258/83260 (SC) | | 22-05877
|
02/23/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved for Answering Brief. Due date March 30, 2022. Nos. 83258/83260 (SC) | | 22-05956
|
03/29/2022 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol.1. Nos. 83258/83260 (SC) | | 22-09713
|
03/29/2022 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol.2. Nos. 83258/83260 (SC) | | 22-09714
|
03/29/2022 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol.3. Nos. 83258/83260 (SC) | | 22-09715
|
03/29/2022 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol.4. Nos. 83258/83260 (SC) | | 22-09716
|
03/29/2022 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol.5. Nos. 83258/83260 (SC) | | 22-09718
|
03/29/2022 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol.6. Nos. 83258/83260 (SC) | | 22-09719
|
03/29/2022 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol.7. Nos. 83258/83260 (SC) | | 22-09721
|
03/29/2022 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol.8. Nos. 83258/83260 (SC) | | 22-09722
|
03/29/2022 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol.9. Nos. 83258/83260 (SC) | | 22-09726
|
03/29/2022 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol.10. Nos. 83258/83260 (SC) | | 22-09728
|
03/29/2022 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol.11 Nos. 83258/83260 (SC) | | 22-09729
|
03/29/2022 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol.12. Nos. 83258/83260 (SC) | | 22-09730
|
03/29/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondents' Answering Brief. Nos. 83258/83260. (SC) | | 22-09746
|
04/25/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellants' Reply Brief due: May 12, 2022. Nos. 83258/83260. (SC) | | 22-13024
|
05/12/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Reply Brief. Nos 83258/83260 (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 5/13/22) (SC) | | |
05/13/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days. Nos 83258/83260 (SC) | | 22-15215
|
05/16/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Reply Brief. Nos. 83258/83260 (SC) | | 22-15451
|
05/16/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Supplemental Appendix to Reply Brief. Vol. 6. Nos. 83258/83260 (SC) | | 22-15452
|
05/16/2022 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. Nos. 83258/83260. (SC) | | |
08/11/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Nos. 83258/83260. (SC) | | 22-25222
|
09/16/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Vacating Judgment and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court VACATED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." SNP22-JH/LS/DH Nos. 83258/83260. (SC) | | 22-29045
|
10/04/2022 | Filing Fee | Rehearing Filing Fee Paid. $150.00 from Steve Morris. E-Payment Ref. no. 22100439569354. Nos. 83258/83260. (SC) | | |
10/04/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellants' Petition for Rehearing. Nos. 83258/83260. (SC) | | 22-31371
|
10/31/2022 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). Nos. 83258/83260 SNP-JH/LS/DH. (SC) | | 22-34059
|
11/28/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. Case No. 83258/83260 (SC) | | 22-36962
|
11/28/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. Nos. 83258/83260. (SC) | | |
12/15/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on November 29, 2022. Nos. 83258/83260 (SC) | | 22-36962
|