Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
08/04/2021 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC) | | |
08/04/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 21-22621
|
08/10/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Attorney General to Obtain and Transmit Certified Copies of Notice of Appeal Log or Other Log Maintained by the Prison. Due: 30 days. Nos. 83324/83325. (SC) | | 21-23248
|
08/13/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance for Respondents (Trisha Chapman, Deputy Attorney General as counsel for Respondent). (SC) | | 21-23640
|
08/30/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Compliance with Court's Order Directing Attorney General to Obtain and Transmit Certified Copies of Notice of Appeal Log or Other Log Maintained by the Prison. (SC) | | 21-25256
|
08/31/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Allowing Appeals to Proceed and Remanding for the Appointment of Counsel. These appeals are remanded to the district court for the limited purpose of securing counsel for appellant. District court's order appointing counsel due: 35 days. Nos. 83324, 83325 (SC) | | 21-25427
|
09/02/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Withdrawal of Attorneys (Attorney General Aaron D. Ford and Deputy Attorney General Trisha Chapman). (SC) | | 21-25572
|
09/03/2021 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on September 3, 2021. This matter is referred to Krista Meier, Esq., Appointed Conflict Administrator, to appoint appellate counsel for Petitioner. (SC) | | 21-25791
|
09/14/2021 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order Appointing Counsel. Filed certified copy of order filed in district court on 09/13/21 appointing Karla K. Butko, Esq. as counsel for appellant. (SC) | | 21-26506
|
09/14/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The attorney general's office has filed a notice of withdrawal as counsel of record for respondent in these appeals. The clerk of this court shall remove attorney general Aaron Ford and deputy attorney general Trisha Chapman from the dockets in these appeals as counsel for respondent. Respondent shall continue to be represented by attorney Jennifer P. Noble of the Washoe County District Attorney's Office. (SC) | | 21-26563
|
09/29/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Setting Briefing Schedule. The clerk of this court shall add Ms. Butko as counsel of record for appellant in this appeal. Appellant's transcript request form and docketing statement due: 21 days. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: 120 days. (SC) | | 21-28021
|
10/18/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant's Criminal Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 21-29816
|
10/18/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Consolidate case no. 83325 and 83324. (SC) | | 21-29819
|
10/18/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 6/28/21. To Court Reporter: C. Wolden. (SC) | | 21-29822
|
10/20/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Consolidating Appeals. These appeals shall be consolidated for all appellate purposes. Appellant's single opening brief and an appendix are due January 27, 2022. Nos 83324/83325. (SC) | | 21-30112
|
11/24/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Corrie Wolden stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 6/28/21. Nos. 83324/83325 (SC) | | 21-33844
|
01/24/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. Nos. 83324/83325 (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 1/24/22) (SC) | | |
01/24/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix. Nos. 83324/83325 (SC) | | 22-02360
|
01/24/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. Nos. 83324/83325 (Duplicate filing) (SC) | | |
01/24/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix. Nos. 83324/83325 (Duplicate filing) (SC) | | 22-02362
|
01/24/2022 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. Nos. 83324/83325 (SC) | | 22-02365
|
01/24/2022 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. Nos. 83324/83325 (Duplicate filing) (SC) | | 22-02366
|
01/24/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days. Nos. 83324/83325 (SC) | | 22-02382
|
01/24/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. Nos. 83324/83325 (SC) | | 22-02392
|
02/23/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent's Answering Brief due: March 9, 2022. Nos. 83324/83325. (SC) | | 22-05856
|
03/09/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Notice of Appearance for Marilee Cate. Nos. 83324/83325 (SC) | | 22-07562
|
03/09/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Notice of Appearance for Marilee Cate. (Duplicate filing) Nos. 83324/83325 (SC) | | 22-07563
|
03/09/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. Nos. 83324/83325 (SC) | | 22-07564
|
03/09/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. Nos. 83324/83325 (Duplicate filing) (SC) | | 22-07565
|
03/09/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Transmit Presentence Investigation Reports. Nos. 83324/83325 (SC) | | 22-07566
|
03/09/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Transmit Presentence Investigation Reports. Nos. 83324/83325 (Duplicate filing) (SC) | | 22-07567
|
03/21/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to Transmit Presentence Investigation Reports. Due: 14 days. Nos. 83324/83325. (SC) | | 22-08816
|
03/24/2022 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed (SEALED) Presentence Investigation Report from District Court Clerk (83324). Nos. 83324/83325 (SC) | | |
03/24/2022 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Documents from District Court Clerk. Presentence Investigation Report from District Court Clerk (83325). (Sealed) Nos. 83324/83325 (SC) | | |
04/27/2022 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. No reply brief filed. Nos. 83324/83325. (SC) | | |
05/20/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. Nos. 83324/83325. (SC). | | 22-16079
|
05/20/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. Nos. 83324/83325. (SC). | | |
07/08/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgments of conviction AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB Nos. 83324/83325. (SC) | | |
08/02/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. Nos. 83324/83325. (SC) | | |
08/02/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. Nos. 83324/83325. (SC) | | 22-24180
|
08/02/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. Nos. 83324/83325. (SC) | | |
08/16/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 4, 2022. Nos. 83324/83325. (SC) | | 22-24180
|