Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
08/06/2021 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC) | | |
08/06/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement and Notice of Briefing Schedule mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC) | | 21-22910
|
08/09/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Copy of District Court Minutes. (SC) | | 21-23105
|
08/20/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 03/09/21, 07/01/21, 07/27/21 and 08/03/21. To Court Reporter: R. Page, Eighth Judicial District Court Department 21. (SC) | | 21-24384
|
08/27/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant's Criminal Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 21-25088
|
10/19/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Court Reporter's Notice of Appellant's Failure to Pay Deposit. (SC). | | 21-30051
|
10/22/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Robin Page stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 3/9/21, 7/1/21, 7/27/21, and 8/3/21. (SC) | | 21-30540
|
12/06/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: December 20, 2021. (SC) | | 21-34680
|
12/20/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-36275
|
12/21/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Appendix to Opening Brief. Due date: 7 days. (SC) | | 21-36367
|
12/21/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 1. (SC) | | 21-36379
|
01/18/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Notice of Appearance for John Afshar. (SC) | | 22-01720
|
01/18/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief. (SC) | | 22-01722
|
01/19/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved for Answering Brief. Due date February 22, 2022. (SC) | | 22-01851
|
02/18/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 22-05408
|
02/18/2022 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 1. (SC) | | 22-05409
|
02/18/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Transmit Presentence Investigation Report. (SC) | | 22-05410
|
02/28/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to Transmit Presentence Investigation Report. Due: 14 days. (SC) | | 22-06336
|
03/07/2022 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed (SEALED) Presentence Investigation Report from District Court Clerk. (SC) | | |
03/23/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief. (SC) | | 22-09192
|
03/25/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Reply Brief due: 7 days. (SC) | | 22-09396
|
04/13/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief. (DETACHED REPLY BRIEF AND FILED SEPARATELY PER ORDER FILED 4/19/22). (SC) | | 22-11738
|
04/19/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall detach the reply brief from the motion filed on April 13, 2022, and file it separately. (SC) | | 22-12310
|
04/19/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 22-12311
|
04/19/2022 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
08/18/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for September 15, 2022, at 10:00 a.m., in Las Vegas. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. (SC) | | 22-25887
|
08/22/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Reschedule Oral Argument. (SC) | | 22-26174
|
08/22/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Reschedule Oral Argument. (SC) | | 22-26209
|
08/22/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice of Appearance for Alexis E. Minichini. (SC) | | 22-26213
|
08/26/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Respondent has filed a motion to reschedule oral argument in this appeal. Appellant opposed the motion. The motion is denied. Oral argument remains scheduled in this appeal for September 15, 2022, at 10:00 a.m., in Las Vegas. (SC) | | 22-26873
|
08/31/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC) | | 22-27383
|
09/01/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice of Appearance for Baylie A. Hellman. (SC) | | 22-27544
|
09/15/2022 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel. JH/LS/DH. (SC). | | |
11/23/2022 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Vacated." Before: Hardesty/Stiglich/Herndon. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Stiglich/Herndon. 138 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 74. SNP22-JH/LS/DH. (SC). | | 22-36844
|
12/09/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Request for Expedited Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-38695
|
12/09/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Opposition to Appellant's Petition for Expedited Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-38704
|
12/09/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Reply to Respondent's Response to Appellant's request for Expedited Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-38755
|
12/12/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondents petition for rehearing due: December 27, 2022. (SC) | | 22-38813
|
12/14/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion For Release Pending Further Review. (SC) | | 22-39256
|
12/14/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Opposition to Appellant's Motion for Release Pending Review Pursuant to NRAP 23(c). (SC) | | 22-39286
|
12/16/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motions. Appellant has filed a motion requesting expedited issuance of the remittitur and a motion requesting his release pending further review. Respondent opposes the motions. The motions are denied. (SC) | | 22-39457
|
12/27/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondent's Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 22-40501
|
12/27/2022 | Filing Fee | Rehearing Filing fee waived. (SC) | | |
12/29/2022 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). SNP22 - JH/LS/DH. (SC) | | 22-40882
|
01/09/2023 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondent's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC) | | 23-00697
|
01/25/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Answer due: 14 days. (SC) | | 23-02419
|
02/08/2023 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 2/9/23) (SC) | | |
02/09/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC) | | 23-03998
|
02/10/2023 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC) | | 23-04210
|
03/03/2023 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC (SC) | | 23-06395
|
03/13/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Expedite Remittitur. (SC) | | 23-07705
|
03/14/2023 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Non-Opposition to Renewed Motion for Expedited Remittitur. (SC) | | 23-07755
|
03/15/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Cause appearing, appellant's unopposed motion for an expedited issuance of the remittitur is granted. The clerk of this court shall issue the remittitur forthwith. (SC) | | 23-07912
|
03/15/2023 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 23-07913
|
03/15/2023 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
03/23/2023 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court County Clerk on March 16, 2023. (SC) | | 23-07913
|