Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
08/18/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
08/18/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 21-24121
|
08/18/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 21-24123
|
09/13/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (Second NOA) (SC) | | 21-26467
|
09/13/2021 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Letter. Regarding Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (SC) | | 21-26468
|
09/13/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Proper Person Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 21-26470
|
09/20/2021 | Brief | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-27148
|
09/20/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. Proper Person Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-27154
|
09/20/2021 | Other | Returned Unfiled Document - Proper Person Appendix Attached to Brief. (SC) | | 21-27157
|
09/28/2021 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 09/13/21. Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (SEALED). (SC) | | |
09/29/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Waiving Filing Fee. In light of the district court's September 13, 2021, order granting appellant's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, no filing fee is due for this appeal. NRAP 24(a)(2). The clerk of this court shall file appellant's brief received on September 9, 2021. Respondent's answering brief due: 30 days. Appellant shall have 30 days from service of the answering brief to file and serve a reply brief. (SC) | | 21-27993
|
09/29/2021 | Brief | Filed Proper Person Brief of Appellant's on Hate. (SC) | | 21-28001
|
10/07/2021 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Notice of Motion. (SC) | | 21-28796
|
10/12/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant has filed a pro se notice of motion. As appellant does not request any specific relief from this court therein, this court will take no action on the notice of motion. (SC) | | 21-29272
|
10/14/2021 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Notice of Motion. (SC) | | 21-29582
|
10/14/2021 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Notice of Motion. (SC) | | 21-29583
|
10/14/2021 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Notice of Motion. (SC) | | 21-29584
|
10/19/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant has filed three pro se notices of motions. As appellant does not request any specific relief from this court, this court will take no action on the notices filed on October 14, 2021. (SC) | | 21-30015
|
10/20/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Transmission of Record. Record due: 30 days. (SC) | | 21-30220
|
10/22/2021 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Notice of Motion. (SC) | | 21-30536
|
10/25/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal. (A832762) Vol. 1. (SC) | | 21-30650
|
10/26/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant has filed a pro se notice of motion. As appellant does not request any specific relief from this court, this court will take no action on the notice. (SC) | | 21-30887
|
10/28/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal. (SEALED) pages 204-209 and 212-213. (SC) | | |
11/09/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Notice of Motion. (SC) | | 21-32162
|
11/12/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Notice of Motion. (SC) | | 21-32540
|
11/12/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Notice of Motion. (SC) | | 21-32542
|
11/15/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Any relief requested in appellant's pro se notice of motion, filed on November 9, 2021, is denied. (SC) | | 21-32670
|
11/15/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Notice of Motion. (SC) | | 21-32746
|
11/16/2021 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
11/16/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. As the pro se notices of motion filed on November 12 and 15, 2021, do not request any action from this court, this court takes no action on them. (SC) | | 21-32922
|
11/16/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Notice of Motion. (SC) | | 21-32962
|
11/19/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. As appellant's pro se, November 16, 2021, notice of motion does not request any action from this court, this court takes no action on it. (SC) | | 21-33437
|
11/29/2021 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Notice of Motion. (SC) | | 21-33993
|
12/06/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Notice of Motion. (SC) | | 21-34722
|
12/06/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Notice of Motion. (SC) | | 21-34725
|
12/13/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Notice of Motion. (SC) | | 21-35420
|
12/15/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant has filed four pro se notices of motions. As the notices do not request any action from this court, this court takes no action on them. (SC) | | 21-35758
|
12/17/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Notice of Motion. (SC) | | 21-36073
|
12/20/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Notice of Motion. (SC) | | 21-36228
|
12/21/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Notice of Motion. (SC) | | 21-36389
|
12/21/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Notice of Motion. (SC) | | 21-36390
|
12/22/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Notice of Motion. (SC) | | 21-36531
|
12/23/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant has filed, in pro se, four notices of motions. Any relief requested in the notices is denied. (SC) | | 21-36683
|
01/03/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Notice of Motion. (SC) | | 22-00158
|
01/05/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant has filed a pro se notice of motion. As the notice does not request any relief from this court, this court takes no action on it. (SC) | | 22-00387
|
01/07/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Notice of Motion. (SC) | | 22-00734
|
01/10/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant has filed a pro se notice of motion. As the notice of motion does not request any relief from this court, this court takes no action on it. (SC) | | 22-00923
|
01/12/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Notice of Motion. (SC) (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS PER 01/21/22) | | 22-01266
|
01/21/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | 22-02137
|
01/21/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |
03/11/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (SC) | | |
04/05/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. (SC) | | |
04/05/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-10598
|
04/05/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
04/29/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on April 6, 2022. (SC) | | 22-10598
|