Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
09/21/2021 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing fee waived. (SC). | | |
09/21/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC). | | 21-27257
|
09/29/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. (SC) | | 21-28006
|
10/11/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 6/25/21-7/9/21 and 7/12/21. To Court Reporter: Isolde Zihn. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILE ON 10/11/21) (SC) | | |
10/11/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. (SC) | | 21-29083
|
10/12/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Transcript Request. (DETACHED TRANSCRIPT REQUEST FORM AND RETURNED UNFILED PER ORDER 10/18/2021). (SC) | | 21-29255
|
10/18/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The clerk of this court shall detach the transcript request form from the motion filed on October 12, 2021, and return it unfiled. Appellant shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve a transcript request form that complies with NRAP 9(a)(3). (SC) | | 21-29925
|
10/21/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 6/25/21-7/9/21. To Court Reporter: Isolde Zihn. (SC) | | 21-30436
|
01/18/2022 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 22-01668
|
01/18/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. (Opening Brief and Appendix due February 18, 2022) (SC) | | 22-01670
|
02/18/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix (Second Request). (SC) | | 22-05561
|
02/25/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: March 11, 2022. (SC) | | 22-06172
|
03/10/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 22-07723
|
03/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Vols. I through VII. (SC) | | 22-07725
|
04/11/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent's answering brief due: April 25, 2022. (SC) | | 22-11331
|
04/25/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 22-13075
|
04/25/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Transmit Exhibit. (SC) | | 22-13077
|
05/03/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 22-14078
|
05/03/2022 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
05/04/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to Transmit Exhibit. The clerk of the district court shall have 14 days from the date of this order to transmit to this court trial exhibit 20, described as an audiovisual recording of appellant's police interview. (SC) | | 22-14227
|
08/29/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. (SC) | | 22-26993
|
09/28/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of conviction REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." PICKERING , J., dissenting. NNP22 - AS/EC/KP. (SC) | | 22-30460
|
10/17/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondent's Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 22-32640
|
10/25/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Transferring Case En Banc and Directing Refiling of Panel Petition and Answer. This case is hereby transferred from NNP22 to the en banc court. Respondent's en banc reconsideration due: 7 days. The appellant shall have 14 days after the State files its petition for en banc reconsideration within which to file an answer. (SC) | | 22-33537
|
11/01/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondent's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC) | | 22-34301
|
11/07/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC) | | 22-35031
|
11/23/2022 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Granting En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition for en banc reconsideration and answer filed in this matter, we conclude that reconsideration is warranted. Accordingly, the petition for en banc reconsideration is granted and this matter shall stand submitted on the briefs and record previously filed. fn1[ The Honorable Abbi Silver having retired, this matter was decided by a six-justice court.] (SC) | | 22-36834
|
01/11/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Supplemental Briefing. Supplemental briefs due: 21 days. Each party shall have 14 days within which to file a responding brief to the opposing party's supplemental brief. No extensions of time will be granted, except on a showing of extraordinary cause.
(SC) | | 23-00916
|
01/26/2023 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Supplemental Brief. (SC). | | 23-02623
|
02/01/2023 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Supplemental Brief. (SC) | | 23-03198
|
02/15/2023 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Reply to Supplemental Brief. (SC) | | 23-04735
|
02/16/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Amended Certificate of Compliance to Reply to Supplemental Brief. (SC) | | 23-04760
|
03/09/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Inviting Amicus Curiae Participation. This court has determined that briefing by amicus curiae may be helpful to this court's consideration and resolution of this appeal. Therefore, the Nevada Attorneys for Criminal Justice (NACJ) and the Nevada District Attorneys Association (NDAA) are invited to participate as amicus curiae in this proceeding. Should the NACJ and NDAA elect to participate as amici curiae, they shall file and serve their briefs within 21 days of the date of this order that shall not exceed 10 pages and shall otherwise comply with the requirements of NRAP 32(a)(4)-(6). No response to the amicus briefs shall be filed unless ordered by this court. (SC) | | 23-07299
|
03/28/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Amicus Curiae's (Nevada District Attorney's Association) Notice of Appearance for Alexander Chen in Response to Court Order filed 03/09/23. (SC) | | 23-09498
|
03/28/2023 | Brief | Filed Amicus Curiae's (Nevada District Attorneys Association) Amicus Brief. (SC) | | 23-09500
|
03/31/2023 | Motion | Filed Amicus Curiae (Nevada Attorneys for Criminal Justice) Motion to Extend Time to File Amicus Brief. (SC) | | 23-09913
|
04/03/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Nevada Attorneys for Criminal Justice (NACJ) shall have until April 7, 2023, to file and serve an amicus brief. (SC) | | 23-10118
|
04/03/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter is scheduled for oral argument on May 2, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. in Carson City. Argument shall be limited to 60 minutes. (SC) | | 23-10149
|
04/06/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Notice of Voluntary Disclousure for Justice Linda Bell. The Parties shall have until April 10, 2023, to file a motion for disqualification pursuant to NRAP 35 based on my disclousures. (SC) | | 23-10570
|
04/07/2023 | Brief | Filed Amicus Curiae (Nevada Attorneys for Criminal Justice) Amicus Brief. (SC) | | 23-10671
|
04/07/2023 | Motion | Filed Amicus Curiae's (Nevada Attorneys for Criminal Justice) Motion for Leave to Participate in Oral Argument. (SC) | | 23-10672
|
04/10/2023 | Motion | Filed Amicus Curiae's (Nevada District Attorneys Association) Motion for Leave to Participate in Oral Argument. (SC) | | 23-10763
|
04/18/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The Nevada Attorneys for Criminal Justice (NACJ), amicus curiae in this appeal, has moved this court for permission to participate in the oral argument currently scheduled for May 2, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. in Carson City. Cause appearing, the motion is granted. The NACJ shall share the time allotted to appellant as determined by appellant and the NACJ. Argument shall be limited to 60 minutes. (SC) | | 23-11828
|
04/18/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The Nevada District Attorney's Association (NDAA), amicus curiae in this appeal, has moved this court for permission to participate in the oral argument currently scheduled for May 2, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. in Carson City. Cause appearing, the motion is granted. The NDAA shall share the time allotted to respondent as determined by respondent and the NDAA. Argument shall be limited to 60 minutes. (SC) | | 23-11829
|
04/18/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC) | | 23-11903
|
04/20/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Amicus Curiae's (Nevada Attorneys for Criminal Justice) Notice of Appearance for Oral Arguments for Katheryn Hickman. (SC) | | 23-12392
|
04/24/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Media Request. Oral Arguments May 2, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. (SC) | | 23-12639
|
04/24/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Media Request. A request having been made by Ben Margiott with News 4-FOX11 seeking access to the Supreme Court oral arguments for the purpose of photographic or electronic coverage of the hearing to be held on May 2, 2023, beginning at 10:00 a.m., in the Carson City courtroom, in the above-entitled matter; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that permission is granted for photographic or electronic media coverage of the court proceedings, for news purposes and not for commercial exploitation. All equipment necessary to allow for such photographic or electronic coverage of such proceedings shall be in place 15 minutes prior to the start of argument. | | 23-12696
|
05/02/2023 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. (SC) | | |
04/12/2024 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction Affirmed." CADISH, C.J., with whom STIGLICH and BELL, JJ., agree, dissenting. STIGLICH, J., with whom BELL, J. agrees, dissenting. EN BANC. (SC) | | 24-12910
|