Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/10/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
01/10/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 20-01251
|
01/10/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 20-01255
|
01/13/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance (Ariel E. Stern, Esq., and Scott R. Lachman, Esq., of Akerman LLP as counsel for Respondent Bank of America, N.A.). (SC) | | 20-01475
|
01/16/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Roger P. Croteau. Check no. 22607. (SC) | | |
01/17/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due 21 days. (SC) | | 20-02385
|
01/21/2020 | Filing Fee | Returned Filing Fee. Check No. 22611 returned to Roger P. Croteau & Associates. (SC) | | |
01/22/2020 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Stephen E. Haberfeld. (SC) | | 20-02933
|
02/03/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for March 25, 2020, at 2:00 PM. (SC) | | 20-04665
|
02/03/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 20-04731
|
02/04/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Certificate of Service Upon Settlement Judge. (SC) | | 20-04842
|
02/11/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Amended ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for March 25, 2020, at 2:00 PM. (SC) | | 20-05703
|
03/09/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: May 20, 2020, at 10:30 AM. (SC) | | 20-09334
|
05/21/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: June 24, 2020, at 2:00 PM via video conference. (SC) | | 20-19446
|
06/24/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance (Melanie D. Morgan of Akerman LLP as counsel for respondent Bank of America, N.A.). (SC) | | 20-23415
|
06/24/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. Notice of Appearance. (SC) | | 20-23437
|
06/24/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Certificate of Service (Notice of Appearance on Settlement Judge). (SC) | | 20-23491
|
07/07/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The arbitrator intends to remain in contact with counsel and to make a final report to the court, without requesting an extension of time to file the final report. (SC). | | 20-25055
|
07/20/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC) | | 20-26444
|
07/22/2020 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 20-26810
|
08/06/2020 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 09/10/19. To Court Reporter: Maria Garibay. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 08/06/20). (SC) | | |
08/06/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. Request for Transcript of Proceedings. (SC) | | 20-29050
|
09/29/2020 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Maria Garibay stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 09/10/19. (SC) | | 20-35680
|
10/20/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix and for Leave to Late File Transcript Request Form (First Request). (TRANSCRIPT REQUEST FORM DETACHED AND FILED PER 10/28/20 ORDER). (SC) | | 20-38415
|
10/28/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: December 21, 2020. Appellant's request for leave to late-file the transcript request form is granted. The clerk of this court shall detach the transcript request form from the motion filed on October 20, 2020, and shall file it separately. (SC) | | 20-39428
|
10/28/2020 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 9/10/19 To Court Reporter: none listed. (SC) | | 20-39431
|
12/21/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Volume 1. (SC) | | 20-46124
|
12/21/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Volume 2. (SC) | | 20-46125
|
12/21/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Volume 3. (SC) | | 20-46126
|
12/21/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Volume 4. (SC) | | 20-46127
|
12/21/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Volume 5. (SC) | | 20-46128
|
12/21/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Volume 6. (SC) | | 20-46129
|
12/21/2020 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 20-46130
|
01/19/2021 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Time Extension for Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-01569
|
01/21/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondent's Answering Brief due: February 19, 2021. (SC) | | 21-01777
|
02/19/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Unopposed Motion for Time Extension for Bank of America, N.A.'s Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-04996
|
02/26/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent shall have until March 22, 2021, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC) | | 21-05778
|
03/02/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Stay Appeal and to Hold All Deadlines in Abeyance. (SC) | | 21-06121
|
03/09/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent Bank of America, N.A.'s Opposition to Motion to Stay. (SC) | | 21-06893
|
03/12/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Reply to Opposition to Motion to Stay (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 03/15/21). (SC) | | |
03/15/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. Reply to Opposition to Motion to Stay. (SC) | | 21-07359
|
03/18/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Reply to Opposition to Motion to Stay. (SC) | | 21-07846
|
03/22/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-08218
|
05/24/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant has filed a motion to stay the proceedings in this appeal. This court concludes that there is no basis to postpone the briefing of this appeal. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve a reply brief, if deemed necessary. (SC) | | 21-14770
|
06/21/2021 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend Time to File Reply Brief (First Request). (SC) | | 21-17821
|
06/25/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant shall have until July 23, 2021, to file and serve the reply brief. (SC) | | 21-18350
|
07/22/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief (Second Request). (SC) | | 21-21252
|
08/02/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Reply Brief due: August 23, 2021. (SC) | | 21-22258
|
08/23/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 21-24603
|
08/24/2021 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
10/04/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | 21-28319
|
10/04/2021 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Supreme Court. (COA). | | |
10/04/2021 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |
01/27/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (COA) | | 22-02796
|
01/27/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (SC) | | |
02/22/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Supreme Court. (COA) | | |
02/22/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. (SC) | | |
02/22/2022 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. (COA) | | |
02/22/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-05742
|
02/22/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
03/04/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on February 23, 2022. (SC) | | 22-05742
|