Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 83724
Short Caption:R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO CO. VS. DIST. CT. (CAMACHO)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):82654
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A807650Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/16/2022How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/05/2021Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from Dennis L. Kennedy. (SC)
11/05/2021Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. (SC)21-31848
11/05/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1. (SC)21-31849
11/05/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 2. (SC)21-31850
11/05/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 3. (SC)21-31852
11/05/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 4. (SC)21-31853
11/05/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 5. (SC)21-31854
11/05/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 6. (SC)21-31856
11/16/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Real party in interest's answer due: 28 days. Petitioner shall have 14 days from service of the answer to file and serve any reply. (SC)21-32928
11/17/2021MotionFiled Petitioner R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company's Motion to Consolidate. (SC)21-33162
11/19/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Cause appearing, and despite real party in interest, R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company's opposition, petitioners' motion for a voluntary dismissal of the petition in Docket No. 82654 is granted. "The petition is dismissed." The parties to bear their own attorney fees and costs. R.J. Reynolds' motions to consolidate these matters are denied as moot. SNP21 - RP/LS/AS. Nos. 82654/83724. (SC)21-33398
12/15/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Real party in interests Sandra Camacho and Anthony Camacho's answer to writ petition ​due: December 28, 2021. (SC)21-35681
12/16/2021Petition/WritFiled Real Parties in Interest (Camacho) Answer to Petition for Writ. (SC)21-35924
12/16/2021AppendixFiled Real Parties in Interest (Camacho) Appendix to Answer to Petition for Writ. Vol. 1. (SC)21-35926
01/07/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order to File Documents. To date real parties ASM Nationwide Corporation d/b/a Silverado Smokes & Cigars; Liggett Group, Inc.; and Philip Morris, USA, Inc. have not filed answers to the petition. Those real parties in interest shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve their answers to the petition. Petitioner shall have 21 days from the date of this order to file and serve any reply to the answers. (SC)22-00663
01/14/2022Petition/WritFiled Real Parties in Interests' (Philip Morris USA Inc.'s , Liggett Group LLC's, and ASM Nationwide Corporation) Answer to and Joinder in R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company's Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. (SC)22-01507
01/28/2022Petition/WritFiled Petitioner's Reply to Answer to Petition. (SC)22-02992
06/16/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC)22-19166
06/24/2022Notice/IncomingFiled Petitioner's Notice of Appearance for Valentin Leppert and Ursula Marie Henninger. (SC)22-20097
06/29/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The clerk of this court shall add attorneys Valentin Leppert and Ursula Marie Henninger of King & Spalding, LLP, to the docket as associated counsel for petitioner. (SC)22-20523
07/28/2022Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition denied." Before: Silver/Cadish/Pickering. Author: Cadish, J. Majority: Silver/Cadish. Pickering, J., concurring in result only. 138 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 55. NNP22-AS/EC/KP. (SC).22-23674
08/15/2022Filing FeeRehearing Filing Fee Paid. $150.00 from John R. Bailey. E-Payment Ref. no. 22081530513893. (SC)
08/15/2022Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petitioner's Petition for Rehearing. (SC)22-25506
08/24/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Real Parties in Interest's Answer due: 14 days. (SC)22-26425
09/02/2022MotionFiled Real Parties in Interests' (Sandra and Anthony Camacho) Motion to Extend Time to File Answer to Petition for Rehearing. (SC)22-27614
09/07/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Real parties in interest Sandra Camacho and Anthony Camacho shall have until October 7, 2022, to file and serve the answer to the petition for rehearing. (SC)22-27960
10/07/2022Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Real Parties in Interest (Sandra Camacho and Anthony Camacho) Answer to Petition for Rehearing. (SC)22-31768
10/25/2022Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing is denied." PICKERING, J., concurring in part and dissenting in part. fn1 [Having retired, the Honorable Abbie Silver did not participate in the decision on rehearing.] (SC)22-33631
10/31/2022Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Petitioner's En Banc Reconsideration due: November 22, 2022. (SC)22-33998
11/22/2022Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petitioners' Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC)22-36747
12/09/2022Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC. fn1[The Honorable Justice Silver having retired did not participate in the decision on reconsideration] (SC)22-38662
01/03/2023RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. (SC)23-00033
01/03/2023Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)