Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
07/13/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
07/13/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 21-20140
|
07/13/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 21-20144
|
07/13/2021 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from Lisa M. Szyc. Reference no. 21071353795039(SC) | | |
07/14/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC) | | 21-20221
|
07/14/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Racheal H. Mastel as counsel for Respondent) (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 07/14/21). (SC) | | |
07/14/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Of Rejection - No Notice Of Appearance (Edward l. Kainen). (SC) | | 21-20343
|
07/20/2021 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: James J. Jimmerson. (SC) | | 21-20806
|
07/20/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Association of Co-Counsel (Racheal H. Mastel of the Kainen Law Group as counsel for Respondent). (SC) | | 21-20828
|
07/21/2021 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Pursuant to the notice of appearance filed July 20, 2021, the clerk of this court shall add attorney Racheal H. Mastel of the law firm Kainen Law Group as co-counsel for respondent. (SC) | | 21-20932
|
07/21/2021 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Settlement Judge Reassignment. Issued Amended Notice of Assignment to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. New Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt. (SC) | | 21-20949
|
07/28/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. (SC) | | 21-21885
|
07/30/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 21-22213
|
08/02/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: December 2, 2020 and May 25, 2021. To Court Reporter: Department Q/Verbatim Reporting & Transcription (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 08/02/21). (SC) | | |
08/02/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Transcript Request. (SC) | | 21-22354
|
08/03/2021 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 90 days opening brief. (SC) | | 21-22518
|
08/03/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 12/02/20 and 05/25/21. To Court Reporter: Department Q/Verbatim Reporting & Transcription. (SC) | | 21-22582
|
08/04/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Corrected Order Reinstating Briefing. Appellant shall have 40 days from the date of this order to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix. (SC) | | 21-22607
|
08/19/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Maria Balagtas stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/02/20 and 05/25/21. (SC) | | 21-24202
|
09/13/2021 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Child Custody Fast Track Statement. (SC) | | 21-26476
|
09/13/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Vol I. (SC) | | 21-26477
|
09/14/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. Child Custody Fast Track Statement. (SC) | | 21-26531
|
09/15/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service (Child Custody Fast Track Statement). (SC) | | 21-26731
|
10/01/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent's fast track response due: October 11, 2021. (SC) | | 21-28276
|
10/11/2021 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Respondent's Fast Track Response. (SC) | | 21-29184
|
11/16/2021 | Case Status Update | Fast Track Briefing Completed. (SC) | | |
12/29/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | 21-36968
|
12/29/2021 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |
12/29/2021 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Supreme Court. (COA). | | |
01/05/2022 | Other | Judge Jerome T. Tao disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Lawyers and Judges | | |
02/17/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER this matter REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." fn1[The Honorable Jerome T. Tao, Judge, did not participate in the decision of this matter.] Court of Appeals-MG/BB (COA) | | 22-05304
|
02/17/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER this matter REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." fn1[The Honorable Jerome T. Tao, Judge, did not participate in the decision of this matter.] Court of Appeals-MG/BB (SC) | | |
03/07/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. (SC) | | |
03/07/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondent's Petition for Review. (SC) | | 22-07244
|
03/07/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Supreme Court. (SC) | | |
03/07/2022 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. (SC) | | |
03/25/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Answer to Petition for Review. Appellant's Answer due: 14 days. (SC) | | 22-09341
|
04/07/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Answer to Petition for Review. (Reply Brief to Respondent's Petition for Review). (SC) | | 22-10944
|
04/21/2022 | Post-Judgment Order/Dispositional | Order Denying Petition for Review. "Review denied." EN BANC (SC) | | 22-12683
|
04/21/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-12688
|
04/21/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
04/29/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on April 22, 2022. (SC) | | 22-12688
|