Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/12/2022 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
01/12/2022 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 22-01315
|
01/12/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee/Proper Person. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 14 days. (SC) | | 22-01317
|
01/18/2022 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Lisa Breslaw. Money Order no. 19-348993433. (SC) | | |
01/19/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Regarding Deadlines. (SC) | | 22-01978
|
01/21/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Transmission of Record. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. (SC) | | 22-02126
|
01/31/2022 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Recorder Gina Villani stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 01/04/2022. (SC) | | 22-03171
|
01/31/2022 | Transcript Request | Filed Proper Person Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 01/04/2022. To Court Reporter: Gina Villani/Rebeca Gomez. (SC) | | 22-03176
|
01/31/2022 | Docketing Statement | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 22-03177
|
01/31/2022 | Brief | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief. (SC) | | 22-03178
|
01/31/2022 | Transcript | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Copy of Transcript of Proceedings for 01/04/2022. (SC) | | 22-03179
|
02/02/2022 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal. (A837948) Vol. 1 Part 1. (SC) | | 22-03473
|
02/02/2022 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal. (A837948) Vol. 1 Part 2. (SC) | | 22-03474
|
02/02/2022 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal. (A837948) Vol. 2. (SC) | | 22-03480
|
02/02/2022 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal. (A837948) Vol. 3. (SC) | | 22-03485
|
02/04/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Proper Person Notice. Errata. (SC) | | 22-03870
|
03/01/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 3/2/22) (SC) | | |
03/02/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection - No Notice of Appearance for Brian Schneider. (SC) | | 22-06639
|
03/07/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Notice of Appearance for Brian Schneider. (SC) | | 22-07187
|
03/07/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 22-07189
|
03/15/2022 | Transcript Request | Filed Civil Proper Person Amended Transcript. (SC) | | 22-08263
|
03/15/2022 | Brief | Filed Proper Person's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 22-08264
|
03/15/2022 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
05/20/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | 22-16097
|
05/20/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |
09/12/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (SC) | | |
09/21/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. (SC) | | |
09/21/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Proper Person Petition for Review. (STRICKEN PER 10/3/22 ORDER). (SC) | | 22-29609
|
09/28/2022 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion to Amend the Petition for Review. (SC) | | 22-30524
|
10/03/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's motion for leave to file an amended petition for review is granted. The clerk of this court shall strike the petition for review filed on September 21, 2022, and shall file the amended petition received on September 28, 2022. (SC) | | 22-31149
|
10/03/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Proper Person Amended Petition for Review. (SC) | | 22-31150
|
10/18/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Answer Petition for Review. Answer due: 14 days. (SC) | | 22-32726
|
10/31/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondent's Answer to Petition for Review. (SC). | | 22-34102
|
11/03/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Proper Person Motion to File a Reply to Respondent's Answer to Petition for Review and to File Supplemental Material. (EXHIBITS DETACHED AND STRICKEN PER 11/18/22 ORDER). (SC) | | 22-34640
|
11/07/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Proper Person Errata for Motion to File a Reply to Respondent's Answer to Petition for Review. (SC) | | 22-35033
|
11/18/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Motion. Appellant has filed a motion and errata for leave to file a reply to respondent's answer to the petition for review. The motion is granted to the following extent. The reply was filed with the motion on November 3, 2022. Appellant's request to submit additional materials is denied. The clerk of this court shall strike the additional materials from the reply. (SC) | | 22-36381
|
12/08/2022 | Post-Judgment Order/Dispositional | Order Denying Petition for Review. "Review denied." fn1 [The Honorable Abbi Silver having retired, this matter was decided by a six-justice court.] EN BANC (SC) | | 22-38613
|
12/08/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-38614
|
12/08/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
12/15/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on December 9, 2022. (SC) | | 22-38614
|