Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/25/2022 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Law Office of Emily McFarling. Check no. 1212. (SC) | | |
01/25/2022 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC) | | 22-02514
|
01/25/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC) | | 22-02516
|
01/26/2022 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant:14 days transcript request form; 40 days fast track statement and appendix. (SC) | | 22-02609
|
01/28/2022 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Documents from District Court Clerk. Confidential Civil Cover Sheet. (Sealed) (SC) | | |
02/02/2022 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Copy of District Court Exhibit List. (SC) | | 22-03545
|
02/09/2022 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 9/16/21 and 12/20/21. To Court Reporter: Transcript Video Services. (SC) | | 22-04464
|
02/15/2022 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant's Civil Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 22-05113
|
03/07/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Fast Track Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 22-07271
|
03/09/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: April 6, 2022. (SC) | | 22-07468
|
03/14/2022 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Maria Balagtas stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 9/16/21 and 12/20/21. (SC) | | 22-08020
|
04/06/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Fast Track Statement and Appendix. (SC) | | 22-10797
|
04/08/2022 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement Child Custody. (SC) | | 22-11200
|
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement, Volume 1. (SC) | | 22-11201
|
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement, Volume 2. (SC) | | 22-11202
|
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement, Volume 3. (SC) | | 22-11203
|
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement, Volume 4. (SC) | | 22-11204
|
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement, Volume 5. (SC) | | 22-11205
|
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement, Volume 6. (SC) | | 22-11206
|
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement, Volume 7. (SC) | | 22-11207
|
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement, Volume 8. (SC) | | 22-11208
|
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement, Volume 9. (SC) | | 22-11224
|
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement, Volume 10. (SC) | | 22-11209
|
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement, Volume 11 (part 1). (SC) | | 22-11210
|
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement, Volume 12. (SC) | | 22-11211
|
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement, Volume 11 (part 2). (SC) | | 22-11212
|
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement, Volume 12 (duplicate). (SC) | | 22-11213
|
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement, Volume 13. (SC) | | 22-11214
|
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement, Volume 14. (SC) | | 22-11215
|
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement, Volume 15. (SC) | | 22-11216
|
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement, Volume 16. (SC) | | 22-11217
|
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement, Volume 17. (SC) | | 22-11218
|
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement, Volume 18. (SC) | | 22-11219
|
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement, Volume 19. (SC) | | 22-11220
|
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement, Volume 20. (SC) | | 22-11221
|
04/11/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Direct the District Court to Transmit Trial Exhibits 33, 41, 43, 44, 45A, 45B, 45C, 67, 68, and 69 to Supreme Court. (SC) | | 22-11428
|
04/13/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the fast track statement and appendix is granted. The fast track statement and appendix were filed on April 8, 2022. Respondent shall have 21 days from the date of this order to file and serve the fast track response. (SC) | | 22-11638
|
05/04/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent's Fast Track Response due: May 11, 2022. (SC) | | 22-14114
|
05/04/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a motion to transmit several original trial exhibits. The motion is denied without prejudice. (SC) | | 22-14166
|
05/10/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Joint Motion to Extend Time to File Fast Track Response. (SC) | | 22-14814
|
05/11/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Respondent shall have until May 24, 2022, to file and serve the fast track response. (SC) | | 22-14940
|
05/24/2022 | Motion | Filed Joint Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Fast Track Statement. (SC) | | 22-16436
|
05/31/2022 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Respondent's Fast Track Response. (SC) | | 22-17264
|
06/02/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The parties' joint motion for a third extension of time to file the fast track response is granted. The fast track response was filed on May 31, 2022. Appellant shall have until June 14, 2022, to file and serve any fast track reply. (SC) | | 22-17542
|
06/14/2022 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply to Fast Track Response. (SC) | | 22-18958
|
06/15/2022 | Case Status Update | Fast Track Briefing Completed. (SC) | | |
07/12/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice of Appearance for Emily McFarling. (SC) | | 22-21946
|
08/03/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Change of Attorney's Law Firm and Address. (SC) | | 22-24337
|
09/14/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel, Emily McFarling. (SC) | | 22-28822
|
09/15/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Emily McFarling has filed a notice of withdrawal as counsel for appellant. "A withdrawal of counsel may be effected only by filing a motion in the court." Therefore, the notice is treated as a motion. Although the motion does not comply with the requirements of NRAP 46(e)(3), in this instance only the motion is granted. NRAP 2. Appellant remains represented by attorney Amy A. Porray. (SC) | | 22-28962
|
09/16/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "We reverse the spousal support portion of the decree and remand for the district court to make sufficient factual findings under NRS 125.150(9). We affirm all other aspects of the divorce decree." fn6[The Honorable Mark Gibbons, Senior Justice, participated in the decision of this matter under a general order of assignment.] RP/EC/MG (SC) | | 22-29109
|
10/04/2022 | Filing Fee | Rehearing Filing Fee Paid. $150.00 from Amy A. Porray. E-Payment Ref. no. 22100439619832. (SC) | | |
10/05/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 22-31414
|
10/28/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Attorney's Notice of Change of Law Firm for Amy A. Porray. (SC) | | 22-33960
|
10/31/2022 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). RP/EC/MG. (SC) | | 22-34063
|
11/09/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Withdrawal as Attorney for Appellant (Amy A. Porray). (SC) | | 22-35427
|
12/28/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw. The clerk shall remove Amy Porray as counsel of record for the appellant. (SC). | | 22-40778
|
12/28/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
12/28/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-40782
|
01/17/2023 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court County Clerk on December 29, 2022. (SC) | | 22-40782
|
08/16/2023 | Transcript | Filed (SEALED) Notice from Court Reporter. Maria Balagtas stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 4/21/2023. (SC) | | |