Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
09/09/2021 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing Fee Waived. In Forma Pauperis. (SC) | | |
09/09/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 21-26140
|
09/09/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Regarding Deadlines. (SC) | | 21-26142
|
09/22/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Failure to Pay Transcript Deposit (Angie Calvillo, Court Recorder, District Court, Department XX). (SC) | | 21-27442
|
09/24/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Copy of District Court Minutes. (SC) | | 21-27637
|
10/06/2021 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion for an Extension of Time to FIle Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 21-28665
|
10/11/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Court reporter Angie Calvillo has filed a notice stating that appellant has not paid for a requested transcript. Appellant has not filed a transcript request form in this court and it does not appear that appellant has filed a transcript request form in the district court. Accordingly, this court takes no action on the notice. fn1[The due item on this court's docket is for a transcript request form rather than the transcript.] (SC) | | 21-29138
|
10/19/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file and serve the docketing statement. If appellant wishes to request transcripts in this matter, appellant must file a transcript request form in this court within 14 days of the date of this order. As appellant is proceeding in forma pauperis in this court, appellant need not pay any fees associated with the transcripts at this time. (SC) | | 21-30033
|
10/20/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Proper Person Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 8/18/21. To Court Reporter: Tracy Gegenheimer. (SC) | | 21-30158
|
10/20/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Proper Person Civil Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 21-30159
|
10/22/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. This court declines to order the preparation of the requested transcript at this time. However, as this appeal proceeds, this court will consider the necessity of transcripts and may order their preparation at a later date. (SC) | | 21-30575
|
11/03/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 30 days. (SC) | | 21-31656
|
11/17/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal. (A821249) Vol. 1. (SC) | | 21-33046
|
11/17/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal. (A821249) Vol. 2. (SC) | | 21-33049
|
11/17/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal. (A821249) Vol. 3. (SC) | | 21-33051
|
11/17/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal. (A821249) Vol. 4. (SC) | | 21-33053
|
11/22/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal. (SEALED) pages 12-17 and 38-39. (SC) | | |
12/30/2021 | Brief | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief. (SC) | | 21-37237
|
02/10/2022 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/Submitted For Decision/To Screening. (SC) | | |
02/15/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice of Change of Address. (SC) | | 22-05061
|
03/01/2022 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion for Relief for Judgment. (SC) (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS PER 03/04/22 NOTICE) | | 22-06553
|
03/04/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | 22-07047
|
03/04/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |
03/04/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Supreme Court. (COA). | | |
03/04/2022 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion for Relief for Judgment. (TRANSFERRED FROM THE SUPREME COURT PER 03/04/22 NOTICE). (COA). | | 22-07049
|
03/08/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a pro se motion for leave to file a motion for relief from judgment in the district court. Appellant may file a motion for relief from judgment in the district court without leave of this court. The motion is denied as unnecessary. (COA) | | 22-07349
|
08/26/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "We affirm the order of the district court dismissing Zorkova's complaint with prejudice." Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (COA) | | 22-26904
|
08/26/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "We affirm the order of the district court dismissing Zorkova's complaint with prejudice." Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (SC) | | |
09/14/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Proper Person Petition for Rehearing. (COA) | | 22-28791
|
10/14/2022 | Other | Returned Proper Person Unfiled Document. (COA) | | 22-32399
|
10/20/2022 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). (COA) | | 22-32993
|
11/08/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Supreme Court. (COA). | | |
11/08/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |
11/08/2022 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. (COA). | | |
11/08/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Proper Person Petition for Review. (SC). | | 22-35184
|
12/08/2022 | Post-Judgment Order/Dispositional | Order Denying Petition for Review. "Review denied." fn1 [The Honorable Abbi Silver having retired, this matter was decided by a six-justice court.] EN BANC. (SC) | | 22-38598
|
12/08/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-38615
|
12/08/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
12/15/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on December 9, 2022. (SC) | | 22-38615
|
01/24/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari Filed. A petition for a writ of certiorari was filed 01/11/23 and placed on the docket as Case No. 22-6550. (SC). | | 23-02249
|
03/23/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari Denied. The petition for a writ of certiorari is denied. (No. 22-6550). (SC) | | 23-09012
|