Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Administrative Case: ADKT 0594
Short Caption:IN THE MATTER OF THE REVIEW OF THE ADMINISTRATION OF THE BAR EXAMINATION AND LICENSING OF ATTORNEYS IN NEVADACourt:Supreme Court
Classification:Administrative - ADKT - ADKTCase Status:ADKT Order Filed
Filed Date:03/09/2022Public Hearing:
Closed Date:

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/09/2022Administrative CaseFiled Order Establishing Commission to Study the Administration of the Bar Examination and Licensing of Attorneys.22-07549
03/25/2022Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Member to Commission to Study the Administration of the Bar Examination and Licensing of Attorneys. Ryan Works is hereby appointed as a member of the Commission to replace Philip Hymanson.22-09369
07/27/2022Administrative CaseFiled Order Granting Extension of Time to File Commission Findings and Recommendations. The Commission shall file the report on its findings and recommendations with this court no later than November 30, 2022.22-23543
03/14/2023Administrative CaseFiled Order Regarding Modified July 2022 Nevada Bar Examination (filed April 21, 2022 in July 2022 bar file).23-07733
03/14/2023Administrative CaseFiled Order (filed November 16, 2022 in February 2023 bar file).23-07735
03/30/2023Administrative CaseFiled Commission Report to Nevada Supreme Court.23-09738
04/19/2023Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Task Forces.23-12141