Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 83299-COA
Short Caption:EBY VS. JOHNSTON LAW OFFICE P.C.Court:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):82914, 83299
Lower Court Case(s):Lyon Co. - Third Judicial District - 20-CV-01031Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/11/2022Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA).
03/23/2022MotionFiled Appellant's Proper Person Motion. Objection to Transfer to Court of Appeals. (MOTION TRANSFERRED TO SC PER ORDER FILED 5/12/22). (COA)22-09154
05/12/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion Appellant has filed a pro se objection to the transfer of this matter to the Court of Appeals. He requests that this court retain the case and publish an opinion regarding NRAP 17(a) and two state statutes. The motion was inadvertently filed in the Court of Appeals. The clerk shall file the March 23, 2022, motion in this court and file a copy of this order in both courts. No cause appearing, the motion is denied. (COA)22-15060
05/31/2022MotionFiled Appellant's Proper Person Motion to Vacate or Alter or Amend Order. (MOTION TRANSFERRED TO SC PER ORDER FILED 6/9/22). (COA)22-17177
06/09/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant previously filed a pro se objection to the transfer of this matter to the Court of Appeals. Appellant requested, among other things, that this court retain this case. On May 12, 2022, this court entered an order denying the motion. Appellant has now filed a motion to vacate or amend, apparently seeking reconsideration of the May 12, 2022, order. The motion to vacate or amend was inadvertently filed in the Court of Appeals. The clerk shall file the May 31, 2022, motion in this court and file a copy of this order in both courts. No cause appearing, the motion is denied. (COA)22-18409
09/08/2022Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Affirmed in part, reversed in part, and remanded." Before the Court of Appeals, Gibbons, C.J., Tao and Bulla, JJ., 138 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 63. (COA)22-28108
10/03/2022Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. (COA).
10/03/2022Case Status UpdateCase Closed. (COA).