Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/12/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
05/12/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 21-13593
|
05/12/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. (SC) | | 21-13595
|
05/12/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 21-13597
|
05/21/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Hall Jaffe & Clayton, LLP. Check no. 34185. (SC) | | |
05/21/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellants - due: 21 days. (SC) | | 21-14688
|
05/25/2021 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Thomas J. Tanksley. (SC) | | 21-14898
|
05/27/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Appellant's to File Overdue Case Appeal Statement. Due: 7 days. (SC) | | 21-15284
|
05/27/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. (SC) | | 21-15297
|
05/28/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 21-15346
|
06/23/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for August 12, 2021, at 10:00 am. (SC). | | 21-18144
|
08/31/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. The Settlement Judge respectfully recommends sanctions against Respondents' counsel in the amount of $500.00. (SC) | | 21-25418
|
09/09/2021 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Reinstating Briefing and order to Show cause Why Sanctions Should not be Imposed. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. Mr. Anderson shall have 14 days from the date of this order to show cause why the recommended sanction should not be imposed. (SC) | | 21-26153
|
09/17/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondents' Response to Order to Show Cause Why Sanctions Should Not be Imposed. (SC) | | 21-27032
|
09/23/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate that No Transcript is Being Requested. (SC) | | 21-27523
|
12/08/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Raymond Brooks and Brady Linen Services, LLC's Opening Brief. (REJECTED PER PHONE CALL) (SC) | | |
12/08/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Raymond Brooks and Brady Linen Services, LLC's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-34995
|
12/08/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Volume I. (SC) | | 21-34996
|
12/28/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Declining to Impose Sanctions. (SC) | | 21-36809
|
01/07/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondents' answering brief due: January 21, 2022. (SC) | | 22-00702
|
01/21/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondents' Answering Brief. (SC) | | 22-02264
|
01/21/2022 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 1. (SC) | | 22-02265
|
02/18/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 2/18/22) (SC) | | |
02/18/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days. (SC) | | 22-05452
|
02/18/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 22-05499
|
02/18/2022 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
04/08/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | 22-10971
|
04/08/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Supreme Court. (COA). | | |
04/08/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |
08/10/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Reversing and Remanding. "REVERSE and REMAND this matter to the district court with instructions to set aside the clerk's defaults and conduct further proceedings consistent with this order." Tao, J., concurring. Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (COA) | | 22-25020
|
08/10/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Reversing and Remanding. "REVERSE and REMAND this matter to the district court with instructions to set aside the clerk's defaults and conduct further proceedings consistent with this order." Tao, J., concurring. Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (SC) | | |
08/29/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Supreme Court. (COA) | | |
08/29/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. (SC) | | |
08/29/2022 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. (COA) | | |
08/29/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondents' Petition for Review. (SC) | | 22-27094
|
08/29/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Judicial Review. (SC) | | 22-27095
|
09/16/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Answer to Petition for Review. Answer due: 14 days. (SC) | | 22-29043
|
10/11/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Answer to Petition for Judicial Review (Exhibits attached). (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 10/11/22) SC) | | |
10/11/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. (SC) | | 22-32029
|
10/11/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Answer to Petition for Judicial Review (Exhibits attached). (SC) | | 22-32048
|
11/14/2022 | Post-Judgment Order/Dispositional | Order Denying Petition for Review. "Review denied." fn1 [The Honorable Justice Silver having retired did not participate in the decision on petition for review.] EN BANC. (SC) | | 22-35637
|
11/14/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-35639
|
11/14/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
11/30/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on November 15, 2022. (SC) | | 22-35639
|