Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
07/02/2021 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC) | | |
07/02/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (A821932) (SC) | | 21-19150
|
07/14/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Entry and Transmission of Written Order. District Court Order due: 60 days. (SC) | | 21-20260
|
07/19/2021 | Order/Incoming | Filed District court order. Certified copy of Finding of Fact, Conclusions of Law, and Order filed in district court on July 15th, 2021. (SC) | | 21-20758
|
07/26/2021 | Brief | Filed Proper Person Informal Brief. (SC) | | 21-21585
|
07/28/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Transmission of Record and Regarding Briefing. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Appellant has filed an informal brief. See NRAP 28(k). Respondent need not file a response to the brief filed by appellant, unless ordered to do so by this court. (SC) | | 21-21903
|
08/09/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal - (A821932) - Volume 1. (SC) | | 21-23085
|
08/10/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal (C246709), Vols. 1-12, via FTP. (SC) | | 21-23169
|
08/12/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal pages 1 to 6, 30 to 31 and 32 (SEALED) (A821932). (SC) | | |
08/12/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal pages 1 to 21, 1270 and 1271 to 1275 (SEALED) (C246709). (SC) | | |
08/12/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal pages 313 to 319 (SEALED) (C246709). (SC) | | |
09/13/2021 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. (SC) | | |
09/28/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice of Appearance for Christopher R. Oram and Rachael E. Stewart. (SC) | | 21-27931
|
10/01/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Attorneys Christopher R. Oram and Rachael E. Stewart have filed a notice of appearance as counsel for appellant. The clerk of this court shall add Mr. Oram and Ms. Stewart as counsel for appellant. This court directs full briefing of this appeal. Appellant's transcript request and docketing statement due: 14 days. Opening brief due: 60 days. (SC) | | 21-28203
|
10/13/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant's Criminal Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 21-29393
|
10/15/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 6/16/21 To Court Reporter: Dana J. Tavaglione. (SC) | | 21-29624
|
11/30/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: December 14, 2021. (SC) | | 21-34104
|
12/14/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 21-35652
|
12/23/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a motion for a second extension of time (30 days) to file the opening brief. The motion is denied. Appellant shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 21-36674
|
12/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 1. (SC) | | 21-37272
|
12/30/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-37273
|
01/31/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent's Answering Brief due: February 14, 2022. (SC) | | 22-03215
|
02/14/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Notice of Appearance for Taleen Pandukht. (SC) | | 22-04900
|
02/14/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 22-04902
|
02/14/2022 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 1. (SC) | | 22-04903
|
02/14/2022 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 2. (SC) | | 22-04904
|
02/14/2022 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 3. (SC) | | 22-04906
|
02/14/2022 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 4. (SC) | | 22-04907
|
02/14/2022 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 5. (SC) | | 22-04908
|
02/14/2022 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 6. (SC) | | 22-04909
|
02/14/2022 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 7. (SC) | | 22-04910
|
02/14/2022 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 8. (SC) | | 22-04911
|
02/14/2022 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 9. (SC) | | 22-04912
|
03/16/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Reply Brief due: March 30, 2022. (SC) | | 22-08404
|
03/30/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 22-09955
|
03/31/2022 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. (SC) | | |
04/25/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | 22-12899
|
04/25/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |
04/25/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Supreme Court. (COA). | | |
05/13/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (COA) | | 22-15219
|
05/13/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (SC) | | |
06/07/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Supreme Court. (COA) | | |
06/07/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals | | |
06/07/2022 | Case Status Update | Case Closed | | |
06/07/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-18048
|
06/07/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
06/24/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 8, 2022. (SC) | | 22-18048
|