Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
08/30/2021 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC) | | |
08/30/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement and Notice of Briefing Schedule mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC) | | 21-25146
|
08/30/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Criminal. Due date: 10 days. (SC) | | 21-25148
|
09/10/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 09/10/21). (SC) | | |
09/10/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. Case Appeal Statement. (SC) | | 21-26232
|
09/16/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Permission to Late File Case Appeal Statement. (SC) | | 21-26896
|
09/27/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion and Directing the Filing of Required Documents. Notwithstanding its untimeliness, appellant's motion for an extension of time to the file the case appeal statement is granted. The transcript request form and docketing statement are also overdue. Appellant's case appeal statement, transcript request form, and docketing statement due: 7 days. (SC) | | 21-27748
|
09/29/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. (SC) | | 21-28011
|
09/29/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 04/22/13, 10/0/19, 07/15/20, 05/18/21, 05/19/21 and 08/16/21. Court Reporter: Nichole Baldwin (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 09/29/21). (SC) | | |
09/29/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Transcript Request. (SC) | | 21-28035
|
09/29/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. (SC) | | 21-28019
|
10/05/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Permission to Late File Transcript Request Form. (SC) | | 21-28496
|
10/05/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. (SC) | | 21-28507
|
10/11/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Certificate of Service. (SC) | | 21-29069
|
10/13/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve a transcript request form. (SC) | | 21-29391
|
11/23/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Conditionally Imposing Sanctions. Conditional sanction of $250 due: 14 days or transcript request due within the same time period. (SC) | | 21-33725
|
12/01/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Late File Transcript Request. (SC) | | 21-34275
|
12/01/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 4/22/13; 10/7/19; 7/15/20; 5/18/21; 5/19/21; 8/16/21. (REJECTED PER 12/6/21 ORDER) (SC) | | |
12/01/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Certificate of Service. (Appellant's Motion to Late File Transcript Request.) (SC) | | 21-34303
|
12/06/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion and Rejecting Transcript Request Form. Appellant has filed a motion for an extension of time to file the transcript request form. The motion is granted. However, the transcript request form filed on December 1, 2021, does not comply with NRAP 9(a). The clerk of this court shall reject the transcript request form filed on December 1, 2021. Corrected transcript request form due: 7 days. (SC) | | 21-34661
|
12/08/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 5/13/19; 10/7/19; 7/15/20; 5/18/21; 5/19/21 and 8/16/21. To Court Reporter: Linda Davies. (SC) | | 21-35044
|
12/26/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-36712
|
12/26/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief (cont..). (SC) | | 21-36713
|
12/26/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief (cont..). (SC) | | 21-36714
|
12/27/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-36738
|
12/28/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 7 days. | | 21-36765
|
12/28/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Certificate of Service (Opening Brief) (SC) | | 21-36890
|
12/29/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Linda Davies stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: /13/19; 10/7/19; 7/15/20; 5/18/21; 5/19/21 and 8/16/21. (SC) | | 21-36953
|
01/24/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent's Answering Brief due: February 9, 2022. (SC) | | 22-02352
|
02/07/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 2/7/21) (SC) | | |
02/07/2022 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 2/7/22) (SC) | | |
02/07/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. (SC) | | 22-03991
|
02/07/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Notice of Appearance. (SC) | | 22-04003
|
02/07/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 22-04012
|
02/07/2022 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix. (SC) | | 22-04016
|
03/24/2022 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. No reply brief filed. (SC) | | |
04/25/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | 22-12917
|
04/25/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |
04/25/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Supreme Court. (COA). | | |
07/08/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (COA) | | 22-21616
|
07/08/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (SC) | | |
08/02/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Supreme Court. (COA) | | |
08/02/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. (SC) | | |
08/02/2022 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. (COA) | | |
08/02/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-24181
|
08/02/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
09/06/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 4, 2022. (SC) | | 22-24181
|