Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/03/2022 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing Fee Waived. In Forma Pauperis. (SC) | | |
05/03/2022 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC) | | 22-14074
|
05/03/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC) | | 22-14076
|
05/04/2022 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant: 14 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief. (SC) | | 22-14167
|
05/09/2022 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Minutes. (Sealed) (SC) | | |
05/09/2022 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Documents from District Court Clerk. Confidential Civil Cover Sheet. (Sealed) (SC) | | |
05/12/2022 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 4/6/21 and 12/9/21. To Court Reporter: Sherry Justice. (SC) | | 22-15145
|
05/13/2022 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 22-15265
|
08/01/2022 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Sherry Justice stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 4/6/21 and 12/9/21. (SC) | | 22-24065
|
08/26/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: September 15, 2022. (SC) | | 22-26887
|
09/13/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice of Appearance for Scott Cardenas. (SC) | | 22-28666
|
09/15/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 22-28871
|
09/15/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Volume 1. (SC) | | 22-28878
|
09/15/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Volume 2. (SC) | | 22-28879
|
09/15/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service (Appendix). Due date: 7 days. | | 22-28882
|
09/15/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service referencing Appellant's Appendix Volume 1 and 2. (SC) | | 22-28893
|
09/28/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time to File the Answering Brief on Appeal (First Request). (SC) | | 22-30493
|
09/29/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's opposition to motion for extension of time to file the answering brief on appeal (first request). (SC) | | 22-30672
|
10/04/2022 | Motion | Filed Reply to Appellant's Opposition to Motion for Extension of Time to File the Answering Brief on Appeal (First Request). (SC) | | 22-31302
|
10/10/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion in Part. Ms. Brickfield's answering brief due: November 16, 2022. The answering brief of respondents Robyn Friedman and Donna Simmons remains due to be filed on or before October 17, 2022. Appellant may file a reply brief within 30 days after service of the last-filed answering brief, if deemed necessary. (SC) | | 22-31837
|
10/12/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent Robyn Friedman and Donna Simmons' Motion for Extension of Time to File Respondents' Answering Brief and Appendix (First Request). (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 10/12/22) (SC) | | |
10/12/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. (SC) | | 22-32213
|
10/12/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent Robyn Friedman and Donna Simmons' Notice of Appearance for Ammon E. Francom. (SC) | | 22-32249
|
10/12/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent Robyn Friedman and Donna Simmons' Motion for Extension of Time to File Respondents' Answering Brief and Appendix (First Request). (SC) | | 22-32250
|
10/18/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondents Robyn Friedman and Donna Simmons' answering brief due: November 16, 2022. (SC) | | 22-32787
|
11/16/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Respondents' Answering Brief. (REJECTED PER PHONE CALL) (SC). | | |
11/16/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondent Robin Friedman and Donna Simmons' Answering Brief. (SC) | | 22-36058
|
11/16/2022 | Appendix | Filed Respondent Robin Friedman and Donna Simmons' Appendix to Answering Brief. (SC) | | 22-36061
|
11/16/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Elizabeth Brickfield's Joinder to Robin Friedman and Donna Simmons' Answering Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 22-36088
|
11/16/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Elizabeth Brickfield's Joinder to Robin Friedman and Donna Simmons' Answering Brief and Appendix - Duplicate. (SC) | | 22-36102
|
11/17/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Amicus Curiae Probate and Trust for the State Bar's Motion and Brief due: December 7, 2022. (SC) | | 22-36153
|
12/07/2022 | Motion | Filed Probate and Trust Section of State Bar of Nevada Motion for Extension of Time to File Amicus Curiae Brief. (SC) | | 22-38512
|
12/15/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC). | | 22-39409
|
12/15/2022 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC). | | |
12/16/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Proposed amicus Probate and Trust Section of the State Bar of Nevada's motion for a second extension of time to file a motion for leave to file an amicus brief is granted. The Probate and Trust Section of the State Bar of Nevada shall have until January 30, 2023, to file and serve a motion for leave to file an amicus brief accompanied by the proposed brief. (SC) | | 22-39479
|
01/30/2023 | Motion | Filed The Probate and Trust Section of the State Bar of Nevada's Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief Under NRAP 29(c). (PER 2/17/23 ORDER, DETACHED BRIEF AND FILED SEPARATELY)(SC) | | 23-02876
|
02/01/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice of Appearance for Barbara Buckley. (SC) | | 23-03138
|
02/01/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Leave to File a Response to the Probate and Trust Section of the State Bar of Nevada's Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief Under NRAP 29(C). (SC) | | 23-03140
|
02/07/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The Probate and Trust Section of the State Bar of Nevada has filed its motion for leave to file amicus curiae brief pursuant to NRAP 29(c). Appellant Kathleen June Jones has filed a motion for leave to file a response to the motion. Appellant's motion is granted; the clerk of this court shall detach the response to the motion for leave to file an amicus brief from the motion and shall file it separately. The Probate and Trust Section shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file a reply to the response if deemed necessary. (SC) | | 23-03723
|
02/07/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Response to the Probate and Trust Section of the State Bar of Nevada's Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief Under NRAP 29(C). (SC) | | 23-03724
|
02/17/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Having considered the arguments of the parties and the issues on appeal, this court grants the Section's motion. The clerk of this court shall detach the amicus brief from the Section's motion and shall file it separately. (SC) | | 23-04944
|
02/17/2023 | Brief | Filed Brief of Amicus The Probate & Trust Section of the State BaR of Nevada in Support of Respondents. (SC) | | 23-04947
|
04/12/2023 | Motion | Filed Respondents' (Robyn Friedman and Donna Simmons) Motion to Disqualify Justice Patricia Lee. (SC) | | 23-11297
|
05/02/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Response to Motion to Disqualify Justice Lee. (SC) | | 23-13692
|
05/09/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Respondents Robyn Friedman and Donna Simmons have filed a motion to disqualify Justice Lee in this matter. We note that the motion for disqualification is deficient because it does not include the required verification or attorney's certificate. Further, the motion was not timely filed. Because Justice Lee was not a member of this court when this appeal was docketed, we conclude that the time for filing the motion for disqualification began to run on December 21, 2022, the date Justice Lee was sworn in as a member of this court. Using this date, any motion for Justice Lee's disqualification should have been filed by February 21, 2023. The motion, however, was not filed until April 12, 2023. Even assuming Friedman and Simmons had not waived their right to object to Justice Lee's participation in this case, we conclude that Justice Lee's disqualification in this matter is not warranted. (SC) | | 23-14588
|
08/10/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for September 13, 2023, at 10:30 am, in Las Vegas. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. (SC) | | 23-25857
|
08/14/2023 | Motion | Filed Amicus Curiae's (State Bar) Motion for Permission to Appear at Oral Argument. (SC) | | 23-26330
|
08/15/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service for Motion to Participate in Oral Argument. Due date: 7 days. (SC) | | 23-26473
|
08/17/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Amicus Curiae's (State Bar) Proof of Service for Motion to Participate in Oral Argument. (SC) | | 23-26943
|
08/28/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion.The State Bar of Nevada-Probate and Trust Section, amicus curiae in this appeal, has moved this court for permission to participate in the oral argument currently scheduled for September 13, 2023, at 10:30 a.m., in Las Vegas. The motion is granted. The State Bar of Nevada-Probate and Trust Section shall share the time allotted to respondents as determined by respondents and the State Bar of Nevada-Probate and Trust Section. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. (SC) | | 23-27982
|
08/29/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC) | | 23-28173
|
09/13/2023 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before SNP panel. DH/RP/PL. (SC) | | |
12/21/2023 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before: Herndon/Lee/Parraguirre. Author: Herndon, J. Majority: Herndon/Lee/Parraguirre. 139 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 57. SNP23-DH/PL/RP. (SC). | | 24-08279
|
12/29/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Correcting Opinion. The clerk of this court is directed to correct, in the advance opinion, the subheading to read "The award of Brickfield's fees at a rate of $400 per hour is reasonable" and the two pertinent sentences in the conclusion to read as follows: "Although the district court erred by failing to include Brickfield's rate in the order of appointment, June waived this argument by failing to raise it below. . . . Finally, while Brickfield is a fiduciary entitled to fiduciary fees, the district court did not abuse its discretion in awarding her fees in an amount commensurate with her attorney rate because the award was supported by the GAL's experience, specialized knowledge, and ability to understand the intricacies of this particular case's complex legal issues." (SC) | | 23-42311
|
01/16/2024 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 24-01497
|
01/16/2024 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.(SC) | | |
01/26/2024 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on 01/17/24. (SC) | | 24-01497
|
03/07/2024 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Corrected Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before: Herndon/Lee/Parraguirre. Author: Herndon, J. Majority: Herndon/Lee/Parraguirre. 139 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 57. SNP23-DH/PL/RP. (SC). | | 24-08279
|