Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/16/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
03/16/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 21-07565
|
03/16/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 21-07567
|
03/16/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Alan S. Levin, MD, JD. Check no. 4153. (SC) | | |
03/18/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Regarding Deadlines. (SC) | | 21-07858
|
03/25/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's (Edward Fein) Notice of Appearance Notice for Gustave Rossi, Enrique Schaerer, Adam Streisand, and Golnaz Yazdchi. (SC) | | 21-08637
|
04/05/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate That No Transcript is Being Requested. (SC) | | 21-09734
|
04/08/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's (Pearl Fein) Notice of Appearance for Leigh Goddard and Adam Hosmer-Henner. (SC) | | 21-10103
|
04/08/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice of Appearance. Steven Silva for Appellant. (SC) | | 21-10193
|
04/20/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Referring Appeal to Settlement Program. Attorney Stephen M. Silva has now filed a notice of appearance as counsel for appellant. The clerk of this court shall add Mr. Silva to the docket and service list in this appeal. Appellant shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file and serve the docketing statement. Because all parties are represented by counsel, this appeal is referred to this court's settlement program. The briefing schedule in this appeal is suspended pending further order of this court. (SC) | | 21-11412
|
04/21/2021 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt. (SC) | | 21-11536
|
04/28/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's (JP Morgan Chase) Notice of Appearance for Courtney Miller O'Mara and Wade Beavers. (SC) | | 21-12166
|
04/28/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's (JP Morgan) Notice NRAP 26.1 Disclosure. (SC) | | 21-12178
|
05/03/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Docketing Statement due: May 18, 2021. (SC) | | 21-12607
|
05/10/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for July 9, 2021, at 9:00 am. (SC). | | 21-13324
|
05/19/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to File Docketing Statement Under Seal. (SC) | | 21-14433
|
05/26/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file, under seal, the docketing statement received on May 19, 2021. (SC) | | 21-15137
|
05/26/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant's Civil (SEALED) Docketing Statement Civil Appeal. (SC) | | |
07/07/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued for sixty days to afford the parties additional time to prepare for mediation. (SC) | | 21-19469
|
07/08/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge for Appellant's Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 21-19521
|
07/09/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion To Withdraw as Counsel. (SC) | | 21-19843
|
07/12/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Proof of Service on Settlement Judge for Sealed Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 21-19964
|
07/14/2021 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw/Settlement Proceedings Stayed. The clerk shall remove attorney Steven M. Silva, of the law firm of Blanchard, Krasner & French, APC, from the docket of this appeal. Appellant's notice of appearance due: 30 days. Settlement Proceedings are stayed. (SC) | | 21-20296
|
08/05/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance of Pro Se Counsel (Alan S. Levin, M.D., J.D. hereby enters his appearance as counsel of record for the above-named Appellant). (SC) | | 21-22760
|
08/05/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service (Notice of Appearance of Pro Se Counsel). Due date: 10 days. (SC) | | 21-22806
|
08/06/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Proof of Service. (SC) | | 21-22871
|
08/07/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Revised Proof of Service of Notice of Appearance of Pro Se Counsel. (SC) | | 21-22976
|
08/09/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. On August 5, 2021, appellant filed a notice of appearance in which he states his is appearing as counsel of record for himself. We note, however, that the document indicates appellant is proceeding "Pro Se" and appellant did not provide his State Bar number. Appellant shall have 7 days from the date of this order to clarify whether he intends to proceed in this appeal representing himself as a counselor of law or simply as a pro se party appearing pursuant to NRAP 46A. (SC) | | 21-23074
|
08/10/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance of Counsel Representing Himself as Counselor of Law NV Bar Number 7062. (SC) | | 21-23242
|
08/11/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Resuming Settlement Proceedings. On August 10, 2021, appellant filed a notice of appearance informing this court that he will be representing himself in this matter in his capacity as an attorney. The clerk of this court shall modify this court's docket to indicate that appellant is appearing in this court as a self-represented attorney. The settlement proceedings shall resume in this matter. The settlement judge shall file an Early Case Assessment Report within 30 days and a Final Settlement Status Report within 120 days. (SC) | | 21-23344
|
09/01/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for October 26, 2021, at 10:00 am. (SC). | | 21-25531
|
11/01/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC) | | 21-31346
|
11/02/2021 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 45 days opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 21-31537
|
12/17/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (REJECTED OVER THE PHONE COUNSEL WILL BE MAILING IN SEALED COPY) (SC) | | |
12/17/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to File Under Sealed the Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 21-36062
|
12/17/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 1. ((REJECTED OVER THE PHONE COUNSEL WILL BE MAILING IN SEALED COPY) (SC) | | |
01/07/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a motion to file the opening brief and appendix under seal. The motion is denied. The clerk of this court shall return, unfiled, the opening brief and appendix received on December 17, 2021. Within 7 days of the date of this order, appellant may file a renewed motion to seal, or a motion to file certain documents subject to redaction. If appellant will not be filing a motion to seal or redact, he shall file the opening brief and appendix within 7 days of the date of this order. (SC) | | 22-00759
|
01/10/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (FILED UNDER SEAL PER 2/25/22 ORDER). (SC) | | |
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 1. (APPENDIX PAGES 1-64, 74-77, AND 78-106 SEALED PER 2/25/22 ORDER). (SC) | | 22-00982
|
02/03/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent Pearl Fein's Answering Brief due: February 23, 2022. (SC) | | 22-03721
|
02/09/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent Kuckenmeister's Motion to File Answering Brief and Portions of the Respondent's Appendix Under Seal. (SC) | | 22-04389
|
02/09/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent's (Edward Fein) Motion to File Answering Brief under Seal. (SC) | | 22-04391
|
02/09/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's (Randal S. Kuckenmeister) Exhibits in Support of Motion to File Answering Brief and Portions of Respondent's Appendix Under Seal. (SC) | | 22-04403
|
02/23/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent (Pearl Fein's) Joinder to (Edward Fein's) Motion to File Under Seal his Answering Brief, Appellant's Opening Brief, and Portions of Appellant's Appendix. (SC) | | 22-05995
|
02/23/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent (Pearl Fein's) Motion to File Answering Brief Under Seal. (SC) | | 22-05996
|
02/25/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions to Seal. The clerk of this court shall file under seal the following: (1) respondent Kuckenmeister's answering brief received on February 9, 2022; (2) respondent Edward Fein's answering brief received on February 9, 2022; (3) respondent Kuckenmeister's appendix pages RA Vol 1. at 042-043, 058-059, 098-100, 114-122, Vol. 2 at 123-247, Vol. 3 at 266-272, 275-405, received on February 9, 2022; and (4) respondent Pearl Fein's answering brief received on February 24, 2022. Appellant's opening brief and appellant's appendix pages 1-64, 74-77, and 78-106, were filed on January 10, 2022. Accordingly, the clerk of this court shall seal these documents. To date, JP Morgan has failed to file an answering brief or otherwise communicate with this court. Accordingly, JP Morgan shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve an answering brief. Appellant shall have 37 days from the date of this order to file and serve any reply brief. (SC) | | 22-06173
|
02/25/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondent's (Edward Fein) SEALED Answering Brief. (SC) | | |
02/25/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondent Kuckenmeister's Answering Brief. (SEALED). (SC) | | |
02/25/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondent's (Pearl Fein's) (SEALED) Answering Brief. (SC) | | |
02/25/2022 | Appendix | Filed Respondent Kuckenmeister's Appendix to Answering Brief, Vols. 1-3. (SC) | | 22-06200
|
02/25/2022 | Appendix | Filed Respondent Kuckenmeister's Appendix pages RA Vol 1. at 042-043, 058-059, 098-100, 114-122, Vol. 2 at 123-247, Vol. 3 at 266-272, 275-405 (SEALED). (SC) | | |
03/04/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's (J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.) Notice that they do not Intend on Filing an Answering Brief. (SC) | | 22-06921
|
03/31/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 4/1/22) (SC) | | |
03/31/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Reply Brief. Vol. 1. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 4/1/22) (SC) | | |
03/31/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to File Reply Brief and Appendix Under Seal. (SC) | | 22-10145
|
04/01/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. (SC) | | 22-10206
|
04/25/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file under seal appellant's reply brief and appendix to the reply brief, which was received on April 1, 2022. (SC) | | 22-12936
|
04/25/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (FILED UNDER SEAL PER ORDER FILED 4/25/22). (SC) | | |
04/25/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Reply Brief. (FILED UNDER SEAL PER ORDER FILED 4/25/22). (SC) | | |
04/25/2022 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
05/20/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | 22-16043
|
05/20/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Supreme Court. (COA). | | |
05/20/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |
07/21/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Tao, J., concurring. Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (COA) | | 22-22983
|
07/21/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Tao, J., concurring. Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (SC) | | |
08/05/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's petition for rehearing due: August 22, 2022. (COA) | | 22-24574
|
08/15/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Supreme Court (COA) | | |
08/15/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals (SC) | | |
08/15/2022 | Case Status Update | Case Closed (COA) | | |
08/15/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) (REMITTITUR RECALLED PER 08/17/22 ORDER) | | 22-25383
|
08/15/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed (SC) (REMITTITUR RECALLED PER 08/17/22 ORDER) | | |
08/17/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Recalling Remittitur. The clerk of this court shall recall the remittitur and reinstate the appeal in Docket No. 82630-COA. (SC). | | 22-25766
|
08/17/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | 22-25767
|
08/17/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Supreme Court | | |
08/17/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |
08/17/2022 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion to File Petition for Rehearing Under Seal. (COA) | | 22-25768
|
09/06/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 16, 2022. (SC) | | 22-25383
|
09/09/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file under seal the pro se petition for rehearing received on August 17, 2022. (COA) | | 22-28325
|
09/09/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Proper Person's (SEALED) Petition for Rehearing. (COA) | | |
09/09/2022 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid on Rehearing. $150.00 Cash from Alan Levin. (COA) | | |
09/14/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Corrected Proof of Service for Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. Due date: 7 days. (COA) | | 22-28698
|
09/21/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Amended Certificate of Service for Petition for Rehearing. (COA) | | 22-29738
|
10/03/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's (Edward Fein) Notice of Appearance for Paul J. Anderson. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 10/3/22) Corrected Notice of Appearance has been filed. (COA) | | 22-31053
|
10/03/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's (Edward Fein) Notice of Appearance for Paul J. Anderson. (COA) | | 22-31054
|
10/03/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's (Edward Fein) Notice of Disassociation for Enrique R. Schaerer. (COA) | | 22-31055
|
10/03/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's (Edward Fein) Notice of Appearance. FILED IN CORRECT COURT. (SC) | | |
10/03/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's (Edward Fein) Notice of Disassociation. FILED IN CORRECT COURT. (SC) | | |
10/20/2022 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c).COA-MG/JT/BB. (COA) | | 22-33057
|
11/15/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Supreme Court. (COA) | | |
11/15/2022 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. (SC) | | |
11/15/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Supreme Court | | |
11/15/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC). | | 22-37688
|
11/15/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
11/30/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on November 17, 2022. (SC) | | 22-37688
|