Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
07/19/2021 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC) | | |
07/19/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement and Notice of Briefing Schedule mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC) | | 21-20715
|
07/19/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Criminal. Due date: 10 days. (SC) | | 21-20717
|
07/28/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Entry and Transmission of Written Judgement of Conviction and Suspending Briefing. District Court Order due: 30 days. The deadlines for filing documents and briefing of this appeal are suspended until further order of this court. (SC) | | 21-21806
|
07/28/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for Defendant. (SC) | | 21-21848
|
07/30/2021 | Order/Incoming | Filed District court order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on July 29, 2021. Judgment of Conviction (Plea of Guilty). (SC) | | 21-22117
|
08/06/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appointed attorney Tony Abbatangelo has filed a motion to withdraw as counsel for appellant. The motion is denied. (SC) | | 21-22835
|
08/10/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Reinstating Briefing. Appellant shall have 21 days from the date of this order to file and serve a case appeal statement, transcript request form or certificate that no transcripts will be requested, and docketing statement. Appellant shall have 120 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 21-23213
|
08/17/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (SC) | | 21-24039
|
08/18/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Copy of District Court Minutes. (SC) | | 21-24084
|
08/31/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 08/13/20, 10/13/20, 10/29/20, 01/28/21 and 07/08/21. To Court Reporter: Yvette G. Sison (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 09/01/21). (SC) | | |
09/01/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Transcript Request. (SC) | | 21-25465
|
09/01/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. (SC) | | 21-25469
|
09/01/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. (SC) | | 21-25470
|
09/01/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 08/13/20, 10/13/20, 10/29/20, 01/28/21 and 07/08/21. To Court Reporter: Yvette G. Sison. (SC) | | 21-25523
|
12/08/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: December 22, 2021. (SC) | | 21-34976
|
12/29/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal. (SC) | | 21-37114
|
01/05/2022 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Letter in regards to attorney. (SC) | | 22-00427
|
01/19/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The motion to withdraw the appeal is denied at this time. Counsel for appellant shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 22-01867
|
01/31/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Reconsideration. (SC) | | 22-03144
|
01/31/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File and Serve Opening Brief and Appendix (Second Request). (SC) | | 22-03159
|
02/03/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Motions. Mr. Abbatangelo has now filed a motion for reconsideration of the direction to file the brief in which, for the second time, counsel asks this court for leave to withdraw from representing appellant. The motion is denied. Mr. Abbatangelo has filed a motion requesting a second extension of time (90 days) to file the opening brief. The motion is granted in part. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: March 4, 2022. (SC) | | 22-03686
|
02/04/2022 | Other | Returned Unfiled Document to appellant B. Dryden in regards to counsel. | | 22-03938
|
03/04/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 3/7/22) (SC) | | |
03/07/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days. | | 22-07128
|
03/07/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellants Appendix. (SC) | | 22-07140
|
03/07/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 22-07154
|
03/08/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Notice of Appearance for John Afshar. (SC) | | 22-07359
|
03/08/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion for Nevada Supreme Court Order Directing the District Court to Enter and Transmit and Order Denying Dryden's Pre-Sentence Motion to Withdraw Guilty Plea. (SC) | | 22-07360
|
03/29/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Respondent now moves this court to direct the district court to enter a written order resolving the motion. The motion is denied. (SC) | | 22-09733
|
04/05/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time - 1st Request (Answering Brief). (SC) | | 22-10525
|
04/05/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. (Answering Brief due: 5/6/22) | | 22-10554
|
05/04/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 22-14154
|
05/04/2022 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix. (SC) | | 22-14155
|
06/03/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 22-17721
|
06/03/2022 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
06/17/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC) | | 22-19278
|
06/17/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Supreme Court. (COA) | | |
06/17/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC) | | |
08/08/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (COA) | | 22-24729
|
08/08/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (SC) | | |
09/02/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Supreme Court. (COA). | | |
09/02/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |
09/02/2022 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. (COA). | | |
09/02/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC). | | 22-27628
|
09/02/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC). | | |
09/15/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on September 6, 2022. (SC) | | 22-27628
|