Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/28/2022 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
06/28/2022 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 22-20370
|
06/28/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 7 days. (SC) | | 22-20373
|
06/29/2022 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from John R. Bailey. E-Payment Ref. no. 22062921315536. (SC) | | |
06/29/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellants - due: 21 days. (SC) | | 22-20473
|
07/01/2022 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Stephen E. Haberfeld. (SC) | | 22-20803
|
07/01/2022 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Minutes. (Sealed) (SC) | | |
07/01/2022 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for August 2, 2022, at 8:30 AM. (SC) | | 22-20890
|
07/19/2022 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 22-22659
|
07/19/2022 | Docketing Statement | Filed Exhibits to Docketing Statement Civil Appeals (part 1). (SC) | | 22-22666
|
07/19/2022 | Docketing Statement | Filed Exhibits to Docketing Statement Civil Appeals (part 2). (SC) | | 22-22668
|
07/26/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent PHWLV, LLC's Notice of Appearance for Jordan T. Smith. (SC) | | 22-23525
|
07/26/2022 | Docketing Statement | Filed Respondent PHWLV, LLC's Response to Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 22-23526
|
09/14/2022 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: October 26, 2022, at 8:30 AM. (SC) | | 22-28869
|
10/26/2022 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC) | | 22-33767
|
10/27/2022 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 22-33821
|
11/10/2022 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 12/14/20 To Court Reporter: Maria Garibay (2 of 2). (SC) | | 22-35604
|
11/10/2022 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 5/17/17 To Court Reporter: Matt Yarbrough. (1 of 2) (SC) | | 22-35605
|
01/24/2023 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 23-02283
|
01/24/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved for Opening Brief and Appendix. Due date February 24, 2023. (SC) | | 23-02290
|
01/27/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Failure to Pay for Appellate Transcripts. (SC). | | 23-02770
|
01/30/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Response to Notice of Failure to Pay for Appellate Transcripts. (SC). | | 23-02850
|
02/06/2023 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Peggy Isom stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/14/20. (SC). | | 23-03510
|
02/22/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend time to file Opening Brief (2nd Request). (SC) | | 23-05475
|
03/01/2023 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Response to Appellants' Motion to Extend Deadline for Opening Brief (Second Request). (SC) | | 23-06105
|
03/02/2023 | Motion | Filed Respondent's (Gordon Ramsay) Response to Appellant's Motion to Extend Deadline for Opening Brief (Second Request). (SC) | | 23-06346
|
03/03/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellants have filed a motion for a second extension of time to file the opening brief and appendix. The motion for a second extension is denied. Appellants shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 23-06512
|
03/10/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Motion to Redact Opening Brief and Seal Confidential Volumes of the Appendix. (SC) | | 23-07509
|
03/10/2023 | Brief | Filed (REDACTED) Appellants' Opening Brief. (SC) | | 23-07520
|
03/10/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 1 of 34. (SC) | | 23-07521
|
03/10/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 2 of 34. (SC) | | 23-07522
|
03/10/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 3 of 34. (SC) | | 23-07523
|
03/10/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 4 of 34. (SC) | | 23-07524
|
03/10/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 5 of 34. (SC) | | 23-07525
|
03/10/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 6 of 34. (SC) | | 23-07526
|
03/10/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 7 of 34. Part 1 of 2 (SC) | | 23-07527
|
03/10/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 8 of 34. (SC) | | 23-07528
|
03/10/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 15 of 34. (SC) | | 23-07529
|
03/10/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 19 of 34. (SC) | | 23-07530
|
03/10/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 20 of 34. Part 1 of 2 (SC) | | 23-07531
|
03/10/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 31 of 34. (SC) | | 23-07532
|
03/10/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 32 of 34. Part 1 of 4 (SC) | | 23-07533
|
03/10/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 33 of 34. (SC) | | 23-07534
|
03/10/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 34 of 34. (SC) | | 23-07535
|
03/23/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the opening brief received on March 13, 2023, under seal, and shall file the volumes of the appendix 18 to 19 and 21 to 32, received on March 13, 2023, under seal. Respondents shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the answering brief. (SC) | | 23-09075
|
03/23/2023 | Brief | Filed (SEALED) Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | |
03/23/2023 | Appendix | Filed (SEALED) Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vols. 8-19 and 21-32. (SC) | | |
04/05/2023 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. (SC) | | 23-10409
|
04/12/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's (Gordon Ramsay) Notice of Appearance for Therese Shanks. (SC) | | 23-11218
|
04/20/2023 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Stipulation to Extend Time to File Answering Brief. (SC) | | 23-12369
|
04/20/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. (SC) | | 23-12399
|
05/24/2023 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Unopposed Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to File Answering Brief (Second Request). (SC) | | 23-16336
|
05/25/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondents shall have until June 14, 2023, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC) | | 23-16469
|
06/14/2023 | Motion | Filed Respondent's (Gordon Ramsay) Motion to Redact Answering Brief. (SC) | | 23-18911
|
06/14/2023 | Brief | Filed Respondent's (Gordon Ramsay) REDACTED Answering Brief. (SC) | | 23-18912
|
06/14/2023 | Motion | Filed Respondent's (PHWLV, LLC) Motion to Redact Respondent's Answering Brief and Seal Confidential Volumes 4-11 of Respondent's Appendix. (SC) | | 23-18924
|
06/14/2023 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's (PHWLV, LLC) REDACTED Appendix to Answering Brief - Vol. 1. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 6/15/2023). (SC) | | 23-18925
|
06/14/2023 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's (PHWLV, LLC) REDACTED Appendix to Answering Brief - Vol. 2. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 6/15/2023). (SC) | | 23-18926
|
06/14/2023 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's (PHWLV, LLC) REDACTED Appendix to Answering Brief - Vol. 3. (SC) | | 23-18927
|
06/14/2023 | Brief | Filed Respondent's (PHWLV, LLC) REDACTED Answering Brief. (SC) | | 23-18928
|
06/15/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Appendix. Corrected appendix due: 5 days. (SC) | | 23-18982
|
06/15/2023 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's (PHWLV, LLC) REDACTED Appendix to Answering Brief - Vol. 1. (SC) | | 23-19058
|
06/15/2023 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's (PHWLV, LLC) REDACTED Appendix to Answering Brief - Vol. 2. (SC) | | 23-19059
|
07/03/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions. Respondents have each filed unopposed motions for leave to file a redacted answering brief, and respondent PHWLV, LLC has filed a motion to file volumes 4 to 11 of its appendix under seal. The clerk of this court shall file Gordon Ramsay's unredacted answering brief received on June 15, 2023, under seal. The clerk shall file PHWLV's unredacted answering brief and volumes 4-11 of the respondents' appendix, received on June 20, 2023, under seal. PHWLV shall have 7 days from the date of this order to provide this court with unredacted volumes 1-3 of the appendix filed on June 14, and 15, 2023, along with a motion for leave to file the unredacted volumes under seal. (SC) | | 23-21103
|
07/03/2023 | Brief | Filed Respondent's (Gordon Ramsay) Answering Brief. (SEALED). (SC) | | |
07/03/2023 | Brief | Filed Respondent's (PHWLV, LLC) Answering Brief. (SEALED). (SC) | | |
07/03/2023 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief Volumes 4-11. (SEALED). (SC) | | |
07/10/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's (PHWLV) Notice of Compliance for Filed Unredacted Appendix - Vols. 1-3. (SC) | | 23-22025
|
07/13/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Stipulation to Extend Time to File Reply Brief. (SC) | | 23-22376
|
07/13/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved to File the Reply Brief. (SC) | | 23-22422
|
08/14/2023 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Reply Brief. (SC) | | 23-26300
|
08/15/2023 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
04/03/2024 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Submitting Appeal for Decision Without Oral Argument. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. (SC) | | 24-11824
|
04/05/2024 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." LS/PL/LB. (SC) | | 24-12025
|
04/18/2024 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellants petition for rehearing due: May 7, 2024. (SC) | | 24-13668
|