Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
07/12/2022 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
07/12/2022 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 22-21893
|
07/12/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 7 days. (SC) | | 22-21895
|
07/26/2022 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Law Offices of Michael F. Bohn. Check no. 17059. (SC) | | |
07/26/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC). | | 22-23470
|
07/27/2022 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Eleissa C. Lavelle. (SC). | | 22-23624
|
08/08/2022 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for October 3, 2022, at 9:30 AM. (SC) | | 22-24700
|
08/17/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. Due date: 7 days. (SC) | | 22-25719
|
08/18/2022 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant's Civil Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 22-25906
|
10/04/2022 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC) | | 22-31303
|
10/06/2022 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 22-31586
|
10/19/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to Show Cause. Appellant's shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondents may file any reply within 14 days from the date that appellant's response is served. Briefing is suspended. (SC) | | 22-32933
|
11/16/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause. (SC) | | 22-36090
|
11/18/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Reinstating Briefing. We conclude that this appeal may proceed, and we reinstate the briefing schedule. Appellant shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file and serve a transcript request form or certificate that no transcript is to be requested. See NRAP 9(a). Appellant shall have 90 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 22-36372
|
11/29/2022 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC) | | 22-37345
|
12/12/2022 | Transcript Request | Filed Respondent's Request for Transcript of Proceedings. (SC). | | 22-38885
|
12/21/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Respondent has filed a "demand for transcript" seeking the production of additional transcripts pursuant to NRAP 9(a)(5). The demand is granted to the following extent. Appellant's supplemental transcript request form due: 7 days. (SC) | | 22-40026
|
01/23/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to File Document. To date, appellant has not filed the supplemental transcript request form or otherwise communicated with this court. Supplemental transcript request form due: 7 days. (SC) | | 23-02188
|
02/16/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for an Extension of Time to file the Opening Brief. (SC) | | 23-04784
|
02/16/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Response to Court Order entered 12/21/22 and Order entered 01/23/23. (SC) | | 23-04786
|
02/17/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion For Extension of Time Approved. Now Due: March 20, 2023(SC) | | 23-04911
|
03/02/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant has now filed a document that informs this court that the transcript in question has been prepared and filed with the district court. Respondent does not dispute this representation. Accordingly, appellant is no longer obligated to file a supplemental transcript request form in this court. (SC) | | 23-06246
|
03/20/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief (Second Request). (SC) | | 23-08588
|
03/21/2023 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 23-08724
|
03/21/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 3/22/23) (SC) | | |
03/22/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Appendix to Opening Brief. Corrected appendix due: 5 days. (SC) | | 23-08789
|
03/22/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vols. 1 of 12. (SC) | | 23-08885
|
03/22/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vols. 2 of 12. (SC) | | 23-08886
|
03/22/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vols. 3 of 12. (SC) | | 23-08887
|
03/22/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vols. 4 of 12. (SC) | | 23-08888
|
03/22/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vols. 5 of 12. (SC) | | 23-08892
|
03/22/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vols. 6 of 12. (SC) | | 23-08893
|
03/22/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vols. 7 of 12. (SC) | | 23-08894
|
03/22/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vols. 8 of 12 Parts 1 & 2. (SC) | | 23-08927
|
03/22/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vols. 9 of 12. (SC) | | 23-08896
|
03/22/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vols. 10 of 12. (SC) | | 23-08898
|
03/22/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vols. 11 of 12. (SC) | | 23-08899
|
03/22/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vols. 12 of 12. (SC) | | 23-08900
|
03/27/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The motion for an extension of time to file the opening brief is granted. The opening brief and appendix were filed on March 21 and 22, 2023. Respondent shall have until April 20, 2023, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC) | | 23-09294
|
04/20/2023 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief and Appendix (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 4/20/2023). (SC) | | 23-12284
|
04/20/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days. (SC) | | 23-12335
|
04/20/2023 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 23-12393
|
04/20/2023 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Supplement to Joint Appendix Volume 9 (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 4/21/2023). (SC) | | |
04/21/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Appendix. Corrected appendix due: 5 days.. (SC) | | 23-12418
|
04/24/2023 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Supplement to Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 9. (SC) | | 23-12617
|
06/02/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief. (SC) | | 23-17349
|
06/12/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's reply brief due: June 21, 2023. (SC) | | 23-18539
|
06/21/2023 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 23-19716
|
06/22/2023 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
09/14/2023 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." LS/PL/LB. (SC) | | 23-30114
|
10/09/2023 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 23-32874
|
10/09/2023 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.(SC) | | |
10/24/2023 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on 10/10/23. (SC) | | 23-32874
|