Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/23/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
12/23/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SEALED) (SC) | | |
12/23/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 7 days. (SC) | | 21-36676
|
12/23/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 7 days. (SC) | | 21-36678
|
01/03/2022 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from Erick M. Ferran. (SC) | | |
01/03/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC) | | 22-00151
|
01/04/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant's Case Appeal Statement due: 7 days. (SC) | | 22-00233
|
01/04/2022 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. | | 22-00276
|
01/05/2022 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant:14 days transcript request form; 40 days fast track statement and appendix. (SC) | | 22-00414
|
01/06/2022 | Filing Fee | Returned Filing Fee. Check No. 1076 returned to Hitzke & Ferran. (SC) | | |
01/20/2022 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 1/8/20, 9/1/20, 4/22/21, 6/30/21, 8/11/21, 8/16/21, and 11/4/21. Court Reporter: Verbatim Reporting & Transcription. Filed in district court on: January 20, 2022. (SC) | | 22-02061
|
01/24/2022 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. (DETACHED EXHIBITS AND FILED UNDER SEAL PER ORDER FILED 5/20/22.) (SC) | | 22-02373
|
02/08/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Enlargement Of Time To File Fast Track Statement/Opening Brief (First Request). (SC) | | 22-04320
|
02/09/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: March 16, 2022. (SC) | | 22-04416
|
02/22/2022 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Maria Balagtas stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/8/20, 9/1/20, 4/22/21, 6/30/21, 8/11/21, 8/16/21, and 11/4/21. (SC) | | 22-05755
|
03/14/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Substitution of Attorney for Amy Porray. (SC) | | 22-08086
|
03/15/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Fast Track Statement and Appendix. (SC) | | 22-08262
|
03/29/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's fast track statement and appendix due: April 6, 2022. (SC) | | 22-09681
|
03/31/2022 | Motion | Filed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Attorney Brandon K. Leavitt, Esq., moves this Court to withdraw as counsel for Respondent, Mr. Justin Martin. (SC) | | 22-10123
|
04/06/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion For Extension of Time to File Fast Track Statement and Appendix. (SC) | | 22-10799
|
04/08/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The clerk shall remove attorney Brandon K. Leavitt and Elizabeth A. Ellison as counsel of record for respondent. Respondent's Notice of Appearance of Counsel due: 21 days. Appellant shall have until April 11, 2022, to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix. (SC) | | 22-11092
|
04/08/2022 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement Child Custody. (SC) | | 22-11191
|
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement, Volume 1. (SEALED PER ORDER FILED 5/20/22). (SC) | | |
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement, Volume 2. (SEALED PER ORDER FILED 5/20/22). (SC) | | |
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement, Volume 3. (SEALED PER ORDER FILED 5/20/22). (SC) | | |
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement, Volume 4. (SEALED PER ORDER FILED 5/20/22). (SC) | | |
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement, Volume 5. (SEALED PER ORDER FILED 5/20/22). (SC) | | |
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement, Volume 6. (SEALED PER ORDER FILED 5/20/22). (SC) | | |
04/11/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Direct the District Court to Transmit Trial Exhibits EE, GG and II to Supreme Court. (SC) | | 22-11431
|
04/26/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant has filed a motion to transmit three original trial exhibits that appellant represents are videos. The unopposed motion is granted. The clerk of the district court shall have 14 days from the date of this order to transmit original exhibits EE, GG, and II to the clerk of this court for consideration with the appendix. (SC) | | 22-13136
|
05/02/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Notice of Change of Address. (SC) | | 22-13844
|
05/02/2022 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response Child Custody. (SC) | | 22-13846
|
05/12/2022 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Reply to Fast Track Response. (SC) | | 22-15169
|
05/12/2022 | Case Status Update | Fast Track Briefing Completed. (SC) | | |
05/18/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Proper Person Emergency Motion under NRAP 27(e). Relief Sought in Respondent's Emergency Motion to Seal Supreme Court Case; Strike Appendices pursuant to NRAP Rule 30(b) and Direct Appellant to Resubmit pursuant to NRAP Rule 30(b)(3)(d); Sanctions on Appellant. (SC) | | 22-15735
|
05/20/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting in Part, Motion to Seal and Directing Response. The clerk of this court shall (1) detach and file under seal the documents attached to appellant's January 24, 2022, docketing statement; (2) seal the appendices filed on April 8, 2022; and (3) file under seal the trial exhibits EE, GG, and II upon their transmittal per this court's April 26, 2022, order. Respondent's request to seal the entire case is denied and his request to strike the appendices as containing irrelevant information is also denied at this time. We defer ruling on his request for sanctions pending our receipt and consideration of appellant's response to that request. Appellant shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve a response to the sanctions request. (SC) | | 22-15978
|
05/27/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant shall have until June 3, 2022, to file and serve the response to the sanctions request. (SC) | | 22-17009
|
06/03/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Respondent's Emergency Motion for Sanctions on Appellant. (SC) | | 22-17785
|
06/06/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Objection to Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Respondent's Emergency Motion for Sanctions on Appellant. (SC). | | 22-17918
|
06/09/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Response to Respondent's Emergency Motion under NRAP 27(e) to Seal Supreme Court Case, Strike Appendices pursuant to NRAP Rule 30(b) and Direct Appellant to Resubmit pursuant to NRAP Rule 30(b)(3)(d); Sanctions on Appellant. (SC) | | 22-18348
|
06/10/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Reply to Appellant's Response to Emergency Motion under NRAP 27(e) to Seal Supreme Court Case, Strike Appendices pursuant to NRAP Rule 30(b) and Direct Appellant to Resubmit pursuant to NRAP Rule 30(b)(3)(d); Sanctions on Appellant. (SC) | | 22-18491
|
06/10/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant, Diamond Hall's Notice of Retraction of Certain Information in Appellant's Response to Respondent's Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(E) to Seal Supreme Court Case; Strike Appendices Pursuant to NRAP Rule 30(b) and Direct Appellant to Resubmit Pursuant to NRAP Rule 30 (b)(3)(d); Sanctions on Appellant. (SC) | | 22-18608
|
06/30/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Sanctions. We admonish appellant's counsel for her failure to properly and diligently prepare the appendices in accordance with court rules and to promptly cure the issue after respondent's notification thereof. In light of appellant's explanation, we decline to issue further sanctions. fn1[Appellant's June 3 motion for an extension of time to file the response is granted, notwithstanding any miscounting of days therein and respondent's objection thereto. Thus, the response, which was submitted on June 8 and filed on June 9, was timely.] (SC) | | 22-20662
|
07/12/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice of Appearance for Emily McFarling. (SC) | | 22-21950
|
07/20/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | 22-22803
|
07/20/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |
07/20/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Supreme Court. (COA). | | |
09/19/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Substitution of Attorneys. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 9/20/22) (SC) | | |
09/20/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. (SC) | | 22-29434
|
09/20/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Substitution of Attorneys for Appellant. (COA) | | 22-29465
|
09/22/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (COA) | | 22-29764
|
09/22/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (SC) | | |
10/17/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Supreme Court. (COA). | | |
10/17/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |
10/17/2022 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. (COA). | | |
10/17/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC). | | 22-32522
|
10/17/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC). | | |
11/04/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 19, 2022. (SC) | | 22-32522
|