Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 85111
Short Caption:ORBITZ WORLDWIDE, LLC VS. DIST. CT. (STATE)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A814111Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:BellCase Status:Scheduled for Argument
Replacement:None for Justice BellPanel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:04/12/2023 at 1:30 PMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/03/2022Filing FeePetition Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Lucy Darilek. E-Payment Ref. no. 22080228068103. (SC)
08/03/2022Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or, In the Alternative, Prohibition. (SC)Y22-24280
08/03/2022AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1. (SC)22-24281
08/03/2022AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 2. (SC)22-24282
08/03/2022MotionFiled Petitioners Motion to Extend District Court's Stay of Proceedings Pending Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. (SC)22-24326
08/18/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer and Granting Motion to Extend District Court's Stay. Real parties in interest, on behalf of respondents, shall have 28 days from the date of this order to file and serve an answer, including authorities, against issuance of the requested writ. Petitioners shall have 14 days from service of the answer to file and serve any reply. Petitioners filed a motion to extend the district court's stay, which is unopposed. We grant petitioners' motion and hereby stay the district court proceedings pending further order of this court. (SC)22-25855
09/14/2022Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Real parties in interest Mark Fierro and Sig Rogich shall have until September 29, 2022, to file and serve their answer to the petition for writ. (SC)22-28780
09/29/2022MotionFiled Motion for Permission to Exceed Word Limit of Real parties in interest Mark Fierro and Sig Rogich Answer to Petitioners' Writ of Mandamus. (SC)22-30633
09/29/2022Petition/WritFiled Real parties in interest Mark Fierro and Sig Rogich Answer to Petitioners' Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. (SC)22-30634
09/29/2022AppendixFiled Real parties in interest Mark Fierro and Sig Rogich Appendix to their Answer to Petitioners' Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. (SC)22-30640
10/11/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Exceed Type-Volume Limit. Real parties in interest Mark Fierro and Sig Rogich have filed a motion for permission to exceed the type-volume limit of their answer to the petition. The motion is granted. Fierro's and Rogich's answer was filed on September 29, 2022. real party in interest State of Nevada's answer was due to be filed on September 15, 2022. To date, State of Nevada has failed to file an answer. State of Nevada shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve its answer. Petitioners shall have 21 days from the date of this order to file and serve any reply. (SC)22-31977
10/18/2022Notice/IncomingFiled Notice Regarding Order Issued October 11, 2022. (State of Nevada will not be filing an answer.) (SC)22-32710
10/24/2022Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Petitioners' reply to answer to writ petition due: November 15, 2022. (SC)22-33350
11/15/2022BriefFiled Petitioners' Reply Brief in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus, or in the Alternative, Prohibition. (SC)22-35983
12/14/2022OtherJustice Linda Bell disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Sat in District Court Proceedings
03/10/2023Order/ProceduralFiled Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter is scheduled for oral argument on April 12, 2023, at 1:30 p.m. in Las Vegas. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. (SC)23-07379
03/28/2023Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)23-09416
03/28/2023Notice/IncomingFiled Petitioners' Notice of Appearance for Todd L. Bice. (SC)23-09556