Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
09/08/2022 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
09/08/2022 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 22-28132
|
09/08/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee/Proper Person. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 14 days. (SC) | | 22-28134
|
09/09/2022 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Documents from District Court Clerk. Civil Confidential Cover Sheet (Sealed). (SC) | | |
09/16/2022 | Brief | Filed Proper Person Brief. Appellant's Informal Brief. (SC) | | 22-29135
|
09/30/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. To date, appellant has not paid the filing fee or otherwise responded to this court's notice. Accordingly, "this appeal is dismissed." (VACATED PER 10/13/22 ORDER). (SC) | | 22-32315
|
10/13/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Vacating Order Dismissing Appeal and Reinstating Appeal. On September 30, 2022, this court inadvertently dismissed this appeal for failing to pay the filing fee. Because the filing fee was timely submitted, the clerk of this court shall vacate the order dismissing this appeal, reinstate this appeal, deposit the filing fee, and issue the notice regarding briefing. (SC) | | 22-32303
|
10/13/2022 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Joseph R. Garcia. Money Order no. 1311696844. (SC) | | |
10/13/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Regarding Deadlines/Fast Track Child Custody. (SC) | | 22-32314
|
10/25/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance for Appellant - Gayle F. Nathan. (SC) | | 22-33580
|
11/01/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Counsel and Referring to Settlement Program. Attorney Gayle Nathan has now filed a notice of appearance on behalf of appellant. Accordingly, the clerk shall add Ms. Nathan as counsel of record for appellant. The clerk shall issue a notice assigning this matter to this court's settlement program. The deadlines for filing documents in this matter are suspended pending further order of this court. (SC) | | 22-34260
|
11/02/2022 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Israel Kunin. (SC) | | 22-34352
|
11/04/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Romeo R. Perez. (SC) | | 22-34709
|
11/15/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall remove attorney Mr. Perez from the docket of this appeal. Respondent shall have 30 days from the date of this order to retain new counsel and cause new counsel to file a notice of appearance with this court. The timelines for further settlement proceedings are stayed pending further order of this court. (SC) | | 22-35836
|
11/28/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. Due date: 7 days. (SC) | | 22-36991
|
11/28/2022 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC). | | 22-37076
|
01/26/2023 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant's Amended Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 23-02563
|
01/27/2023 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief. (SC) | | 23-02634
|
01/30/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Corrected Order Reinstating Briefing Pursuant to NRAP 3E. Appellant shall have 40 days from the date of this order to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with the provisions in NRAP 3E. (SC) | | 23-02842
|
02/14/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Review of appellant's docketing statement and amended docketing statement reveals that appellant is not challenging custody in this appeal. Therefore, we remove this appeal from the provisions of NRAP 3E. Appellant shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve a transcript request form or certificate that no transcripts will be requested. Appellant shall have until April 27, 2023, to file and serve an opening brief and appendix. Respondent shall have 30 days from service of appellant's opening brief to file and serve an answering brief. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). (SC) | | 23-04455
|
02/14/2023 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 4/5/22 and 6/21/22. To Court Reporter: Unknown. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 2/15/23) (SC) | | |
02/15/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Transcript Request. (SC) | | 23-04597
|
02/17/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Certificate that No Transcript is Requested. (SC) | | 23-05088
|
04/27/2023 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 4/27/23) (SC) | | |
04/27/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Opening Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days. (SC) | | 23-13176
|
04/27/2023 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 23-13266
|
04/27/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief (Vol 1). (SC) | | 23-13268
|
04/27/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief (Vol 2 Part 1). (SC) | | 23-13269
|
04/27/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief (Vol 2 Part 2). (SC) | | 23-13270
|
04/27/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief (Vol 3 Part 1). (SC) | | 23-13271
|
04/27/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief (Vol 3 Part 2). (SC) | | 23-13272
|
04/27/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Proof of Service for Opening Brief and Appendices. (SC) | | 23-13276
|
04/27/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Proof of Service of Notice of Rejection of Deficient Opening Brief. (SC) | | 23-13277
|
04/27/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Proof of Service of Rejection of Deficient Opening Brief. (SC) | | 23-13278
|
04/28/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Notice of Appearance for Emily McFarling. (SC) | | 23-13415
|
05/02/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The clerk shall add McFarling as counsel of record for respondent. Respondent shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the answering brief. (SC) | | 23-13781
|
06/01/2023 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 6/2/23) (SC) | | |
06/01/2023 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief. (SC) | | 23-17230
|
06/02/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Answering Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days. (SC) | | 23-17315
|
06/05/2023 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 23-17627
|
07/02/2023 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 23-21093
|
07/03/2023 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
07/21/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | 23-23422
|
07/21/2023 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |