Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
09/19/2022 | Filing Fee | Filing fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded from the District Court. (SC) | | |
09/19/2022 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC) | | 22-29363
|
09/19/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC) | | 22-29371
|
09/21/2022 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Paul M. Haire. (SC) | | 22-29627
|
09/27/2022 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Weinberg, Wheeler, Hudgins, Gunn & Dial, LLC. Check no. 12312. (SC) | | |
10/10/2022 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 22-31825
|
10/19/2022 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for December 21, 2022, at 9:00 AM. (SC) | | 22-32956
|
11/08/2022 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. (SC) | | 22-35114
|
11/14/2022 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant's Amended Civil Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 22-35745
|
12/26/2022 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC) | | 22-40409
|
12/28/2022 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 22-40792
|
01/11/2023 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC) | | 23-00977
|
03/21/2023 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: April 11, 2023. (SC) | | 23-08726
|
04/11/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vols. 1 of 18. (SC) | | 23-11053
|
04/11/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vols. 2 of 18. (SC) | | 23-11054
|
04/11/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vols. 3 of 18. (SC) | | 23-11055
|
04/11/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vols. 4 of 18. (SC) | | 23-11056
|
04/11/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vols. 5 of 18. (SC) | | 23-11057
|
04/11/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vols. 6 of 18. (SC) | | 23-11058
|
04/11/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vols. 7 of 18. (SC) | | 23-11059
|
04/11/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vols. 8 of 18. (SC) | | 23-11060
|
04/11/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vols. 9 of 18. (SC)8 | | 23-11061
|
04/11/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vols. 10 of 18. (SC) | | 23-11064
|
04/11/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vols. 11 of 18. (SC) | | 23-11067
|
04/11/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vols. 12 of 18. (SC) | | 23-11072
|
04/11/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vols. 13 of 18. (SC) | | 23-11073
|
04/11/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vols. 14 of 18. (SC) | | 23-11074
|
04/11/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vols. 15 of 18. (SC) | | 23-11076
|
04/11/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vols. 16 of 18. (SC) | | 23-11078
|
04/11/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vols. 17 of 18. (SC) | | 23-11079
|
04/11/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vols. 18 of 18. (SC) | | 23-11080
|
04/11/2023 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 23-11149
|
04/17/2023 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Unopposed motion for extension of time to file Answering Brief (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 4/17/23) (SC) | | |
04/17/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection for Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief - No Notice of Appearance. (SC) | | 23-11625
|
04/18/2023 | Motion | Filed Amici Curiae Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Amici Brief for The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America and the Vegas Chamber of Commerce in Support of Appellant. (SC) | | 23-12018
|
04/18/2023 | Brief | Filed Amici Curiae (The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America & the Vegas Chamber of Commerce) Amicus Brief. (SC) | | 23-12019
|
04/19/2023 | Motion | Filed Respondent's (Sandra Eskew) Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief. (SC) | | 23-12201
|
05/02/2023 | Motion | Filed Stipulation For Extension Of Time To File Answering Brief. (SC) | | 23-13795
|
05/03/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America and the Vegas Chamber of Commerce (hereinafter, amici) have filed a motion for leave to file a brief of amicus curiae in support of appellant. Amici represent that all parties to the appeal consent to the filing of the brief. Attached to the motion is written consent (in the form of emails) from both parties to file the brief. Under these circumstances, no leave of court is required to file the amicus brief. This court takes no action on the motion. The brief of amicus curiae was filed on April 18, 2023. Respondent's motion for an extension of time to file the answering brief is granted. Respondent shall have until June 26, 2023, to file and serve the answering brief. fn1[ Given this order, this court takes no action on the May 2, 2023, stipulation for an extension of time to file answering brief.] (SC) | | 23-13897
|
06/26/2023 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 6/27/23) (SC) | | |
06/26/2023 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 6/27/23) (SC) | | |
06/27/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Answering Brief and Appendix - No Notice of Appearance. Due in 5 days. (SC) | | 23-20380
|
06/27/2023 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief. (SC) | | 23-20437
|
06/27/2023 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 23-20443
|
06/27/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Notice of Admission Pursuant to SCR 42. (SC) | | 23-20444
|
07/05/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Respondent has filed a notice informing this court that foreign counsel Douglas A. Terry, Matthew W.H. Wessler, and Deepak Gupta, were granted admission to appear in the underlying matter under SCR 42. If Wessler wishes to be recognized as counsel of record, he must file a notice of appearance in this court in accordance with NRAP 46(a)(2). (SC) | | 23-21325
|
07/05/2023 | Brief | Filed Amicus Curiae's (National Association of Proton Therapy) Brief. (SC) | | 23-21356
|
07/05/2023 | Motion | Filed Amicus Curiae's (National Association of Proton Therapy) Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief. (SC) | | 23-21357
|
07/12/2023 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend Time to File Reply Brief. (SC) | | 23-22332
|
07/13/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Stipulation to Extend Time to File Reply Brief Approved. Due August 28, 2023.(SC) | | 23-22358
|
07/13/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Amicus Curiae's Notice of Correction of Firm Name for Attorney Daniel Hayward. (SC) | | 23-22443
|
07/20/2023 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Associate Counsel for Robert Daniel Friedman. (SC) | | 23-23315
|
07/21/2023 | Motion | Filed Amicus Curiae's (National Association of Proton Therapy) Motion to Associate Counsel Agatha Cole. (SC) | | 23-23388
|
07/25/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The National Association for Proton Therapy has filed an untimely motion for leave to file a brief of amicus curiae. The unopposed motion is granted. The amicus brief was filed on July 5, 2023. (SC) | | 23-23684
|
07/28/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions. Respondent has filed a motion to associate attorney Robert Daniel Friedman in this matter pursuant to SCR 42. The motion is granted. Mr. Friedman shall be permitted to appear on behalf of respondent in this appeal. Amicus curiae National Association for Proton Therapy has filed a motion to associate attorney Agatha Marie Cole in this matter pursuant to SCR 42. The motion is granted. Ms. Cole shall be permitted to appear on behalf of amicus curiae National Association for Proton Therapy in this appeal. (SC) | | 23-24320
|
08/28/2023 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 23-28016
|
08/29/2023 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
01/03/2024 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument would be of assistance in resolving the issues presented in this matter. Accordingly, oral argument is scheduled for February 7, 2024, at 11:30 a.m., in Las Vegas. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. (SC). | | 24-00166
|
01/24/2024 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC) | | 24-02728
|
01/26/2024 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice of Appearance for Oral Argument for Thomas Dupree. (SC) | | 24-03136
|
01/29/2024 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Notice of Supplemental Authority. (SC) | | 24-03435
|
02/02/2024 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Response to Plaintiff's Notice of Supplemental Authority. (SC) | | 24-04176
|
02/07/2024 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. (SC) | | |