Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Administrative Case: ADKT 0604
Short Caption:IN THE MATTER OF THE ENACTMENT OF LOCAL RULES FOR THE LAS VEGAS JUSTICE COURT RELATING TO TRAFFIC CITATIONSCourt:Supreme Court
Classification:Administrative - ADKT - ADKTCase Status:Public Hearing Held
Filed Date:09/23/2022Public Hearing:
Closed Date:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/23/2022Administrative CaseFiled Petition. (emailed copy)Y22-29942
09/26/2022Administrative CaseFiled Petition. (original copy).22-30170
09/28/2022Administrative CaseFiled Order Scheduling Public Hearing.22-30543
10/05/2022Administrative CaseFiled Order Rescheduling Public Hearing.22-31419
11/16/2022Administrative CaseFiled Amendment to Exhibit A of Petition.22-36023
11/22/2022Administrative CasePublic Hearing Held. Public Hearing held on the Administrative Docket 0604.
11/23/2022Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Hon. Melissa A. Saragosa.22-36826