Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/16/2023 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for appeal. (SC) | | |
02/16/2023 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 23-04761
|
02/16/2023 | Other | Justice Ron Parraguirre disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Law Firms. (SC) | | |
02/16/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 7 days. (SC) | | 23-04763
|
02/16/2023 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from Erika A. Pike Turner. (SC) | | |
02/16/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellants - due: 21 days. (SC) | | 23-04845
|
02/21/2023 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Stephen E. Haberfeld. (SC) | | 23-05131
|
02/21/2023 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for March 7, 2023, at 2:00 PM. (SC) | | 23-05232
|
03/09/2023 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant's Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 23-07296
|
03/27/2023 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Motion to Dismiss Interlocutory Appeal. (SC) | | 23-09382
|
03/28/2023 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC) | | 23-09451
|
03/28/2023 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Stayed. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. The settlement proceedings are concluded and this appeal may proceed. Briefing and compliance with NRAP 9(a) shall remain suspended pending this court's review and resolution of respondent's motion to dismiss the appeal. (SC) | | 23-09531
|
04/03/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Response to Motion to Dismiss. (SC) | | 23-10188
|
04/10/2023 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Appeal (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 4/11/23) (SC) | | |
04/11/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Reply in Support of Motion. Due in 5 days (SC) | | 23-11123
|
04/12/2023 | Brief | Filed Respondents' Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (SC) | | 23-11317
|
04/13/2023 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. Amended NOA. (SC) | | 23-11386
|
04/13/2023 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Cross-Appeal. (SC) | | |
04/13/2023 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for cross-appellant.) (SC) | | 23-11390
|
04/13/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Cross-Appeal Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 7 days. (SC) | | 23-11392
|
04/17/2023 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from Colleen Savage. (SC) | | |
04/25/2023 | Docketing Statement | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 23-12957
|
04/25/2023 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Case Appeal Statement. (SC) | | 23-12958
|
05/19/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. Smith Plastic Surgery Institute and Lane F. Smith, M.D. (collectively, Smith) have filed a motion to dismiss the appeal of Christopher Khorsandi, M.D. and Christopher Khorsandi, M.D., PLLC (collectively, Khorsandi) of the January 19, 2023, order for lack of jurisdiction. This court agrees with Smith. Smith's appeal may proceed. The clerk shall modify the caption of this appeal to reflect that Smith is the appellant and Khorsandi is the respondent. Smith's transcript request form due: 7 days. Opening brief and appendix due: 90 days. (SC) | | 23-15965
|
05/26/2023 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC). | | 23-16617
|
07/20/2023 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellants' opening brief and appendix due: August 31, 2023. (SC) | | 23-23302
|
08/23/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellants' Notice of Change of Attorney Address. (SC) | | 23-27561
|
08/31/2023 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Opening Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 9/1/23) (SC) | | |
09/01/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days. (SC) | | 23-28687
|
09/01/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 1. (SC) | | 23-28723
|
09/01/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief- Volumes 2, 7, and 8.(REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 9/1/2023). (SC) | | |
09/01/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 3. (SC) | | 23-28727
|
09/01/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 4. (SC) | | 23-28730
|
09/01/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 5. (SC) | | 23-28734
|
09/01/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 6. (6 AA 1197, 6 AA 1220-60 STRICKEN PER 12/1/23 ORDER). (SC) | | 23-28736
|
09/01/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Appendix. Corrected appendix due: 5 days. (SC) | | 23-28756
|
09/01/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Appendix. Corrected appendix due: 5 days. (SC) | | 23-28830
|
09/06/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol 7. (STRICKEN PER 12/1/23 ORDER). (SC) | | |
09/06/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 8 (STRICKEN PER 12/1/23 ORDER). (SC) | | |
09/06/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 2. (SC) | | 23-29114
|
09/06/2023 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Opening Brief. (STRICKEN PER 12/1/23 ORDER). (SC) | | |
09/27/2023 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondents answering brief due: October 20, 2023. (SC) | | 23-31734
|
10/20/2023 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Strike.(SC) | | 23-34220
|
10/20/2023 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief.(SC) | | 23-34285
|
10/30/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Opposition to Respondents' Motion to Strike.(REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 10/31/2023)(untimely)(SC) | | |
10/31/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document.(untimely)(SC) | | 23-35451
|
10/31/2023 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Respondents' Motion to Strike. (SC) | | 23-35477
|
11/01/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Opposition to Respondents' Motion to Strike.(SC) | | 23-35513
|
11/03/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellants have filed an untimely motion for extension of time to file an opposition to respondents' motion to strike. The motion is granted. The opposition was filed on November 1, 2023. Respondents shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve any reply. (SC) | | 23-35817
|
11/07/2023 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Reply in Support of Motion to Strike.(SC) | | 23-36206
|
11/13/2023 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellants' reply brief due: December 4, 2023. (SC) | | 23-36854
|
12/01/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting in Part Motion to Strike. Respondents have filed a motion to strike portions of appellants' appendix. Appellants oppose the motion and respondents have replied. Having reviewed the parties' filings and the appendix, the motion to strike is granted. The clerk shall strike these pages from appellants' appendix 6 AA 1197, 6 AA 1220-60, and the entirety of volumes 7 and 8. This court declines to strike the appendix based on the failure to confer or the alleged inclusion of irrelevant or scandalous material. Because large portions of appellants' opening brief cite to the now stricken pages of the appendix, the motion to strike portions of the opening brief is granted to the following extent. The clerk shall strike the opening brief in its entirety. Appellants shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file and serve an amended opening brief. Appellants shall have 21 days from the date of this order to file and serve any reply brief. (SC) | | 23-39026
|
12/04/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Notice of Supplemental Authority(SC) | | 23-39240
|
12/04/2023 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief.(SC) | | 23-39266
|
12/08/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Leave to Respond to Respondents' Notice of Supplemental Authorities.(SC) | | 23-39869
|
12/13/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellants have filed a motion for leave to file a response to respondents' notice of supplemental authorities. No leave of court is required to file a reply to a notice of supplemental authorities. NRAP 31(e). Should appellants wish to file a reply to the notice, they may do so within 7 days of the date of this order. (SC) | | 23-40461
|
12/15/2023 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief (SC) | | 23-40749
|
12/15/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 1 (SC) | | 23-40759
|
12/15/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 2 (SC) | | 23-40761
|
12/15/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 3 (SC) | | 23-40763
|
12/15/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 4 (SC) | | 23-40764
|
12/15/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 5 (SC) | | 23-40765
|
12/15/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 6 (SC) | | 23-40766
|
12/15/2023 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening.(SC) | | |
12/20/2023 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Response to Respondents' Notice of Supplemental Authority Pursuant to NRAP 31(E)(SC) | | 23-41390
|
01/12/2024 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | 24-01389
|
01/12/2024 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |
03/22/2024 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." COA-MG/BB/DW. (SC) | | |
04/16/2024 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals.(SC) | | |
04/16/2024 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur.(SC) | | 24-13229
|
04/16/2024 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.(SC) | | |
04/23/2024 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on 4/17/24. (SC) | | 24-13229
|