Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/17/2023 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC) | | |
05/17/2023 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day (A844463). (SC) | | 23-15640
|
05/17/2023 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (C320368) (SC) | | 23-15641
|
05/30/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record and Filing of Brief. Order Directing Transmission of Record. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Within 120 days, appellant may file either (1) a brief that complies with the requirements in NRAP 28(a) and NRAP 32; or (2) the "Informal Brief Form for Pro Se Parties" provided by the supreme court clerk. NRAP 31(a)(1). If no brief is submitted, the appeal may be decided on the record on appeal. (SC) | | 23-16836
|
05/31/2023 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Motion to Transmit Video Evidence. (SC). | | 23-16975
|
06/07/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a pro se motion that appears to request that this court order the district court clerk to transmit all exhibits and evidence in this matter to this court and provide appellant with a copy. The motion is denied at this time. (SC) | | 23-17966
|
06/07/2023 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed District Court's Record on Appeal (Case No. C-17-320368-1) - Vol. 1. (SC) | | 23-18026
|
06/07/2023 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed District Court's Record on Appeal (Case No. C-17-320368-1)- Vol. 2. (SC) | | 23-18027
|
06/07/2023 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed District Court's Record on Appeal (Case No. C-17-320368-1)- Vol. 3. (SC) | | 23-18028
|
06/07/2023 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed District Court's Record on Appeal (Case No. C-17-320368-1)- Vol. 4. (SC) | | 23-18029
|
06/07/2023 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed District Court's Record on Appeal (Case No. A-21-844463-W) - Vol. 1. (SC) | | 23-18030
|
06/07/2023 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed District Court's Record on Appeal (Case No. A-21-844463-W) - Vol. 2. (SC) | | 23-18031
|
06/07/2023 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed District Court's Record on Appeal (Case No. A-21-844463-W) - Vol. 3. (SC) | | 23-18032
|
06/07/2023 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed District Court's Record on Appeal (Case No. A-21-844463-W) - Vol. 4. (SC) | | 23-18033
|
06/07/2023 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed District Court's Record on Appeal (Case No. A-21-844463-W) - Vol. 5. (SC) | | 23-18034
|
06/12/2023 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed (SEALED) Confidential District Court Documents. Document: Presentence Investigation Report. Added to Record on Appeal as pages: 173-185. (SC) | | |
06/12/2023 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed (SEALED) Confidential District Court Documents. Added to Record on Appeal as pages: 1-29, 677-691, 770-785, and 786-801. | | |
06/28/2023 | Motion | Filed Proper Person's Motion for Bail Pending Appeal. (SC) | | 23-20618
|
07/05/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Notice of Appearance for John Afshar. (SC) | | 23-21364
|
07/05/2023 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Response to Appellant's Motion - State's Opposition for Bail Pending Appeal. (SC) | | 23-21366
|
07/18/2023 | Motion | Filed Proper Person's Reply to the State's Response to Hampton's Motion for Bail Pending Appeal. (SC) | | 23-22867
|
07/24/2023 | Brief | Filed Proper Person's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 23-23612
|
07/25/2023 | Other | Proper Person Returned Unfiled Document. (SC) | | 23-23630
|
07/28/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant has filed a pro se motion for bail pending appeal. Respondent opposes the motion and appellant has replied. NRS 178.4873 clearly provides that if the district court enters an order denying a postconviction petition for habeas corpus, "the petitioner must not be released on the petitioner's own recognizance or admitted to bail pending any appeal." This statute controls over the more general statutes governing bail pending appeal. Here, the district court denied appellant's postconviction petition for habeas corpus. Therefore, appellant is not entitled to bail pending appeal and the motion is denied. (SC) | | 23-24318
|
09/06/2023 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. (SC) | | |
09/28/2023 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion to Seal and Redact Court Records.(SC) (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS PER 10/16/23 NOTICE) | | 23-31784
|
09/28/2023 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion for Permission to Attend Funeral of my Mother with a Transport Order at Petitioner's Expense. (SC) (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS PER 10/16/23 NOTICE) | | 23-31785
|
10/03/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Notice of Appearance.(John Afshar, for Respondent.)(SC) | | 23-32309
|
10/03/2023 | Motion | Filed State's Response to Appellant's Petition for Permission to Attend Funeral Of My Mother With A Transport Order At Petitioner's Expense And Motion To Seal And Redact Court Records.(SC) (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS PER 10/16/23 NOTICE) | | 23-32311
|
10/16/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | 23-33692
|
10/16/2023 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |
04/25/2024 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." COA-MG/BB/DW (SC) | | |
07/11/2024 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals | | |
07/11/2024 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Proper Person Petition for Review by the Supreme Court (Petition for En Banc Reconsideration) (ISSUED NOTICE TO PROVIDE PROOF OF SERVICE)(SC) | | 24-24161
|
07/11/2024 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 7 days.(Petition for Review)(SC) | | 24-24173
|
07/24/2024 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Proof of Service for Petition for Review by the Supreme Court (Petition for En Banc Reconsideration)(SC) | | 24-25773
|
08/06/2024 | Post-Judgment Order/Dispositional | Order Denying Petition for Review. "Review denied.' Stiglich, J., dissenting. En Banc (SC) | | 24-27592
|
08/06/2024 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur.(SC) | | 24-27607
|
08/06/2024 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.(SC) | | |
08/16/2024 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court clerk on 8/08/24. (SC) | | 24-27607
|