Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/28/2023 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC) | | |
06/28/2023 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 23-20662
|
06/29/2023 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. Second NOA. (REMOVED AND DOCKETED AS A NEW APPEAL PER 7/5/23 ORDER). (SC) | | |
07/05/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The clerk of this court erroneously docketed the June 29 notice of appeal as a second notice of appeal in the instant case. Accordingly, the clerk of this court shall remove the notice of appeal erroneously docketed in this case on June 29, 2023, from the docket of this case, and docket it as a separate appeal. (SC) | | 23-21404
|
07/13/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Consolidating Appeals, Directing Transmission of Record, and Regarding Briefing. These appeals are consolidated for all appellate purposes. District court record due: 30 days. Appellant's brief due: 120 days. Nos 86846/86893. (SC) | | 23-22474
|
07/28/2023 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Nos. 86846/86893 (SC). | | 23-24177
|
07/28/2023 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed District Court's Record on Appeal - Vol. 1. Nos. 86846/86893. (SC) | | 23-24226
|
07/28/2023 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed District Court's Record on Appeal - Vol. 2. Nos. 86846/86893. (SC) | | 23-24227
|
07/28/2023 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed District Court's Record on Appeal - Vol. 3. Nos. 86846/86893. (SC) | | 23-24228
|
07/28/2023 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed District Court's Record on Appeal - Vol. 4. Nos. 86846/86893. (SC) | | 23-24229
|
07/28/2023 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed District Court's Record on Appeal - Vol. 5. Nos. 86846/86893. (SC) | | 23-24230
|
07/28/2023 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed District Court's Record on Appeal - Vol. 6. Nos. 86846/86893. (SC) | | 23-24239
|
07/28/2023 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed District Court's Record on Appeal - Vol. 7. Nos. 86846/86893. (SC) | | 23-24231
|
07/28/2023 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed District Court's Record on Appeal - Vol. 8. Nos. 86846/86893. (SC) | | 23-24232
|
07/28/2023 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed District Court's Record on Appeal - Vol. 9. Nos. 86846/86893. (SC) | | 23-24233
|
08/02/2023 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed (SEALED) Confidential District Court Documents. Record on Appeal - Vols. 10-16. Nos. 86846/86893. (SC) | | |
08/02/2023 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed (SEALED) Confidential District Court Documents. Document: Presentence Investigation Report. Nos. 86846/86893. (SC) | | |
08/31/2023 | Brief | Filed Proper Person's Informal Brief. Nos. 86846/86893. (SC) | | 23-28650
|
09/13/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order of Limited Remand for Appointment of Counsel. This court remands this appeal to the district court for the limited purpose of securing counsel for appellant. District court order appointing counsel due: 37 days. Briefing suspended. fn1 [Given this order, appellant's pro se motion for the appointment of counsel is denied as moot.] Nos. 86846/86893. (SC) | | 23-29961
|
09/28/2023 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order Appointing Counsel referred to the administrator of the Court- Appointed Counsel for appointment of counsel Nos. 86846/86893. (SC) | | 23-31807
|
09/28/2023 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order Appointing Counsel. Nos. 86846/86893.(DUPLICATE ENTRY)(SC) | | 23-31808
|
10/03/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance.(Karla K. Butko for Appellant)Nos. 86846/86893.(SC) | | 23-32360
|
10/04/2023 | Order/Incoming | Filed certified copy of order filed in district court on October 4, 2023 appointing Karla Butko, as counsel for appellant. Nos. 86846/86893.(SC) | | 23-32502
|
10/04/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance.(Karla K. Butko for Appellant)Nos. 86846/86893.(SC) | | 23-32514
|
10/11/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Setting Briefing Schedule. Pursuant to a limited remand, the district court has appointed Karla Butko with Karla K. Butko, Ltd., as counsel for appellant. The clerk of this court shall add Karla Butko with Karla K. Butko, Ltd., as counsel of record for appellant in this appeal. Appellant shall have 21 days from the date of this order to file and serve a transcript request form or certificate that no transcripts will be requested, and the docketing statement. Appellant shall have 120 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed as provided in NRAP 31(a)(1). Nos. 86846/86893 (SC) | | 23-33127
|
10/26/2023 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. Nos. 86846/86893(SC) | | 23-35015
|
10/26/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Consolidate Appeals. Nos. 86846/86893 (SC) | | 23-35016
|
10/26/2023 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant's Docketing Statement Nos. 86846/86893 (SC) | | 23-35017
|
10/26/2023 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant's Docketing Statement Nos. 86846/86893 (SC) | | 23-35018
|
10/26/2023 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. Nos. 86846/86893 (SC) | | 23-35019
|
10/26/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Consolidate Appeals.(SC) | | 23-35020
|
10/31/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motions. Appellant has filed motions to consolidate these appeals "into Docket No. 86846." To the extent appellant seeks consolidation of these two appeals, the motion is denied as moot as the appeals are already consolidated. To the extent appellant seeks to have these appeals proceed under a single docket number, the motion is denied. Appellant shall file a single appendix and a single opening brief addressing all issues in these appeals. Nos. 86846/86893 (SC) | | 23-35378
|
01/31/2024 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Unseal Appendix volumes 11-16 Nos. 86846/86893 (SC) | | 24-03721
|
01/31/2024 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Continuance/Extension of Time in Which to File Appellant's Opening Brief. Nos. 86846/86893 (SC) | | 24-03722
|
01/31/2024 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Unseal Appendix volumes 11-16 Nos. 86846/86893 (SC) | | 24-03724
|
01/31/2024 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Continuance/Extension of Time in Which to File Appellant's Opening Brief. Nos. 86846/86893 (SC) | | 24-03725
|
03/01/2024 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The district court clerk filed the record on appeal in this court on July 28, 2023, and August 2, 2023. Volumes 10-16 were filed under seal. Appellant has now filed a motion to unseal volumes 11-16. Counsel for appellant states she cannot access those volumes to prepare the opening brief. Review of the sealed volumes of the appendix reveals they contain some documents that appear to have been filed on the district court's public docket. The district court clerk shall have 14 days from the date of this order to inform this court, in writing, which of the documents included in volumes 10-16 of the sealed record on appeal were filed under seal in the district court. For any documents that were filed under seal in the district court, the clerk shall provide this court with a copy of any district court order sealing those documents or inform this court of the basis for sealing those documents. For any documents in the sealed volumes of the record on appeal that were not sealed in the district court, the clerk shall provide this court with the basis for filing the documents in this court under seal. This court defers ruling on appellant's motion to unseal pending further order of this court. Appellant has also filed a motion for an extension of time to file the opening brief. The motion is granted. Appellant shall have until April 8, 2024, to file and serve the opening brief. Nos. 86846/86893 (SC) | | 24-07574
|
03/15/2024 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Documents from District Court Clerk. Response to Order on March 1, 2024. Nos. 86846/86893 (SC) | | 24-09273
|
03/27/2024 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief Nos. 86846/86893 (SC) | | 24-10913
|
03/27/2024 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Supplemental Appendix Nos. 86846/86893 (SC) | | 24-10914
|
03/27/2024 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief Nos. 86846/86893 (SC) | | 24-10915
|
03/27/2024 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Supplemental Appendix Nos. 86846/86893 (SC) | | 24-10916
|
04/01/2024 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Re: Motion to Unseal. Counsel for appellant filed a motion to unseal volumes 11-16 of the record on appeal transmitted to this court by the district court clerk. It appears that appellant's July 13, 2016, and October 7, 2016, petitions for writs of habeas corpus and the majority of the exhibits to those petitions were not filed under seal in the district court. It does not appear that sealing these petitions and exhibits in this court is warranted. It also does not appear that the August 23, 2018, application to produce prisoner should be filed under seal in this court. Appellant's motion to unseal is granted to the following extent. The clerk of this court shall unseal pages 359-454 (volume 11), 468-873 (volumes 11-13), 891-1005 (volumes 13-14), 1019-1566 (volumes 14-16), and 1647-49 (volume 16) of the record on appeal filed on August 2, 2023. Nos. 86846/86893 (SC) | | 24-11423
|
04/01/2024 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal pages 359-454 (volume 11). (UNSEALED PER 4/1/23 ORDER). Nos. 86846/86893. (SC) | | 24-11429
|
04/01/2024 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Pages 468-873 (volumes 11-13). (UNSEALED PER 4/1/23 ORDER). Nos. 86846/86893 (SC) | | 24-11435
|
04/01/2024 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Pages 891-1005 (volumes 13-14). (UNSEALED PER 4/1/23 ORDER). Nos. 86846/86893 (SC) | | 24-11441
|
04/01/2024 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Pages 1019-1566 (volumes 14-16). (UNSEALED PER 4/1/23 ORDER). Nos. 86846/86893 (SC) | | 24-11443
|
04/01/2024 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Pages 1647-49 (volume 16). (UNSEALED PER 4/1/23 ORDER). Nos. 86846/86893 (SC) | | 24-11444
|
04/26/2024 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondents answering brief due: May 10, 2024. Nos 86846/86893 (SC) | | 24-14666
|