Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
07/01/2015 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing fee waived. Criminal. | | |
07/01/2015 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | | 15-20137
|
07/21/2015 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 3/23/15, 3/24/15, 3/25/15, 3/26/15, 4/14/15 and 5/27/15. To Court Reporter: Susan Dolorino. | | 15-21969
|
07/22/2015 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement - Criminal Appeal. | | 15-22149
|
08/07/2015 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Court Reporter Amber Riggio's Certificate of Delivery of Transcripts due: September 14, 2015. | | 15-23940
|
09/18/2015 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Amber M. Raiggio stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 3/23/15, 3/24/15, 3/25/15, 3/26/15, 4/14/15 and 5/27/15. | | 15-28314
|
10/16/2015 | Motion | Filed Appellant Michael Joseph Jeffries' Motion for Extension of Time Within Which to File Opening Brief. | | 15-31589
|
10/23/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: January 27, 2016. | | 15-32433
|
01/25/2016 | Motion | Filed Appellant Michael Joseph Jeffries' Motion for Enlargement of Time Within Which to File Opening Brief (Second Request). | | 16-02525
|
02/03/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: February 10, 2016. | | 16-03736
|
02/11/2016 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. | | 16-04482
|
02/11/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 1. | | 16-04483
|
02/11/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 2. | | 16-04485
|
02/11/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 3. | | 16-04486
|
03/14/2016 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time - First Request (Answering Brief). | | 16-08005
|
03/21/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: April 28, 2016. | | 16-08843
|
04/28/2016 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time - Second Request (Answering Brief). | | 16-13405
|
05/11/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: June 1, 2016. | | 16-14758
|
06/01/2016 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time - Third Request (Answering Brief). | | 16-17070
|
06/20/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the answering brief received on June 13, 2016. Reply Brief due: 30 days. | | 16-19212
|
06/20/2016 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. | | 16-19213
|
07/01/2016 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Release Pending Appeal. | | 16-20670
|
07/01/2016 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Imposition of Sanctions Against Respondent State of Nevada. | | 16-20671
|
07/05/2016 | Motion | Filed Opposition to Motion for Release Pending Appeal. | | 16-20829
|
07/05/2016 | Motion | Filed Opposition to Motion for Imposition of Sanctions. | | 16-20830
|
07/06/2016 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Reply in Support of Motion for Imposition of Sanctions Against Respondent State of Nevada. | | 16-20943
|
07/06/2016 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Reply in Support of Motion for Release Pending Appeal. | | 16-20981
|
07/21/2016 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. | | 16-22681
|
07/21/2016 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | | |
07/27/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion for Sanctions. | | 16-23351
|
08/09/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a motion for release pending appeal. We deny the motion. | | 16-24670
|
09/08/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Submitting Appeal for Decision Without Oral Argument. | | 16-27933
|
09/21/2016 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Reconsider Submission for Decision Without Oral Argument. | | 16-29241
|
10/12/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion for Reconsideration. No cause appearing, appellant's motion for reconsideration of the order submitting this appeal for decision without oral argument is denied at this time. | | 16-31765
|
11/08/2016 | Brief | Filed Appellant Michael Joseph Jeffries' Notice of Supplemental Authorities. | | 16-34822
|
11/21/2016 | Brief | Filed Appellant Michael Joseph Jeffries' Second Notice of Supplemental Authorities. | | 16-36177
|
11/21/2016 | Brief | Filed Appellant Michael Joseph Jeffries' Corrected Second Notice of Supplemental Authorities. | | 16-36257
|
02/28/2017 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar. | | 17-06868
|
03/01/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Thursday, April 13, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas. | | 17-07054
|
03/29/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | 17-10460
|
04/13/2017 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Southern Panel. SNP17 - MD/MG/KP | | |
07/06/2017 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before: Douglas/Gibbons/Pickering. Author: Douglas, J. Majority: Douglas/Gibbons/Pickering. 133 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 47. SNP17-MD/MG/KP | | 17-22230
|
07/25/2017 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant Michael Joseph Jeffries' Petition for Rehearing of Panel Order of Affirmance. | | 17-24589
|
07/31/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Answer due: 15 days. | | 17-25230
|
08/15/2017 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time - First Request (Answer to Petition for Rehearing). | | 17-27303
|
08/18/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent's Answer to Petition for Rehearing due: 30 days. | | 17-27783
|
09/15/2017 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Answer to Petition for Rehearing. | | 17-31250
|
09/29/2017 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). | | 17-33158
|
10/16/2017 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant Michael Joseph Jeffreies' Petition for Reconsideration En Banc (Petition for En Banc Reconsideration). | | 17-35179
|
11/29/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Answer To Petition For En Banc Reconsideration. Answer due: 15 days. | | 17-41078
|
12/14/2017 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondent's Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. | | 17-43214
|
01/18/2018 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." Cherry, J., dissenting. EN BANC | | 18-02584
|
02/12/2018 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 18-05678
|
02/12/2018 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
03/09/2018 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on February 22, 2018. | | 18-05678
|