Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/29/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
01/29/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 21-02901
|
01/29/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 21-02903
|
01/29/2021 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from Aaron Grigsby. (SC) | | |
02/01/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC) | | 21-02963
|
02/09/2021 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: James J. Jimmerson. (SC) | | 21-03817
|
02/22/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant's Civil Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 21-05162
|
03/08/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Other. The Settlement Judge requests that the court reassign this case due to possible conflict. Case Nos. 82412/82413. (SC) | | 21-06595
|
03/08/2021 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Settlement Judge Reassignment. Issued Amended Notice of Assignment to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. New Settlement Judge: Ara H. Shirinian. (SC) | | 21-06613
|
04/05/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for April 30, 2021, at 10:00 am. Case Nos. 82412/82413. (SC). | | 21-09773
|
05/03/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Case Nos. 82412/82413. (SC) | | 21-12647
|
05/04/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Stay of Orders entered on December 24, 2020 and January 11, 2021 in case D-13-477883-D. (SC) | | 21-12746
|
05/04/2021 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Consolidating Appeals and Reinstating Briefing. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. Nos. 82412/82413. (SC) | | 21-12785
|
05/11/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Opposition to Motion for Stay. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 5/11/21) (SC) | | |
05/11/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Of Rejection - No Notice Of Appearance. (SC) | | 21-13564
|
05/17/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Radford J. Smith, Esq. and Kimberly A. Stutzman, Esq. for respondent. (SC) | | 21-14109
|
05/17/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Opposition to Appellant's Motion for Stay. (SC) | | 21-14111
|
05/17/2021 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order After March 25, 2021 Hearing filed in District Court on 4/12/21, and Notice of Entry of Order After March 25, 2021 Hearing filed in District Court on 4/13/21. Nos. 82412/82413. (SC) | | 21-14189
|
05/17/2021 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order After March 26, 2021 Hearing filed in District Court on 5/3/21, and Notice of Entry of Order After March 26, 2021 Hearing filed in District Court on 5/5/21. Nos. 82412/82413. (SC) | | 21-14190
|
05/18/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 12/3/20. To Court Reporter: Rachel Chaisson. Nos. 82412/82413 (SC) | | 21-14287
|
05/18/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to Show Cause. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why the appeal in Docket No. 82412 should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. The preparation of transcripts and the briefing schedule in these appeals shall be suspended pending further order of this court. Respondent may file any reply within 14 days from the date that appellant's response is served. Nos. 82412/82413. (SC) | | 21-14313
|
06/16/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause due: July 1, 2021. Nos. 82412/82413. (SC) | | 21-17359
|
07/01/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause. Nos. 82412/82413. (SC) | | 21-18934
|
07/01/2021 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order After March 25, 2021, Hearing (filed in district court on 4/12/21); and Notice of Entry of Order After March 25, 2021, Hearing (filed in district court on 4/13/21). (SC) | | 21-19022
|
07/06/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Reinstating Briefing. It appears that this court has jurisdiction and this appeal may proceed. Single opening brief and appendix due: 60 days. Nos. 82412/82413 (SC) | | 21-19335
|
07/14/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Stay. The motion for stay is denied. Nos. 82412/82413. (SC) | | 21-20292
|
09/03/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: September 21, 2021. Nos. 82412/82413. (SC) | | 21-25716
|
09/21/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. Nos. 82412/82413. (SC) | | 21-27316
|
09/22/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume I. Nos. 82412/82413. (SC) | | 21-27355
|
09/22/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume II. Nos. 82412/82413. (SC) | | 21-27356
|
09/22/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix - Volume III. Nos. 82412/82413. (SC) | | 21-27357
|
09/22/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume I Part I. Nos. 82412/82413. (SC) | | 21-27358
|
10/19/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent's answering brief due: November 4, 2021. Nos. 82412/82413. (SC) | | 21-30075
|
11/01/2021 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File the Answering Brief on Appeal (Second Request). Nos. 82412/82413 (SC) | | 21-31327
|
11/05/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent shall have until February 2, 2022, to file and serve the answering brief. Nos. 82412/82413. (SC) | | 21-31847
|
02/02/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time (2nd Request). Nos. 82412/82413 (SC) | | 22-03604
|
02/02/2022 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix. Nos. 82412/82413 (SC) | | 22-03616
|
02/03/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. Nos. 82412/82413 (SC) | | 22-03623
|
02/03/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent's motion for a second extension of time to file the answering brief is granted. The answering brief was filed on February 3, 2022. Appellant shall have until March 7, 2022, to file and serve a reply brief, if deemed necessary. Nos. 82412/82413. (SC) | | 22-03727
|
03/04/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Reply Brief due: March 21, 2022. Nos. 82412/82413. (SC) | | 22-06966
|
03/21/2022 | Brief | Filed Apellant's Reply Brief. Nos. 82412/82413. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 3/21/21) (SC) | | |
03/21/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection - No Notice of Appearance Abira Grigsby. Nos. 82412/82413 (SC) | | 22-08870
|
03/21/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. Nos. 82412/82413 (SC) | | 22-08902
|
03/22/2022 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. Nos. 82412/82413 (SC) | | |
04/28/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Change of Address. Nos. 82412/82413 (SC) | | 22-13544
|
05/04/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. Nos. 82412/82413. (SC). | | 22-14265
|
05/04/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. Nos. 82412/82413. (SC). | | |
07/21/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Tao, J., concurring. Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB Nos. 82412/82413. (SC) | | |
08/08/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. (SC) | | |
08/08/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Petition for Review due: August 22, 2022. Nos. 82412/82413. (SC) | | 22-24702
|
08/22/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for Review. Nos. 82412/82413 (SC) | | 22-26201
|
09/07/2022 | Post-Judgment Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition for Review. "Review denied." EN BANC (SC) | | 22-27945
|
09/07/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. Nos. 82412/82413 (SC) | | 22-27946
|
09/07/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. Nos. 82412/82413 (SC) | | |
09/22/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on September 13, 2022. Nos. 82412/82413 (SC) | | 22-27946
|