Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/14/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Bittner Legal. Check no. 1301. (SC) | | |
06/14/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC) | | 21-17071
|
06/14/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC) | | 21-17075
|
06/15/2021 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell. (SC) | | 21-17253
|
06/23/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel (Massey K. Mayo Case). (SC) | | 21-18066
|
07/07/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. Due date: 10 days. (SC) | | 21-19377
|
07/09/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall remove attorney Massey K. Mayo, Esq., of the law firm of Dolan Law, LLC, from the docket of this appeal. Respondent shall have 30 days from the date of this order to retain new counsel and cause new counsel to file a notice of appearance with this court. (SC) | | 21-19767
|
07/16/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant's Civil Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 21-20641
|
07/27/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Copy of District Court Docket Entries. (SC) | | 21-21672
|
07/28/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Other. The Respondent has informed the settlement judge that he will be going forward in pro per in this appeal and will be sending a letter to the Court informing it of his decision. (SC) | | 21-21950
|
07/29/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Respondent's Notification of in Pro Per. (SC) | | 21-22078
|
08/03/2021 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Removing From Settlement Program and Reinstating Deadlines for Filing Documents. Respondent will not be retaining counsel for this appeal and thus the appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 40 days fast track statement and appendix; Respondent(s): 21 days from fast track statement to file fast track response. (SC) | | 21-22474
|
09/13/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's fast track statement and appendix due: September 20, 2021. (SC) | | 21-26425
|
09/20/2021 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Child Custody Fast Track Statement. (SC) | | 21-27197
|
09/20/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volumes 1-5. (SC) | | 21-27198
|
09/23/2021 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Fast Track Child Custody Appeal. (SC) | | 21-27564
|
09/28/2021 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Proper Person Respondent's Child Custody Fast Track Response. (SC) | | 21-27847
|
10/02/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 10/04/21). (SC) | | |
10/04/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. (SC) | | 21-28371
|
10/05/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Copy of District Court Docket Entries. (SC) | | 21-28560
|
10/07/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. (OPPOSITION DETACHED AND FILED SEPARATELY PER 10/15/21 ORDER). (SC) | | 21-28882
|
10/11/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 7/15/20. Court Reporter: Sunshine Litigation Services. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 10/11/21)(SC) | | |
10/11/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. (SC) | | 21-29105
|
10/12/2021 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Opposition to Motion for an Extension of Time. (SC) | | 21-29313
|
10/15/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant's motion for an extension of time to file an opposition to the motion to dismiss is granted. The clerk of this court shall detach the opposition from the motion filed on October 7, 2021, and shall file it separately. Respondent shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve any reply in support of the motion to dismiss. Briefing suspended. (SC) | | 21-29681
|
10/15/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. (SC) | | 21-29686
|
10/15/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Rough Draft Transcript Form. (DETACHED TRANSCRIPT REQUEST FORM AND FILED SEPARATELY PER ORDER FILED 10/28/21). (SC) | | 21-29744
|
10/15/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Proof of Service for Motion to Extend Time. (SC) | | 21-29745
|
10/20/2021 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Reply to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. (SC) | | 21-30221
|
10/20/2021 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Opposition to Motion for Extension of Time to File Rough Draft Transcript Request Form. (SC) | | 21-30223
|
10/25/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Reply to Opposition to Motion for Extension of Time to File Rough Draft Transcript Request Form. (SC) | | 21-30752
|
10/28/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Respondent moves to dismiss this appeal. The motion to dismiss the appeal is denied. Appellant has filed a "Motion to Extend Time to File Rough Draft Transcript Form" with the transcript request form attached. The clerk of this court shall detach the rough draft transcript request form from the motion and shall file it separately. Appellant shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file and serve a fast track reply to respondent's fast track response. (SC) | | 21-31138
|
10/28/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 7/15/20. To Court Reporter: Sunshine Litigation Services. Filed in district court on: 10/5/21. (SC) | | 21-31143
|
11/29/2021 | Case Status Update | Fast Track Briefing Completed. (SC) | | |
12/29/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | 21-36957
|
12/29/2021 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |
02/17/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (SC) | | |
03/14/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. (SC) | | |
03/14/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-07984
|
03/14/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
03/22/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 15, 2022. (SC) | | 22-07984
|