Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
18-12058: This document is currently unavailable. If you need a copy of this document, please contact Clerk's Office at (775)684-1600.
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 73655
Short Caption:SOUTHWORTH VS. DIST. CT. (LAS VEGAS PAVING CORP.)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A754175Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Proper Person Writ Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/23/2018How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/08/2017Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Peter M. Southworth. Money Order no. 23798457483.
08/08/2017Petition/WritFiled Proper Person Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition.17-26413
08/08/2017AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ.17-26414
09/18/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Real Party in Interest's Answer to Writ Petition due: 30 days. Petitioner shall have 15 days from service of the answer to file and serve any reply.17-31496
10/18/2017Petition/WritFiled Real Party In Interest's Answering Brief.17-35593
10/18/2017AppendixFiled Real Party In Interest's Appendix Volume 1.17-35597
11/01/2017Petition/WritFiled Petitioner's Reply to Real Party in Interest's Answer to Petition.17-37386
02/23/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting For Decision Without Oral Argument.18-07159
03/29/2018Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition granted." Direct the clerk of this court to issue a writ of prohibition instructing the district court to arrest its exercise of jurisdiction over LVPC's appeal. Before the Court En Banc. Author: Gibbons, J. Majority: Gibbons/Douglas/Cherry/Pickering/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Stiglich. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 20. EN BANC18-12058
03/29/2018WritIssued Writ with letter. Certified Copy of Writ and Opinion mailed to Honorable Rob Bare, District Judge, by this office.18-12129
03/29/2018WritFiled Returned Writ. Served on Judge Rob Bare, District Judge, by mail from this office on this day.18-12130
04/24/2018RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.18-15596
04/24/2018Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.