Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
22-32987: This document is currently unavailable. If you need a copy of this document, please contact Clerk's Office at (775)684-1600.
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 83342-COA
Short Caption:IN RE: ESTATE OF SWEETCourt:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):83342
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - P103540Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Pro Bono Program
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:09/27/2022 at 1:30 PMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas
Submission Date:09/27/2022How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/29/2022Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA).
07/28/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This matter is scheduled for oral argument on September 27, 2022, at 1:30 p.m. in Las Vegas. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. The Court of Appeals may, on written stipulation by both parties, permit lawyers to participate in oral argument by videoconference. The videoconferencing system the court uses requires laptop/desktop/videoconferencing computer internet access and audio and video (web camera) capability. For a request to be granted, the parties' internet capabilities must be compatible with those of the court. A written stipulation for videoconferencing must be filed with the court on or before August 26, 2022. (COA)22-23730
07/29/2022Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Notice of Appearance for Kerry E. Kleiman. (COA)22-23884
09/27/2022Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Court of Appeals. MG/JT/BB. (COA).
10/20/2022Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court of Appeals. Author: Gibbons, J. Majority: Gibbons/Tao/Bulla. 138 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 68. Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB. (COA).22-32987
11/07/2022Filing FeePetition for Rehearing Filing Fee Waived. In Forma Pauperis. (COA)
11/07/2022Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. (COA)22-35017
11/23/2022Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c).COA-MG/JT/BB. (COA)22-36807
12/12/2022Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. (COA)
12/12/2022Case Status UpdateCase Closed. (COA)