Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
08/09/2021 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing Fee Waived. In Forma Pauperis. (SC) | | |
08/09/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 21-23117
|
08/09/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Regarding Deadlines. (SC) | | 21-23120
|
08/20/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Transcript Request Form due: September 7, 2021, and Docketing Statement due: September 13, 2021. (SC) | | 21-24366
|
08/23/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Pro Bono Counsel and Directing Transmission of Record. This court has determined that the appointment of pro bono counsel to represent appellant would assist this court in reviewing this appeal. Accordingly, the clerk of this court shall transmit a copy of this order, the attached district court order and report and recommendation, and the attached case summary to the Legal Aid Center of Southern Nevada for financial eligibility screening. If appellant qualifies and does not object to pro bono counsel, the Legal Aid Center in cooperation with the Pro Bono Committee shall locate a volunteer attorney from the program to represent appellant. Once an attorney is located, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance in this court within 60 days from the date of this order. Briefing and oral argument will be scheduled thereafter. Briefing suspended. This court has further concluded that review of the complete record is warranted. District court record due: 30 days. (SC) | | 21-24531
|
08/31/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal - P103540 - Volume 1 Part 1. (SC) | | 21-25390
|
08/31/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal - P103540 - Volume 1 Part 2A. (SC) | | 21-25392
|
08/31/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal - P103540 - Volume 2. (SC) | | 21-25393
|
08/31/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 05/20/21. To Court Reporter: Kerry Esparza. (SC) | | 21-25408
|
09/02/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Notice of District Court Documents. (SC) | | 21-25593
|
09/02/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Proper Person Civil Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 21-25594
|
09/02/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Notice to Correct Decedent's name. (SC) | | 21-25595
|
09/02/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Notice to Request to Correct Error in Name, from Christy Kay Sweets to Christy Kay Sweet. (SC) | | 21-25596
|
09/02/2021 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Letter. (SC) | | 21-25598
|
09/03/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal pages 214 to 216 and 220 to 221 (SEALED). (SC) | | |
09/15/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant has filed several documents in this court. Pursuant to appellant's notice filed September 2, 2021, providing a district court order, the clerk of this court shall amend the caption of this appeal to reflect the decedent's name as Marilyn Weeks Sweet, as appears on the caption of this order. This court's docket already reflects appellant's name as Christy Kay Sweet; thus this court takes no action regarding the notice to change appellant's name. Appellant has filed a letter informing this court of her concern that proceedings are continuing in the district court. See NRS 155.195. This court takes no action regarding the letter. Appellant, who is proceeding in forma pauperis, has filed a transcript request form pursuant to NRAP 9(b). This court declines to order the preparation of the requested transcripts at this time. The deadlines for filing documents in this court remain suspended pending further order of this court. (SC) | | 21-26695
|
09/21/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service (Docketing Statement Civil Appeals). (SC) | | 21-27279
|
10/15/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Court Reporter's Notice of Failure to Pay Transcript fees. (SC) | | 21-29669
|
10/18/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Michael Feder/Dickinson Wright for Appellant. (SC) | | 21-29813
|
10/20/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Reinstating Briefing. Attorney Michael N. Feder of Dickinson Wright PLLC has now filed a notice of appearance as appellant's pro bono counsel. The clerk of this court shall add Mr. Feder and Dickinson Wright to the docket as counsel for appellant. Appellant's transcript request due: 14 days. Opening brief due: 90 days. fn1 [In light of this order, this court takes no action regarding court recorder Kerry Esparza's notice of appellant's failure to pay fees for transcripts, filed on October 15, 2021.] (SC) | | 21-30120
|
10/27/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 11/13/20, and 5/20/21. To Court Reporter: Kerry Esparza. (SC) | | 21-30992
|
11/05/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Kerry Esparza stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 5/5/21. (SC) | | 21-31944
|
11/05/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Kerry Esparza stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts:5/20/21. (SC) | | 21-31946
|
11/15/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Sherry Justice stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 11/13/20.(SC) | | 21-32684
|
01/18/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Opening Brief due: February 1, 2022. (SC) | | 22-01604
|
01/31/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Supplemental Appendix to Record on Appeal (Second Request). (SC) | | 22-03168
|
02/03/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: March 11, 2022. (SC) | | 22-03684
|
03/11/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 22-07939
|
03/11/2022 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 1. (SC) | | 22-07940
|
03/31/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent's Answering Brief due: April 25, 2022. (SC) | | 22-09977
|
04/25/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 22-13111
|
04/26/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Certificate of Service for Answering Brief. (SC) | | 22-13129
|
05/23/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's reply brief due: June 8, 2022. (SC) | | 22-16231
|
06/09/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 22-18339
|
06/09/2022 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
06/29/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | 22-20434
|
06/29/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |
06/29/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Supreme Court. (COA). | | |
07/28/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This matter is scheduled for oral argument on September 27, 2022, at 1:30 p.m. in Las Vegas. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. The Court of Appeals may, on written stipulation by both parties, permit lawyers to participate in oral argument by videoconference. The videoconferencing system the court uses requires laptop/desktop/videoconferencing computer internet access and audio and video (web camera) capability. For a request to be granted, the parties' internet capabilities must be compatible with those of the court. A written stipulation for videoconferencing must be filed with the court on or before August 26, 2022. (COA) | | 22-23730
|
07/29/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice of Appearance for Kerry E. Kleiman. (COA) | | 22-23884
|
09/27/2022 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Court of Appeals. MG/JT/BB. (COA). | | |
10/20/2022 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court of Appeals. Author: Gibbons, J. Majority: Gibbons/Tao/Bulla. 138 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 68. Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB. (COA). | | 22-32987
|
10/20/2022 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court of Appeals. Author: Gibbons, J. Majority: Gibbons/Tao/Bulla. 138 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 68. Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB. (SC). | | |
11/07/2022 | Filing Fee | Petition for Rehearing Filing Fee Waived. In Forma Pauperis. (COA) | | |
11/07/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for Rehearing. (COA) | | 22-35017
|
11/23/2022 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c).COA-MG/JT/BB. (COA) | | 22-36807
|
12/12/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Supreme Court. (COA) | | |
12/12/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. (SC) | | |
12/12/2022 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. (COA) | | |
12/12/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for Review by the Supreme Court. (SC) | | 22-38918
|
12/30/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Answer Petition for Review. Answer due: 14 days. (SC) | | 22-40957
|
01/13/2023 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent's answer to petition for review due: January 27, 2023. (SC) | | 23-01229
|
01/27/2023 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time (Answer to Petition for Review). (SC). | | 23-02791
|
01/31/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Certificate of Service. (SC) | | 23-03008
|
02/03/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Limited Opposition to Motion to Extend Time. (SC) | | 23-03455
|
02/08/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Counsel for respondent has filed a motion for an extension of time (120 days) to file an answer to appellant's petition for review on the ground that respondent has died and no personal representative for respondent has been appointed. Appellant has filed a limited opposition to the motion. Upon the death of a party, an action may not proceed until a personal representative is substituted for the decedent. Counsel for respondent shall have 60 days from the date of this order to (1) file a motion for the substitution of a personal representative or (2) inform this court that respondent has no personal representative. The deadlines for filing of documents are suspended pending further order of this court. fn1[ Respondent's motion for an extension of time is denied as moot] (SC) | | 23-03851
|
04/10/2023 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion To Substitute Administrators As Respondents. (SC) | | 23-10924
|
04/12/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Pursuant to this court's order entered on February 8, 2023, Kathryn Sweet and Vanessa Johnson, administrators of the estate of Marilyn Weeks Sweet, have filed a motion to substitute in as respondents in place of deceased respondent Chris Hisgen. . The motion is granted. The clerk of this court shall add Kathryn Sweet and Vanessa Johnson as respondents in place of Chris Hisgen and shall amend the caption in accord with the caption on this order. The clerk shall add attorney Brian H. Nelson and the Law Offices of Brian H. Nelson to the docket as counsel for Kathryn Sweet and Vanessa Johnson. The deadlines for filing documents are reinstated as follows. Respondents shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file and serve an answer to the petition for review. (SC) | | 23-11201
|
04/26/2023 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondents' answer to petition for review due: May 10, 2023. (SC) | | 23-13052
|
05/10/2023 | Brief | Filed Respondents' Answering Brief to Petition For Review. (SC) | | 23-14842
|
06/08/2023 | Post-Judgment Order/Dispositional | Order Denying Petition for Review. "Review Denied". EN BANC (SC) | | 23-18184
|
06/08/2023 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 23-18203
|
06/08/2023 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.(SC) | | |
06/15/2023 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court County Clerk on June 9, 2023. (SC) | | 23-18203
|
11/21/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari Filed. A petition for a writ of certiorari was filed August 5, 2023 and placed on the docket November 15, 2023 as Case No.23-6027.(SC) | | 23-37871
|
01/30/2024 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari Denied. The petition for a writ of certiorari is denied.(COA) | | 24-03501
|
04/10/2024 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice from US Supreme Court/Petition for Rehearing is Denied. (COA) | | 24-12644
|