Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
17-21671: This document is currently unavailable. If you need a copy of this document, please contact Clerk's Office at (775)684-1600.
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 69100
Short Caption:THE COMM'N. ON ETHICS OF THE STATE OF NEVADA VS. HANSENCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 15OC000761BClassification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:11/04/2015 / Levitt, LansfordSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:03/05/2018 at 10:00 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:03/05/2018How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/04/2015Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. State/County/Municipality.
11/04/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)15-33583
11/04/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.15-33585
11/04/2015Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt.15-33610
11/12/2015Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation and should be removed from the settlement program.15-34546
11/16/2015Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief.15-34979
11/19/2015Transcript RequestFiled Certificate that no Transcript is Being Requested.15-35365
11/24/2015Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.15-36042
12/07/2015MotionFiled Respondents' Motion to Exceed Page Limit for Respondents' Motion to Dismiss Appeal for Lack of Appellate Jurisdiction, Etc.15-37213
12/21/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the motion to dismiss received on December 7, 2015. Appellant shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve a response to the motion that shall not exceed 18 pages, and respondents shall have 5 days from service of the response to file and serve any reply.15-38941
12/21/2015MotionFiled Respondents' Motion to Dismiss Appeal for Lack of Appellate Jurisdiction, Etc.15-38942
12/22/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Response to Motion to Dismiss Appeal due: January 14, 2016.15-39185
01/15/2016MotionFiled Opposition to Respondents' Motion to Dismiss Appeal for Lack of Appellate Jurisdiction.16-01457
01/25/2016Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondents reply to response to motion to dismiss appeal for lack of appellate jurisdiction due: February 9, 2016.16-02469
02/02/2016MotionFiled Stipulation and Order Extending Brieifing Schedule Until Issuance of Decision on Motion to Dismiss.16-03517
02/10/2016MotionFiled Respondents' Motion to Exceed the Page Limit for their Reply in Support of their Motion to Dismiss Appeal for Lack of Appellate Jurisdiction, Etc.16-04350
02/17/2016Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's response to the motion to exceed the page limit for respondents' reply due: March 7, 2016.16-05127
03/08/2016MotionFiled Opposition to Respondents' Motion to Exceed Page Limit for Respondents' Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Appeal for Lack of Appellate Jurisdiction, etc. and Appellant's Motion to Strike.16-07286
03/15/2016MotionFiled Respondents' Reply in Support of their Motion to Exceed the Page Limit for their Reply in Support of their Motion to Dismiss Appeal for Lack of Appellate Jurisdiction, Etc.16-08110
03/17/2016MotionFiled Respondents' Response in Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Strike.16-08443
03/23/2016MotionFiled Appellant's Reply in Support of Appellant's Motion to Strike.16-09245
09/21/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitted For Decision Without Oral Argument. (RESCINDED PER 9/21/16 ORDER.)16-29235
09/21/2016Order/Clerk'sFiled Order. On September 21, 2016, an order submitting this matter for decision without oral argument was erroneously filed in this matter. Accordingly, the order is hereby rescinded.16-29365
11/28/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant's motion to strike is denied. Respondents' motion to exceed the page limit for their reply in support of their motion to dismiss this appeal is granted. The clerk of this court shall file the reply received on February 10, 2016, and the supplemental exhibits to the motion to dismiss, received on February 17, 2016. Briefing in this appeal is suspended pending further order of this court. fn1[Based on this order, we take no action on the parties' stipulation to extend the briefing schedule, filed February 2, 2016.]16-36735
11/28/2016MotionFiled Respondents' Reply in Support of their Motion to Dismiss Appeal for Lack of Appellate Jurisdiction, Etc.16-36736
11/28/2016AppendixFiled Respondents' Supplemental Exhibits to Their Motion to Dismiss Appeal for Lack of Appellate Jurisdiction, Etc.16-36737
06/29/2017Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Appeal dismissed." Before: Pickering/Hardesty/Parraguirre. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Parraguirre. Pickering, J., dissenting. 133 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 39. SNP16P-KP/JH/RP (OPINION VACATED PER ORDER 12/20/17).17-21671
07/07/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Petition for Rehearing due: July 31, 2017.17-22533
08/01/2017Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for Rehearing.17-25425
08/01/2017Filing FeeRehearing Filing fee waived. State/County/Municipality.
08/01/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Respondents' Answer due: 15 days.17-25501
08/03/2017BriefFiled City of Reno's Amicus Curiae Brief Supporting Appellant's Petition for Rehearing.17-25901
08/10/2017MotionFiled Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of the Commission on Ethics of the State of Nevada's Petition for Rehearing.17-26828
08/11/2017MotionFiled Nevada State Contractors Board Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief In Support Of Petition For Rehearing. (DETACHED AMICUS BRIEF FROM MOTION AND RETURNED UNFILED PER 8/23/17 ORDER.)17-26972
08/16/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Answer to the Petition for Rehearing due: August 30, 2017.17-27349
08/23/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions and Rejecting Briefs. The motions for leave to file amicus briefs in support of appellant's petition for rehearing are granted. However, we are unable to file the submitted amicus briefs at this time because they contain formatting deficiencies. We direct the clerk of this court to reject the brief submitted via E-Flex on August 9, 2017, and detach the brief from the motion filed on August 11, 2017, and return it unfiled. The Nevada State Board of Medical Examiners and the Nevada State Contractors Board Amicus Briefs due: 5 days. Respondents Answer to Petition for Rehearing due: September 15, 2017.17-28231
08/23/2017BriefFiled Amicus Curiae Brief of the Nevada State Board of Medical Examiners in Support of the Commission on Ethics of the State of Nevada's Petition for Rehearing.17-28371
08/24/2017BriefFiled Nevada State Contractor Board's Amicus Curiae Brief In Support Of Petition For Rehearing.17-28461
09/18/2017Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondents' Answer to Petition for Rehearing.17-31336
09/29/2017Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). Pickering, J., dissenting.17-33162
10/03/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Docket Entries. Updated Docket Sheet.17-33555
10/05/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Petition for En Banc Reconsideration due: October 30, 2017.17-33845
10/31/2017Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration.17-37266
10/31/2017Filing FeeRehearing Filing fee waived
11/03/2017MotionFiled Nevada State Contractors Board's Motion To File Amicus Curiae Brief In Support Of Petition For En Banc Reconsideration.17-37771
11/03/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Respondent's Answer due: 15 days.17-37801
11/09/2017MotionFiled Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of the Commission on Ethics of the State of Nevada's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (DETACHED AMICUS BRIEF AND FILED SEPARATELY PER ORDER 11/17/17.)17-38789
11/17/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Answer to Petition for Rehearing due: December 4, 2017.17-39694
11/17/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions. The clerk of this court shall detach the amicus brief from the Board of Medical Examiners' motion filed on November 9, 2017, and file it separately. The Contractors Board shall have until November 27, 2017, to file and serve its amicus brief.17-39769
11/17/2017BriefFiled The State of Nevada Board of Medical Examiners' Amicus Brief.17-39777
11/21/2017BriefFiled Nevada State Contractors Board's Amicus Curiae Brief In Support Of Petition For En Banc Review.17-40312
12/05/2017Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondents' Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration.17-41730
12/20/2017Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Granting En Banc Reconsideration. This appeal is reinstated and the opinion dismissing the appeal entered on June 29, 2017, is hereby vacated. The clerk of this court is directed to schedule this appeal for argument before the en banc court on the next available calendar.17-43997
01/22/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Monday, March 5, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City.18-02811
02/16/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.18-06429
02/27/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance at Oral Argument (Tracy Chase and Yvonne Nevarez-Goodson to argue on behalf of Appellant Nevada Commission on Ethics).18-07572
02/27/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance at Oral Argument (Kevin Powers to argue on behalf of Respondents Ira Hansen and Jim Wheeler).18-07701
02/27/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Notice of Supplemental Authorities Pursuant to NRAP 31(e).18-07758
03/01/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Respondents' Response to Notice of Supplemental Authorities.18-08268
03/05/2018Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
05/31/2018Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Appeal dismissed." Before the court En Banc. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Cherry/Gibbons/Parraguirre. Pickering, J., with whom Douglas, C.J., and Stiglich, J., agree, dissenting. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 40. EN BANC18-20690
06/25/2018RemittiturIssued Remittitur.18-24089
06/25/2018Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/09/2018RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 26, 2018.18-24089