Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/09/2023 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. (SC). | | |
01/09/2023 | Order/Incoming | Filed Certifying Question to Nevada Supreme Court. Received from U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada and the Honorable Robert Jones, U.S. District Court Judge. (SC). | | 23-00626
|
02/10/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Accepting Certified Question and Directing Briefing and Payment of Filing Fee. Appellant's opening brief due: 30 days. Respondent shall have 30 days from the date the opening brief is served to file and serve an answering brief. Appellant shall have 21 days from the date the answering brief is served to file and serve any reply brief. Appellant's and respondent's filing fee of $125 due: 14 days. (SC) | | 23-04142
|
02/14/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Notice of Payment of Filing Fee. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 2/14/23. (SC) | | |
02/14/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. (SC) | | 23-04553
|
02/15/2023 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $125.00 from Woodburn & Wedge (Respondent). Check No. 115929. (SC) | | |
02/22/2023 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $125.00 from Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll (Appellant). Check No. 110206. (SC) | | |
03/01/2023 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's opening brief due: March 27, 2023. (SC) | | 23-06116
|
03/27/2023 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 23-09268
|
03/27/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 1. (SC) | | 23-09269
|
03/27/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 2. (SC) | | 23-09272
|
03/27/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 3. (SC) | | 23-09273
|
03/27/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 4. (SC) | | 23-09276
|
03/27/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 5. (SC) | | 23-09281
|
04/10/2023 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to file Answering Brief. (SC) | | 23-10867
|
04/11/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service for Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief. Due date: 7 days. (SC) | | 23-10996
|
04/11/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Proof of Service for Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief. (SC) | | 23-11148
|
04/12/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent's answering brief due: June 26, 2023. (SC) | | 23-11310
|
06/14/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice of Corrected Appendix Pages for Appellant's Opening Brief - Vol. 5. (SC) | | 23-18808
|
06/14/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 7 days. (SC) | | 23-18825
|
06/16/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Certificate of Service for Appellant's Notice of Corrected Appendix Pages. (SC) | | 23-19153
|
06/26/2023 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief - Vol 1. (SC) | | 23-20294
|
06/26/2023 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief - Vol 2. (SC) | | 23-20295
|
06/26/2023 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief - Vol 3. (SC) | | 23-20297
|
06/26/2023 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief - Vol 4. (SC) | | 23-20299
|
06/26/2023 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief - Vol 5. (SC) | | 23-20302
|
06/26/2023 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief - Vol 6. (SC) | | 23-20304
|
06/26/2023 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief - Vol 7. (SC) | | 23-20305
|
06/26/2023 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief - Vol 8. (SC) | | 23-20306
|
06/26/2023 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief - Vol 9. (SC) | | 23-20307
|
06/26/2023 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief - Vol 10. (SC) | | 23-20308
|
06/26/2023 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief - Vol 11. (SC) | | 23-20309
|
06/26/2023 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 23-20314
|
06/27/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 7 days. (SC) | | 23-20392
|
07/03/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Certificate of Service to the Appendix to Answering Brief - Volumes 1-11. (SC) | | 23-21115
|
07/12/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to File the Reply Brief. (SC) | | 23-22223
|
07/13/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Approving Stipulation. Appellant shall have until August 14, 2023, to file and serve the reply brief. (SC) | | 23-22452
|
07/17/2023 | Motion | Filed Amicus Curiae's Motion for Permission to File Brief and Amicus Curiae Brief (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 7/17/2023). (SC) | | |
07/17/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Amicus Curiae's Notice of Appearance for Mark Wray and Christopher Schulte (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 7/17/2023). (SC) | | |
07/17/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days. (SC) | | 23-22799
|
07/18/2023 | Motion | Filed Amicus Curiae's Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief and Amici Curiae (American Sheep Industry Association, Inc. and Nevada Wool Growers Association) in Support of Respondent's Answering Brief. (BRIEF DETACHED AND FILED PER 8/4/23 ORDER). (SC) | | 23-23015
|
07/21/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellant's (Abel Cantaro Castillo) Opposition to Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief. (SC) | | 23-23364
|
07/27/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's (Western Range Association) Notice of Support of American Sheep Industry and Nevada Wool Growers Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief. (SC) | | 23-24059
|
08/04/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall detach the proposed amicus brief from the motion filed on July 18, 2023, and file it separately. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve any brief in reply to the answering brief and amicus brief. (SC) | | 23-25071
|
08/04/2023 | Brief | Filed American Sheep Industry Association, Inc. and Nevada Wool Growers Association's Amicus Brief. (FILED PER 8/4/23 ORDER). (SC) | | 23-25077
|
08/08/2023 | Motion | Filed Amicus Curiae Motion to Associate Counsel for Christopher James Schulte. (SC) | | 23-25520
|
08/18/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Amici curiae American Sheep Industry Association, Inc. and Nevada Wool Growers Association have filed a motion to associate attorney Christopher James Schulte of the law firm of Smith, Gambrell & Russell, LLP, in this matter pursuant to SCR 42. The motion is granted. Mr. Schulte shall be permitted to appear on behalf of amici curiae in this appeal. (SC) | | 23-27088
|
08/29/2023 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 23-28114
|
08/29/2023 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
12/07/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for January 4, 2024, at 10:30 a.m., in Carson City. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. (SC) | | 23-39653
|
12/13/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. (Christine E. Webber for Appellant)(SC) | | 23-40372
|
12/15/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Notice of Appearance.(Ellen Jean Winograd and Anthony Hall, for Respondent.(SC) | | 23-40741
|
12/20/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC) | | 23-41206
|
01/04/2024 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. (SC) | | |
01/24/2024 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice of Change of Address.(SC) | | 24-02767
|
02/05/2024 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Notice Suggestion of Death Upon the Record (NRAP 43)(SC) | | 24-04231
|
02/12/2024 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. This matter involves a legal question certified to this court, under NRAP 5, by the United States District Court for the District of Nevada. We accepted the certified question on February 10, 2023. On February 5, 2024, respondent filed a notice of suggestion of death informing this court that appellant had died on July 11, 2023. Respondent indicates that a notice of suggestion of death has also been filed in federal District Court in Abel Cantaro Castillo v. Western Range Association, Docket No. 3:16-cv-00237-RCJ-CLB. Because the underlying action in this matter is pending in the federal District Court, we will hold this original proceeding in abeyance until the federal District Court determines whether the underlying action will proceed. The parties shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file a status report regarding the proceedings pending in federal District Court. (SC) | | 24-05035
|
03/11/2024 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice Status Report(SC) | Y | 24-08544
|
03/12/2024 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Western Range Association's Status Report in Response to February 12, 2024 Order. (SC) | Y | 24-08860
|