Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
22-10007: This document is currently unavailable. If you need a copy of this document, please contact Clerk's Office at (775)684-1600.
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82524
Short Caption:WILLICK VS. DIST. CT. (SANSON)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):72778
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A750171Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Cadish, Pickering, SilverCase Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:None for Justice PickeringPanel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/22/2021How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/23/2021Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from Mitchell J. Langberg. (SC)
02/23/2021Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. (SC)21-05349
02/23/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ. (SC)21-05350
02/23/2021OtherJustice Elissa Cadish disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Voluntary Recusal. (SC)
02/23/2021OtherJustice Abbi Silver disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Parties. (SC)
03/12/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer. Answer due: 28 days. Petitioners shall have 14 days from service of the answer to file and serve any reply. (SC)21-07259
04/05/2021MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension to File Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. (SC)21-09807
04/07/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Stipulation. The stipulation of the parties extending the time for filing the answer to the petition for a writ of mandamus or prohibition is approved. NRA 26(b)(1)(A). Real parties in interest shall have until April 26, 2021, to file and serve the answer. Failure to timely file the answer may result in the imposition of sanctions. (SC)21-09966
04/26/2021MotionFiled Real Parties in Interests' Unopposed Motion for Extension to File Answer to Petition. (SC)21-11930
04/28/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Real parties shall have until May 3, 2021, to file and serve the answer. (SC)21-12134
05/03/2021Petition/WritFiled Real Parties in Interest Steve W. Sanson and Veterans in Politics International, Inc.'s Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus and Prohibition. (SC)21-12688
05/17/2021Petition/WritFiled Petitioners' Reply In Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus and Prohibition. (SC)21-14218
10/21/2021OtherJustice Kristina Pickering disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Voluntary Recusal
10/22/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC)21-30499
02/08/2022Notice/IncomingFiled Real Parties in Interest Notice of Disassociation of Counsel Alina M. Shell for Steve W. Sanson and Veterans in Politics International, Inc. (SC)22-04235
03/31/2022Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition denied." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Parraguirre/Hardesty/Stiglich/Herndon. fn1 [The Honorable Elissa F. Cadish, the Honorable Abbi Silver, and the Honorable Kristina Pickering, Justices, did not participate in the decision of this matter.] 138 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 19. En Banc. (SC).22-10007
04/25/2022RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. (SC)22-12965
04/25/2022Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)