Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/11/2017 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing fee waived. Criminal. | | |
05/11/2017 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | | 17-15848
|
05/12/2017 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Minutes (SEALED). | | |
06/07/2017 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Volumes 1-45 (via FTP). | | 17-18848
|
06/07/2017 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Volumes 46-51 (via FTP). | | 17-18864
|
06/12/2017 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Pages 104, 106,108, 110,112, 162-165, 167-168, 275-283 (SEALED). | | |
06/12/2017 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Pages 287, 566-583, 585-586, 835-838, 1333-1335 (SEALED). | | |
06/12/2017 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Pages 8951-9000 (SEALED). | | |
06/12/2017 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Pages 9001-9225 (SEALED). | | |
06/12/2017 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Pages 9226-9450 (SEALED). | | |
06/12/2017 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Pages 9451-9675 (SEALED). | | |
06/12/2017 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Pages 9676-9900 (SEALED). | | |
06/12/2017 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Pages 9901-10125 (SEALED). | | |
06/12/2017 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Pages 10126-10350 (SEALED). | | |
06/12/2017 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Pages 10351-10575 (SEALED). | | |
06/12/2017 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Pages 10576-10800 (SEALED). | | |
06/12/2017 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Pages 10801-11025 (SEALED). | | |
06/12/2017 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Pages 11026-11187 (SEALED). | | |
06/13/2017 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal pages 4675-4685 (SEALED). | | |
06/13/2017 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal pages 11198-11199 (SEALED). | | |
06/28/2017 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. | | 17-21452
|
10/05/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant's First Motion for Extension of Time To File Opening Brief. | | 17-33765
|
10/18/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief due: January 12, 2018. | | 17-35611
|
01/12/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. | | 18-01942
|
02/01/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief due: February 26, 2018. | | 18-04379
|
02/27/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Third Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief in this appeal of a First Degree Murder Conviction and Sentence of Death. | | 18-07545
|
03/08/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief due: April 12, 2018. | | 18-09154
|
04/12/2018 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. | | 18-14102
|
06/08/2018 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion for Enlargement of Time (Answering Brief). | | 18-21849
|
06/13/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent's Answering Brief due: August 6, 2018. | | 18-22579
|
08/06/2018 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion for Enlargement of Time Second Request. (Answering Brief). | | 18-30117
|
08/16/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent's Answering Brief due: September 5, 2018. | | 18-31724
|
09/05/2018 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. | | 18-34650
|
09/05/2018 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix Volume 1. | | 18-34653
|
10/18/2018 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. | | 18-41142
|
10/18/2018 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed. | | |
01/04/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Tuesday, February 5, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. for 60 minutes in Carson City. (SC) | | 19-00586
|
01/23/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC) | | 19-03390
|
02/05/2019 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. (SC) | | |
04/19/2019 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." En Banc. (SC). | | 19-17366
|
05/15/2019 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 19-21369
|
05/15/2019 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
06/04/2019 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 21, 2019. (SC) | | 19-21369
|