Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
11/30/2016 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Law Offices of Brian D. Nettles, Inc. Check no. 18983. | | |
11/30/2016 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | | 16-37018
|
11/30/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. | | 16-37020
|
12/01/2016 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant: 15 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief. | | 16-37212
|
12/14/2016 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | | 16-38788
|
12/16/2016 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. | | 16-39123
|
01/17/2017 | Motion | Filed Joint Motion to Consolidate Appeal With Appeal Number 70583. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-01511
|
01/24/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Consolidating Appeals and Regarding Briefing. Appellant in Docket No. 70583 shall have until March 31, 2017, to file and serve an opening brief. Appellant in Docket No. 71789 shall then have 30 days to file a combined answering brief and opening brief in regard to the appeal in Docket No. 71789. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed as set forth in NRAP 28.1(f)(1). Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-02536
|
03/16/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross Respondent's Unopposed Motion to Continue Deadline for Opening Brief. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-08800
|
04/10/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant in Docket No. 70583 shall have until May 1, 2017, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-11812
|
04/25/2017 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Change of Firm Name. The law firm of Lawrence J. Semenza, III. P.C. has changed its name to Semenza Kircher Rickard. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-13732
|
05/01/2017 | Brief | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Opening Brief. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-14289
|
05/01/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Volume 1. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-14291
|
05/01/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Volume 2. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-14292
|
05/01/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Volume 3. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-14293
|
05/01/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Volume 4. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-14294
|
05/01/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Volume 5. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-14295
|
05/01/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Volume 6. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-14296
|
05/01/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Volume 7. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-14297
|
05/01/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Volume 8. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-14298
|
05/01/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Volume 9. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-14299
|
05/01/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Volume 10. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-14300
|
05/01/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Volume 11. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-14301
|
05/01/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Volume 12. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-14302
|
05/01/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Volume 13. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-14303
|
05/01/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Volume 14. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-14304
|
05/01/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Volume 15. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-14305
|
05/01/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Volume 16. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-14306
|
05/01/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Volume 17. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-14307
|
05/01/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Volume 18. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-14308
|
05/26/2017 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Respondent/Appellant's Combined Answering and Opening Brief. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-17750
|
05/26/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondent/Appellant's Combined Answering and Opening Brief due: June 30, 2017. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-17756
|
06/28/2017 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to File Respondent/Appellant's Combined Answering and Opening Brief. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-21481
|
07/31/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the appendix received via E-Flex on July 21, 2017; and the combined answering and opening brief received via E-Flex on July 23, 2017. Appellant in Docket No. 70583 shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve a combined reply and answering brief. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-25352
|
07/31/2017 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Appellant's Appendix to Answering Brief - Vol. 1. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-25357
|
07/31/2017 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Appellant's Appendix to Answering Brief - Vol. 2. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-25358
|
07/31/2017 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Appellant's Appendix to Answering Brief - Vol. 3. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-25359
|
07/31/2017 | Brief | Filed Respondent/Appellant's Combined Answering and Opening Brief. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-25361
|
08/28/2017 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend Time for Wynn Las Vegas, LLC to File Combined Reply and Answering Brief - First Request. | | 17-28698
|
08/28/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal due: September 29, 2017. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-28700
|
09/26/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Unopposed Motion to Continue Deadline to File Its Combined Reply and Answering Brief. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-32623
|
10/16/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the combined brief received on October 13, 2017. Yvonne O'Connell shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file a reply brief in Docket No. 71789, if deemed necessary. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-35348
|
10/16/2017 | Brief | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Combined Reply Brief on Appeal and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal. | | 17-35358
|
11/06/2017 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for an Extension of Time to File Respondent/Appellant's Reply Brief on Cross-Appeal. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-38004
|
11/06/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondent/Appellant's Reply Brief on Cross-Appeal due: December 18, 2017. | | 17-38013
|
12/14/2017 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to File Respondent/Appellant's Reply Brief. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-43168
|
12/19/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's (Yvonne O'Connell in docket no. 71789) Reply Brief due: January 8, 2018. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 17-43814
|
01/04/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days. | | 18-00480
|
01/04/2018 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Appellant's Reply Appendix Volume 1. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 18-00490
|
01/04/2018 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Appellant's Reply Appendix Volume 2. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 18-00492
|
01/04/2018 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Appellant's Reply Appendix Volume 3. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 18-00493
|
01/04/2018 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Appellant's Reply Appendix Volume 4. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 18-00494
|
01/04/2018 | Brief | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant O'Connell's Reply Brief in Support of Cross-Appeal. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 18-00525
|
01/04/2018 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. Nos. 70583/71789. | | |
01/18/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer to Court of Appeals. Nos. 70583/71789 | | 18-02505
|
01/18/2018 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Supreme Court. | | |
03/12/2018 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | | |
03/15/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice. . Voluntary Disclosure. For the record, I wish to disclose that I will be participating in an upcoming spring league tennis team with counsel for appellant, attorney Brian Nettles. I do not believe this situation mandates my disqualification from this matter. However, I make this disclosure so that any party who wishes to request my recusal may do so. Any such request must be made in writing and filed in clerk’s office within 10 days. fn1 [Any such response must be filed by faxing a copy of the response within 10 days, with the original version submitted by mail. The fax number for the clerk’s office is 775-684-1601.] Nos. 70583/71789. | | |
05/22/2018 | Other | Justice Mark Gibbons disqualified from participation in this matter. Nos. 70583/71789 | | |
08/30/2018 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Fn1[This appeal was consolidated with the appeal in Docket No. 70583 prior to briefing. We now deconsolidate these appeals for the purposes of disposition. Judgment was affirmed in Docket No. 70583.] Before: Silver/Tao/Gobbons. Author: Gibbons, J. Majority: Gibbons/Silver/Tao. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 67. Court of Appeals/Silver/Tao/Gibbons. | | |
08/30/2018 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Fn1[This appeal was consolidated with the appeal in Docket No. 70583 prior to briefing. We now deconsolidate these appeals for the purposes of disposition. Judgment was affirmed in Docket No. 70583.] Before: Silver/Tao/Gobbons. Author: Gibbons, J. Majority: Gibbons/Silver/Tao. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 67. Court of Appeals/Silver/Tao/Gibbons. | | 18-901954
|
09/14/2018 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. | | |
09/14/2018 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant/Respondent's Petition for Review by the Supreme Court. Nos. 70583/71789. | | 18-36089
|
09/14/2018 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Supreme Court. | | |
09/14/2018 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. | | |
11/28/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Answer. Respondent Yvonne O'Connell's Answer to Petition for Review due: 15 days. Nos. 70583/71789. (SC) | | 18-906002
|
12/13/2018 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondent Yvonne O'Connell's Response to Petition for Review. Nos. 70583/71789. (SC) | | 18-908493
|
01/07/2019 | Other | Justice Abbi Silver disqualified from participation in this matter. Nos. 70583/71789 (SC) | | |
01/25/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Petition for Review in Docket No. 70583. fn1[Because neither party has sought our review in Docket No. 71789, we deconsolidate the appeals for all further appellate purposes. fn2[The Honorable Mark Gibbons, Chief Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter. The Honorable Abbi Silver, Justice, voluntarily recused herself.] EN BANC Nos. 70583/71789. (SC) | | 19-03915
|
01/25/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Voluntary Disclosure. You are hereby notified that the undersigned, Mark Gibbons, Justice, is directly related to Michael Gibbons, Judge, who presided over this appeal in the Court of Appeals. The Supreme Court has vacated the decision of the Court of Appeals and granted de novo review of the district court decision. The undersigned has no bias for or against any party to this
appeal. The undersigned makes this disclosure, however, so that any party who believes it is appropriate to request recusal may do so. Any recusal request should be made in writing within seven (7) days of the filing date of this Voluntary Disclosure. Nos. 70583/71789. (SC) | | 19-03970
|
04/04/2019 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 19-14640
|
04/04/2019 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
04/23/2019 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on April 9, 2019. (SC) | | 19-14640
|