Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
11/08/2022 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC) | | |
11/08/2022 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (A825079) (SC) | | 22-35205
|
11/08/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Criminal. Due date: 7 days. (SC) | | 22-35207
|
11/15/2022 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant's Criminal Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 22-35890
|
12/07/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Request Transcripts. Due date: 7 days. (SC) | | 22-38409
|
12/12/2022 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Appellant's Case Appeal Statement. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 12/12/22) (SC) | | |
12/12/2022 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/10/22. To Court Reporter:Velma Wood. (SC). | | 22-38862
|
12/12/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. (SC) | | 22-38864
|
12/16/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Case Appeal Statement. (SC). | | 22-39471
|
12/23/2022 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. (SC) | | 22-40291
|
01/04/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the case appeal statement is granted. The case appeal statement was filed on December 23, 2022. (SC) | | 23-00207
|
03/07/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to file Opening Brief. (SC) | | 23-06828
|
03/09/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Transcript and Granting Motion. Ms. Wood shall have 14 days from the date of this order to: (1) file and deliver the requested transcript as required by NRAP 9(c)(1)(A) and (2) file with this court the notice required by NRAP 9(c)(2). The motion for an extension of time to file the opening brief is granted to the following extent. NRAP 31(b)(3)(B). Appellant shall have until May 8, 2023, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 23-07284
|
05/08/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time To File Opening Brief. (SC) | | 23-14532
|
05/23/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to File Transcripts. To date, Ms. Wood has not filed the notice of delivery required by NRAP 9(c)(2) or otherwise communicated with this court. And appellant has now filed a second motion for an extension of time informing this court that he has not received the requested transcript. Court reporter certificate due: 7 days. (SC) | | 23-16244
|
05/25/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: July 7, 2023. (SC) | | 23-16535
|
05/31/2023 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Velvet Wood stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/10/2022. (SC) | | 23-17043
|
07/07/2023 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 23-21764
|
07/07/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 1. (SC) | | 23-21769
|
07/07/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 11. (SC) | | 23-21772
|
07/07/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 12. (SC) | | 23-21774
|
07/07/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 13. (SC) | | 23-21775
|
07/07/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 14. (SC) | | 23-21779
|
07/07/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 15. (SC) | | 23-21781
|
07/07/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 16. (SC) | | 23-21782
|
07/07/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 17. (SC) | | 23-21783
|
07/07/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 18. (SC) | | 23-21785
|
07/07/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 19. (SC) | | 23-21786
|
07/07/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 20. (SC) | | 23-21787
|
07/07/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 4. (SC) | | 23-21788
|
07/07/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 5. (SC) | | 23-21789
|
07/07/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 6. (SC) | | 23-21791
|
07/07/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 7. (SC) | | 23-21792
|
07/07/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 8. (SC) | | 23-21793
|
07/07/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 9. (SC) | | 23-21794
|
07/07/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 10. (SC) | | 23-21795
|
07/10/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Appendix to Opening Brief. Due date: 7 days. (SC) | | 23-21833
|
07/10/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 3 Part A. (SC) | | 23-21871
|
07/10/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 3 Part B. (SC) | | 23-21876
|
07/10/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 3 Part C. (SC) | | 23-21910
|
07/10/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 3 Part D. (SC) | | 23-21913
|
07/10/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 2 Part A. (SC) | | 23-21914
|
07/10/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 2 Part B. (SC) | | 23-21915
|
08/07/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Notice of Appearance for Taleen Pandukht. (SC) | | 23-25228
|
08/07/2023 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion for Enlargement of Time to File the Answering Brief. (SC) | | 23-25230
|
08/09/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent's answering brief due: September 6, 2023. (SC) | | 23-25704
|
08/16/2023 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 23-26718
|
09/14/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Reply Brief.(SC) | | 23-30106
|
09/15/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until October 30, 2023, to file and serve the reply brief. (SC) | | 23-30295
|
10/30/2023 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief.(SC) | | 23-35257
|
10/31/2023 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening.(SC) | | |
12/29/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | 23-42226
|
12/29/2023 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Supreme Court. (COA). | | |
12/29/2023 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |
04/05/2024 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." COA-MG/BB/DW (COA) | | 24-12022
|
04/05/2024 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." COA-MG/BB/DW (SC) | | |
04/30/2024 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Supreme Court. (COA) | | |
04/30/2024 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. (SC) | | |
04/30/2024 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. (COA) | | |
04/30/2024 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 24-15014
|
04/30/2024 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
05/10/2024 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on 5/2/24. (SC) | | 24-15014
|