Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
11/03/2017 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. | | |
11/03/2017 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | | 17-37803
|
11/03/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Criminal. Due date: 10 days | | 17-37806
|
11/07/2017 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. | | 17-38206
|
11/20/2017 | Transcript Request | Filed Appellant's Certificate of No Transcript Request. | | 17-39897
|
11/28/2017 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Criminal Appeal. | | 17-40780
|
03/05/2018 | Motion | Filed Motion for Additional Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix (First Request). | | 18-08432
|
03/15/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: April 16, 2018. | | 18-10255
|
04/17/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Additional Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix (Second Request). | | 18-14601
|
04/26/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: 15 days. | | 18-15944
|
05/11/2018 | Motion | Filed Motion for Additional Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix (Third Request). | | 18-18167
|
05/16/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: May 18, 2018. | | 18-18730
|
05/21/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Additional Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix (Fourth Request). | | 18-19221
|
05/23/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: June 4, 2018. | | 18-19770
|
06/04/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Additional Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix (Fifth Request). | | 18-21136
|
06/07/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: June 19, 2018. | | 18-21686
|
06/20/2018 | Motion | Filed Motion for Additional Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix (Sixth Request). | | 18-23525
|
06/20/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: June 25, 2018. | | 18-23652
|
06/26/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Late File and Motion for Reconsideration of Sixth Request for Additional Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. | | 18-24285
|
06/27/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: July 3, 2018. | | 18-24580
|
07/05/2018 | Motion | Filed Motion for Additional Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix (Seventh Request). | | 18-25427
|
07/11/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Amendment to Motion for Additional Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix (Seventh Request). | | 18-26291
|
07/12/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time For One (1) Additional Day to File Opening Brief. | | 18-26501
|
07/16/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Order Permitting Filing of the Opening Brief in Excess of 697 Words. | | 18-26905
|
08/02/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions. The clerk of this court shall file the appendix and opening brief received on July 11 and 13, 2018, respectively. Respondent shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file the answering brief. | | 18-29643
|
08/02/2018 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. | | 18-29645
|
08/02/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume I. | | 18-29647
|
08/02/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume II. | | 18-29648
|
08/02/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume III. | | 18-29666
|
08/02/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume IV. | | 18-29659
|
08/02/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume V. | | 18-29660
|
08/02/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume VI. | | 18-29661
|
08/02/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume VII. | | 18-29649
|
08/02/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume VIII. | | 18-29650
|
08/02/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume IX. | | 18-29651
|
08/02/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume X. | | 18-29653
|
08/02/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume XI. | | 18-29667
|
08/02/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume XII. | | 18-29668
|
08/02/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume XIII. | | 18-29670
|
08/02/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume XIV. | | 18-29674
|
08/31/2018 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. | | 18-34188
|
10/02/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Additional Time to File Reply Brief. | | 18-38590
|
10/02/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice - Motion Approved. Appellant's Reply Brief due: October 31, 2018. | | 18-38617
|
11/01/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time for Additional Time to File Reply Brief (Second Request). | | 18-42941
|
11/07/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Reply brief due: November 30, 2018. (SC). | | 18-903327
|
12/03/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Additional Time to File Reply Brief (3rd Request). (SC) | | 18-906587
|
12/12/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Supplement to the Third Motion For Additional Time to File Reply Brief Submitted on 11.30.2018. (SC) | | 18-908310
|
12/17/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Reply Brief due: January 2, 2019. (SC) | | 18-909020
|
01/03/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Additional Time to File Reply Brief (Fifth Request). (SC) | | 19-00290
|
01/10/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Reply brief due: January 11, 2019. (SC) | | 19-01584
|
01/11/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Additional Time to File Reply Brief (Sixth Request). (SC) | | 19-01672
|
01/11/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Reply Brief due: January 18, 2019. (SC) | | 19-01772
|
01/29/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Late File the Reply Brief by Five Days. (SC) | | 19-04464
|
02/04/2019 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Errata to 01/29/2019 Motion to Late File by Five Days (Reply Brief). (SC) | | 19-05241
|
02/06/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the reply brief received on January 29, 2019. (SC) | | 19-05736
|
02/06/2019 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 19-05737
|
02/06/2019 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
06/03/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Thursday, July 18, 2019, at 3:30 p.m., for 30 minutes in Las Vegas. (SC) | | 19-23985
|
07/08/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC) | | 19-28909
|
07/18/2019 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel. (JH/LS/AS)(SC) | | |
12/26/2019 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in part, reversed in part, and remanded." Before Stiglich/Hardesty/Silver. 135 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 65. (SC) | | 19-52116
|
01/13/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Additional Time to File the Petition for Rehearing (First Request). (SC) | | 20-01695
|
01/21/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Petition for Rehearing due: January 23, 2020. (SC). | | 20-02883
|
01/23/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Additional Time to File the Petition for Rehearing (Second Request). (SC) | | 20-03373
|
01/29/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Petition for Rehearing due: January 30, 2020. (SC) | | 20-04030
|
01/31/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice Regarding Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 20-04285
|
02/05/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant has filed a notice indicating that she will not be filing a petition for rehearing in this appeal. Accordingly, the clerk shall issue the remittitur. (SC). | | 20-04942
|
02/05/2020 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 20-04945
|
02/05/2020 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
02/21/2020 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on February 11, 2020. (SC) | | 20-04945
|